Billy Julius Porter, Jr. v. Andrew Raiber

Plaintiff: Billy Julius Porter, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Raiber, David Miller and United States Of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv00640
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION to Stay Order for Scheduling Recommendation Deadlines in Effort to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 filed by United States Of America. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gilligan, James)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(aej)
August 20, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: referred #15 MOTION to Stay Order for Scheduling Recommendation Deadlines in Effort to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 1. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #15 Motion to Stay to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth "Betsy" Chestney entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Order for Scheduling Recommendation Deadlines in Effort to Comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 by United States Of America. (Gilligan, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Of America. (Gilligan, James)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 Scheduling Recommendations by Billy Julius Porter, Jr. (aej)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #4 Amended Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint by Billy Julius Porter, Jr. (aej)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States Of America. (Gilligan, James)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Referral. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Of America, David Miller filed by Billy Julius Porter, Jr.(aej)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Raiber, United States Of America amending filed by Billy Julius Porter, Jr.(aej)
June 26, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
June 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Andrew Raiber. (Gilligan, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party Notice of Substitution and Application for Order Thereon by Andrew Raiber. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit A)(Gilligan, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew Raiber (Filing fee $400), filed by Andrew Raiber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilligan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billy Julius Porter, Jr. v. Andrew Raiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Raiber
Represented By: James F. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: James F. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Julius Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?