Turner v. Food and Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration, USSOCOM, FBI, CIA, NSA, Geo Spatial, GCHQ, Secret Service, USPS, FEDEX, Pfizer, Merck and USCENTCOM
Case Number: 3:2023cv00987
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
2 Judge: Brantley Starr
3 Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that this action is summarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and malicious. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court notes that Turner is now barred from filing future actions in forma pauperis in this or any other federal court, without first obtaining leave of court to do so, and any case filed, removed, or transferred without the applicable filing fee, in which he is the plaintiff, should not be reviewed by the Court. See Turner v. Trugreen Ltd. Pship, et al., No. 3:23-CV-989-G-BK (N.D. Tex. May 11, 2023); Turner v. LegalMatch, et al., No. 3:23-CV-993-G-BK (N.D. Tex. May 11, 2023). The Court prospectively CERTIFIES that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); FED. R. APP. P. 24(a)(3). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/21/2023) (twd)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ACCEPTING #12 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/21/2023) (twd)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/8/2023) (twd)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The consolidated actions should be summarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and malicious. Turner has been barred by this Court from filing future actions in forma pauperis in this or any other federal court, without first obtaining leave of court to do so, and any case filed, removed, or transferred without the applicable filing fee, in which he is the plaintiff, should not be reviewed by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/1/2023) (axm)
May 19, 2023 Filing 11 (AMENDED) COMPLAINT against CIA, FBI, FEDEX, Food and Drug Administration, GCHQ, Geo Spatial, Merck, NSA, Pfizer, Secret Service, USCENTCOM, USPS, USSOCOM filed by Terrance Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s), #7 Additional Page(s), #8 Additional Page(s), #9 Additional Page(s), #10 Additional Page(s), #11 Additional Page(s), #12 Additional Page(s), #13 Additional Page(s), #14 Additional Page(s), #15 Additional Page(s)) (agc)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written Notice of Change of Address with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/19/2023) (chmb)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/19/2023) (chmb)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Cause Nos. 3:23-cv-00987-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00988-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00990-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00991-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00992-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01006-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01007-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01008-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01009-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01010-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01011-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01012-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01013-X-BK, and 3:23-cv-01014-X-BK are CONSOLIDATED. Henceforth all pleadings will be filed in No. 3:23-cv-00987-X-BK. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close all member cases and terminate all motions in the member cases. Also, the parties in the member cases will not be added to the lead case and all future filings will be docketed only in the lead case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/19/2023) (axm)
May 19, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document 8 Fri May 19 12:58:19 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 19, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Fri May 19 16:30:09 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 18, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu May 18 08:42:22 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 17, 2023 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. Per Order at docket 7 . (cea)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/17/2023) (chmb)
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (oyh)
May 5, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri May 5 14:38:28 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 5, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri May 5 12:06:05 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Terrance Turner. (agc)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terrance Turner. (agc)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against CIA, FBI, Food and Drug Administration, GCHQ, Geo Spatial, NSA, USSOCOM filed by Terrance Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USSOCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Spatial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCHQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCENTCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?