Salaverria v. California State et al
Plaintiff: Alex Alfonso Salaverria and Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II
Defendant: California State, Gavin Newsom, Rob Bonta, George Gascon, Michael Moore, Karen Bass, Does 1-1000, County of Los Angeles, Ricardo Garcia, Allied Universal and ABM Industries
Case Number: 3:2024cv00011
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
January 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Statement for the Record Continued Government Interference filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (cea)
January 17, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Fi;ing Letter filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (cea)
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Motion of Statement filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (cea)
January 5, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Fri Jan 5 11:09:19 CST 2024 (crt)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER: Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written "Notice of Change of Address" with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/4/2024) (chmb)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon consideration, the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. No process will issue pending completion of judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/4/2024) (chmb)
January 3, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Wed Jan 3 09:23:13 CST 2024 (crt)
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (cea)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ABM Industries, Allied Universal, Karen Bass, Rob Bonta, California State, County of Los Angeles, Does 1-1000(Los Angeles Police Department), Does 1-1000(Los Angeles Sheriffs Department (County Jail) (Norwalk)), Ricardo Garcia, George Gascon, Michael Moore, Gavin Newsom filed by Alex Alfonso Salaverria. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Cover Sheet) (cea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salaverria v. California State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Alfonso Salaverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Alfonso Salaverria, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Universal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?