City of Camden et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Camden, City of Brockton, City of Sioux Falls, California Water Service Company, City of Delray Beach, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Township of Verona, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, City of South Shore, City of Freeport, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Seaman Cottages, Village of Bridgeport, City of Benwood, Niagara County, City of Pineville and City of Iuka
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, DuPont de Nemours Inc, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC and Corteva Inc
Interested Party: State of California, State of New Hampshire, State of New York, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Guam, Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc., California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and California State Water Resources Control Board
Case Number: 2:2023cv03230
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:00 AM, ***SEE COURTROOM AND LOCATION*** in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See ORDER at 3603 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; 33 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, ) Modified on 8/24/2023 to edit docket text re set courtroom location (sshe, ).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Motion of proposed Class Counsel for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement (Dkt. No. 3392 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (3) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG). Please See Order for All Details and Deadlines regarding I. PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; II. FINDINGS REGARDING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS; III. FINDINGS REGARDING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; IV. NOTICE TO SETTLEMENT CLASS MEMBERS; V. PROCEDURE FOR REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSION AND OBJECTIONS; VI. FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING A Final Fairness Hearing shall take place on the 14th day of December, 2023 at 10 o'clock in the a.m., U.S. Court House, 85 Broad St., Charleston, South Carolina; VII. STAY ORDER AND INJUNCTION; VIII. OTHER PROVISIONS. SO ORDERED this 22nd day of August, 2023. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/22/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER This Order relates to City of Camden, et al. v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG. For good cause shown, the motion to amend certain of the exhibits to the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement ( 3521 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (30) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/9/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Sovereign Letter (Arizona, California, District of Columbia, Pennsylvania, Wisconsin) Response filed by State of California.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/14/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - PFAS National Cost Model Report)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Hughes, Brendan)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MSA redlines, #2 Exhibit Proposed Preliminary Approval Order redlines)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with DuPont Entities (Addressing Roosevelt County Water Coop., Inc.) Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E Shannon on behalf of California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Shannon, Megan)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Plaintiffs' Response filed by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2020.10.02 Joint Status Report, #2 Exhibit 2022.03.18 Joint Status Report, #3 Exhibit 2023.07.07 Joint Status Report)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER This Order relates to City of Camden, et al. v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG. For good cause shown, the motion 3485 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (25) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) is GRANTED, allowing for the submission of responses, if any, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval, until August 7, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/31/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Allow Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by California Water Service Company, City of Benwood, City of Brockton, City of Camden, City of Delray Beach, City of Freeport, City of Iuka, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Niagara County, Seaman Cottages, Township of Verona, Village of Bridgeport. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(London, Michael) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMGQUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case AND SPREAD to applicable member case(s), to which the document relates as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. (sshe, )
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarae Snyder on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Snyder, Sarae)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Muriel Smith on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Smith, Janelle)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jenkins on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Jenkins, William)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Annadel Angeline Almendras on behalf of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Water Resources Control Board Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Almendras, Annadel)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF JOINDER re (3429 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 15 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement between public water systems and E.I. DuPont et al. by Ann R Johnston on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Johnston, Ann) (Main Document 3471 replaced on 7/28/2023) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/28/2023 to replace with corrected signature document (sshe, ).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Response filed by Town of Islip, New York, Town of Harrietstown, New York, Town of East Hampton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/31/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Rigano, Nicholas) Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to additional applicable member case(s), to which the document relates, as listed/corrected by clerk on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: PLEASE note correct filing procedures for future filings. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:21-cv-00862-RMG, 2:21-cv-01915-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, ) Modified to original lead document number on 7/25/2023 (sshe, ).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Response filed by Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/31/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Rodriguez, Christopher) Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to additional applicable member case(s), to which the document relates, as listed/corrected by clerk on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: PLEASE note correct filing procedures for future filings. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02612-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, ) Modified to original lead document number on 7/25/2023 (sshe, ).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF JOINDER in Motion for Extension of Time (3427 in 18mn2873, 14 in 23cv3230) by William J Jackson on behalf of Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Guam Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Jackson, William)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER This Document relates to City of Camden, et al. v. E.I. DuPont de Nemours & Co. (n/k/a/ EIDP, Inc.), et al., 2:23-cv-3230-RMG. For good cause shown, the States' motion 3427 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 14 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) is GRANTED IN PART and the States' objections, if any, re MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Dkt. No. 3392 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) must be filed on or before July 31, 2023. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/21/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) by State of Colorado, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin, State of California, State of New Hampshire, State of New York, State of North Carolina. Response to Motion due by 8/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(Jackson, William)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: Sealed document entry by attorney filing user refiled by clerk as of original filing date in lead (Corrected Filing Document Number 3410) and spread to applicable member case (11 in 2:23-cv-03147-RMG) Filing date of original filing: 7/17/2023 (sshe, )
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Sealed Document in re document (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG), (4 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG, 3393 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER This Document relates to City of Camden, et al. v. E.I. Dupont de Nemours and Company (n/k/a EIDP, Inc.), et al., 2:23-cv-3230-RMG. Plaintiffs Motion to Seal (Dkt No. 3394 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (5) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file on the docket, under seal, an unredacted version of the supplement agreement. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/12/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed on 7/6/2023) (associated as of 7/12/2023), City of Camden et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Carolina (sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours Inc, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC. (sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Corteva Inc, DuPont de Nemours Inc, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BSCDC-11193613.), filed by City of South Shore, Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority, City of Benwood, City of Delray Beach, City of Camden, California Water Service Company, Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System, City of Iuka, Township of Verona, Niagara County, City of Pineville, City of Sioux Falls, Martinsburg Municipal Authority, Village of Bridgeport, City of Freeport, Seaman Cottages, City of Brockton. Service due by 10/10/2023(sshe, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER This Document relates to 2:23-cv-3230-RMG. After a careful review of the complaint, the motion for leave to direct file complaint (Dkt. No. 3376 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/12/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Separate Letter Agreement Containing Settling Defendants' Opt-Out Walk-Away Right Thresholds by Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document (3392 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 3 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion). First attachment description: Motion for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) Memorandum of Law . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Exhibit 2 MSA as fully executed on 6.30.23, #3 Exhibit 3 Scott Sumy Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 Michael London Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 Paul Napoli Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 Layn Phillips Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 Beth Fegan Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 Angeion Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 Dustin Mire Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 Matthew Garretson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 Rob Hesse Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 Timothy Raab Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 Dr. Michael Trapp Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 Dr. Prithviraj Chavan Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 Dr. Robert Mitzel Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 Robyn Griffin Declaration)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Motion) by Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael) Modified on 7/11/2023 to reference 3393 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; 4 in 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) Additional Attachments filed 7/10/2023(sshe, ).
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:23-cv-03230-RMG City of Camden et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al. For good cause shown, the Court grants 3384 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (1) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG) Motion for enlargement of pages. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, For Certification of Settlement Class and for Permission to Disseminate Class Notice by Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(London, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Camden et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Camden
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Brockton
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sioux Falls
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Water Service Company
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Delray Beach
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Township of Verona
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Shore
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Freeport
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinsburg Municipal Authority
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seaman Cottages
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Bridgeport
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Benwood
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niagara County
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pineville
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Iuka
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Michael A London
Represented By: Paul J Napoli
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Elizabeth Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont de Nemours Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of California
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of New York
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of North Carolina
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Guam
Represented By: William J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Annadel Angeline Almendras
Represented By: Janelle Muriel Smith
Represented By: Sarae Snyder
Represented By: William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California State Water Resources Control Board
Represented By: Annadel Angeline Almendras
Represented By: Janelle Muriel Smith
Represented By: Sarae Snyder
Represented By: William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?