Owens et al v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Roderick M Owens and Dwayne Jordan
Defendant: Ricky Hill, FNU Watkins, f/n/u Gross, Unknown Member, Tennessee Department of Corrections /CoreCivic Commissioner, David Sextor, Chance Leeds, P. Watkins, T. Gross, C. Neal, T. Towles, K. Bonner, L. Jackson, Tasma Robertson and Justin Grant
Case Number: 1:2024cv01096
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
April 30, 2024 Filing 18 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (gkp)
April 30, 2024 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-01093. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Proceeding pro se, state inmate Roderick Owens filed a "Writ of Mandamus" under 28 U.S.C. 1651 (Doc. No. #1 ) and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Because it appears from the plaintiff's IFP application that he lacks the funds to pay the entire filing fee in advance, that application (Doc. No. #6 ) is GRANTED and a $350 filing fee is ASSESSED. The warden of the facility in which the plaintiff is currently housed, as custodian of his trust account, is DIRECTED to submit to the Clerk of Court, as an initial payment. Plaintiff's Moton for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #12 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk SHALL file Doc. No. #12 -1 as the Amended Complaint in this matter. For the foregoing reasons, the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Eastern Division. In light of the transfer, the plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel (Doc. Nos. #7 and #11 ) are DENIED without prejudice. His motion to ascertain status (Doc. No. #14 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court MUST send a copy of this order to the warden of the facility in which the plaintiff is currently housed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 04/30/24. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. A copy of this Order mailed to the warden.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against K. Bonner, Justin Grant, T. Gross, Ricky Hill, L. Jackson, Chance Leeds, C. Neal, Tasma Robertson, David Sextor, Tennessee Department of Corrections /CoreCivic Commissioner, T. Towles, P. Watkins, filed by Roderick M. Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-1 and O (various documents))(ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
April 2, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Ascertain Status of Writ of Mandaums re #11 , #12 by Roderick M. Owens. (unsigned) (Copy of docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff.) (ad) Modified on 4/2/2024 (ad). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 Letter requesting notification of filings from Roderick Owens. (docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff.) (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Roderick M. Owens. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit C-I and O various documents)(ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Roderick M. Owens. (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE re Summons by Roderick M. Owens (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE "New Petition Filings Within the Court Jurisdiction Writ of Mandamus all Writs Act of Law: Under 28 U.S.C 1651" by Roderick M. Owens (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 Letter from Roderick Owens. (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Roderick M. Owens. (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Roderick M. Owens. (ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court recently received a petition for a writ of mandamus under 28 U.S.C. 1651 (Doc. No. #1 ) and an application to proceed as a pauper (Doc. No. #3 ) mailed from Whiteville Correctional Facility. As explained in the cover letter that accompanied these filings, both filings were prepared and signed by inmate Dewayne Jordan on behalf of inmate Roderick Owens. As Jordan himself recognizes, however, he is not a lawyer. (Id. at 1 (Jordan's cover letter referring to himself as "the non-lawyer attorney" for Owens).) And because Jordan is not a lawyer, he cannot represent other people in federal court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Jordan as a party on the docket and TERMINATE the application to proceed as a pauper signed by Jordan. (Doc. No. #3 .) If Owens wants to pursue the petition for a writ of mandamus that was filed in his name, he must personally sign it. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Owens a copy of the mandamus petition filed in his name (Doc. No. #1 ) and a blank application to proceed as a pauper for prisoners. Any application to proceed as a pauper must include a copy of Owens' inmate trust account statement covering the 6-month period before this case was filed, 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2), signed by an authorized prison official. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/08/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a copy of the mandamus petition to Owens (Doc. No. #1 ) and a blank application to proceed as a pauper for prisoners.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dwayne Jordan. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD***NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) Modified on 10/19/2023 (mg). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
October 19, 2023 Notice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 WRIT OF MANDAUMS against f/n/u Gross, Ricky Hill, Unknown Member, (f/n/u) Watkins, filed by Roderick M. Owens, Dwayne Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Cover Letter)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick M Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Member
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Corrections /CoreCivic Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sextor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Towles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasma Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?