In Re: Lumber Liquidators Chinese-Manufactured Flooring Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Dwight Spence, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell, Frank Graham, Matthew Bible, Lisa Miller, Sarah Abshier, Rodney Sowizrol, Jamie Kelly, Spencer Gubler, Angela Della Universita, Dionne Vanardo, Tara Sahn, Richard Mahoney, Liz Elson, Susan Goray, David Guinane, Alan Toth, Shirley Wells, Vernon Haseman, Thomas E. Loehn, Jason Snyder, A. G., Nydia Greene, Toni L. Gott, Scott Mabb, John Flanagan, Michael Zebley, Lumber Liquidators, Inc., Fredrick Wilkins, Darius Gandhi, Rickie Martin, Jewelia Chavez, Richard J. Grisko, Brandon Mcdonald, Maria Carmen Smith, Michael Ballerini, Scott Neuhaus, Bruce Guest, Joshua Ashley, D. G., Don Pickett, Richard Martinez, Floyd Beech, Betty Redding, Samantha Bechel, Jon Cockson, Colette Bryant, Charmaine Hurst, Hope Copenheaver, Laura Gonzalez, Darlene White, Twala Scott, david bortnick, Kevin DeVries, Nicole Alonso, Linda Wetzel, Jeff Coday, Beatrice Bell, Thalia Vincent, Monica Hensen, Laura Washington, Leticia Ruiz, Michelle Lewis, Cindy Bennet, Tracy Cockson, Michael May, Cortney Eley, Maria Viera, Andrew M. Karlick, Joaquin F Badias, Jim Towrey, Blake Scott, Sr., Daniel Michael Snickles, Derek Banka, Teresa Wilson, Tammie Ben-Efraim, Mario Raygoza, Donald Fugate, Terri Thompson, Romualdo Ronquillo, Heather Snyder, Genevieve Baldwin, Chad Hopkins, Patrice Hughes, Cami Stein, Jacqueline Crawford, Joseph Michael Balero, Dana Lemaster, A.G., Elizabeth Davis-Berg, James Barry Northern, Qudsia Awan, Pat Barry, Richard O'Connor, Jamie Schaefer, Shari Collins, Russell A. Ezovski, Rae Ann McMeekin, Alan Spivak, Amanda Casali, Adriana Scotti, Maarten Verhoeven, Kyle Beerbohm, Sara Clouden, Joseph Bennett, Sheryl Hulse, Omran Chaudhary, Carol Franklin, Rosonna Garvey, Karen Githens, Joan Kahn, Cathleen Lester, Lynn Stock, Casandra Barrett, Judy Happe Humes, Kevin Parnella, Susan McNutt, Raymond Higgins, Scott Carl, Yvette Gilmore, Rachael Craig, Theresa Labree, Kenneth Heistand, Lauryn C. Holloway, Miriam Jensen, Haridimos Kanellopoulos, George Buccigrosssi and Kerry Constatine
Defendant: EDLab Environmental Diagnostics Laboratory, Lumber Liquidators, Unknown Parties and Robert Clark Flooring LLC
In Re: In Re: Lumber Liquidators Chinese-Manufactured Flooring Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation
Interested Party: Brice M. Johnston
Case Number: 1:2015md02627
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 1923 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 1922 Transcript Order Acknowledgment from USCA re #1913 Notice of Appeal : Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery. (rban, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1921 ORDER granting (1920) Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 1920 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1919 ORDERED that the hearing for Motion for Summary Judgment currently scheduled in this matter for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to 11/4/2020 at 10:00 a.m. via ZOOM. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 10/7/2020.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1918 ORDER of USCA as to #1909 Notice of Appeal filed by Brice M. Johnston, #1913 Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. The court consolidates Case No. 20-2036 and Case No. 20-2037. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and the parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case. (rban, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1917 USCA Case Number 20-2037 4th Circuit, Case Manager J. Moore for #1909 Notice of Appeal filed by Brice M. Johnston. (rban, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1916 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and General Denial by Carla J Kappel. (aott, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1915 USCA Case Number 20-2036 4th Circuit; Case Manager: J. Moore for #1913 Notice of Appeal filed by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (aott, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1914 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1913 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (rban, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1913 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1898 MDL Order,,,,, by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-7416247. (Clore, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1912 ORDER granting #1903 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/24/2020. (rban, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 1911 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 14683086647 re #1909 Notice of Appeal filed by Brice M. Johnston (rban, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 1910 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1909 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (rban, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 1909 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1898 MDL Order, by Brice M. Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1908 ORDER granting (1906) Motion for Pro hac vice in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 20, 2020 Filing 1907 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/19/20 (Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives Continued from July 29, 2020), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1906 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Anspch. (aott, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 ORDERED that the Settlement Administrator shall, no later than 90 days after entry of this Court's 9/3/2020 Order, distribute cash from the Escrow Account and the voucher portion of the Settlement to qualified claimants in the manner set forth in the Settlement Agreement. The Settlement Administrator is directed to post this Order on the class action website. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1904 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flannery, Diane)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1903 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert J Augenlicht and Certification of Local Counsel. (aott, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 1902 Declaration re #1901 NOTICE of Filing of Accounting by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Toll, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1901 NOTICE by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch Notice of Filing of Accounting (Toll, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 ORDERED that, on or before 9/15/2020, Class Counsel shall deposit into the Escrow Account the interest that would have accrued on the attorneys' fees, costs and expenses previously-withdrawn from the Escrow Account pursuant to Paragraph 12(B) of the Settlement Agreement from the date of disbursement(s) through the Effective Date, September 3, 2020, and shall file with the Court an appropriate accounting. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02825-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 1899 Certified Copy of CTO 52 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1898 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives #1644 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiffs are awarded reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $10.08 million; that twelve service awards of $5,000 each shall be paid to each named Plaintiff or household in the Formaldehyde MDL and the Durability MDL representative complaints; that Objector Diana Cantu-Guerrero's Motion to Enforce Settlements #1887 and Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement #1895 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motions are granted to the extent that Class Counsel shall, within 7 days of the date of this Order, deposit into the Escrow Account the interest that would have accrued on the attorneys' fees, costs and expenses previously-withdrawn from the Escrow Account pursuant to Paragraph 12(B) of the Settlement Agreement from the date of disbursement(s) through the Effective Date, 9/3/2020, and shall file with the Court an appropriate accounting. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDERED that both the Formaldehyde MDL and the Durability MDL shall be administratively closed, the time to appeal the Court's 10/9/2018 Order #1705 or the Court's 1/31/2019 Order #1774 having expired and those Orders no longer being subject to further adjudication or appeal; and nothing in this Order shall be deemed to create a new appealable order with respect to either the Settlement Agreement or to otherwise extend the time in which to file another appeal from either the Court's 10/9/2018 order or the Court's 1/31/2019 Order. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 1896 Memorandum in Support re #1895 Amended MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Return Class Funds filed by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clore, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1895 Amended MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Return Class Funds by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clore, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1894 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Docket Call re: Application for Attorney's Fees held on 8/19/2020 as a continuation of the previous hearing held on 7/29/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom. Matter argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
August 15, 2020 Filing 1893 Response to #1886 Docket Call,,, Set Hearings,, filed by Brice M. Johnston. (, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1892 BRIEF by Diana Cantu-Guerrero Concerning Attorneys' Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clore, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1891 Memorandum in Support re #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Wallace with Exhibits in Support of Class Counsel's Second Supplemental Brief)(Toll, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1890 BRIEF by Lumber Liquidators in Response to Court's Order Regarding Attorneys' Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(Flannery, Diane)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 ORDERED, that the plaintiff is granted a 10 day extension to respond to Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 8/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1888 Memorandum in Support re #1887 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Return Class Funds filed by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clore, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1887 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Return Class Funds by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clore, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1885 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/29/20 (Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2020.(montgomery, rhonda) (Main Document 1885 replaced on 8/19/2020) (rban, ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 1886 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Docket Call held on 7/29/2020. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant via Zoom. With respect to attorneys' fees, the parties are directed to confer and attempt to come to an agreement on an appropriate resolution. Any filings to that effect are to be submitted by 8/14/2020. Docket Call set for 8/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. This matter comes before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) report. Based on the parties' representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/29/2020 has been cancelled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings: The Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 7/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 1883 NOTICE by Diana Cantu-Guerrero re Supplement to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement to Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Clore, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Docket Call re Application for attorney's fees set for 7/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1882 ORDERED that a hearing on the Application be, and the same hereby is, SCHEDULED for Wednesday, 7/29/2020 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing will be via ZOOM, with instructions to follow. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 ORDER granting #1868 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Time Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 7/15/2020. (aott)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1879 Reply to Motion re #1868 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Time Records filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Toll, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1880 Letter re Distribution of Settlement funds by Richard Saunders. (aott)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1878 NOTICE to Discontinue NEFs. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 1877 Opposition to Motion to Seal filed by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Clore, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Set Scheduling Order Deadline: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (rban, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1876 ORDER regarding the discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 6/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 1875 Memorandum in Support re #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 McNamara Declaration ISO Reply, #2 Robertson Declaration II ISO Reply, #3 Barnett Declaration II ISO Reply, #4 Exhibit A to Barnett Declaration II, #5 Errata B to Barnett Declaration II)(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1874 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #1869 Memorandum in Support,,. Exhibit A to Declaration of A. Robertson(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1873 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #1869 Memorandum in Support,,. Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Lopez(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1872 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #1869 Memorandum in Support,,. Exhibit A to Declaration of A. Barnett(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1871 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #1869 Memorandum in Support,,. Exhibit A to Declaration of D. McNamara(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1870 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch re #1868 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Time Records (Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1869 Memorandum in Support re #1868 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Time Records filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Barnett Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A to Barnett Decl., #3 McNamara Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, #4 Exhibit A to McNamara Decl., #5 Lopez Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, #6 Exhibit A to Lopez Decl., #7 Robertson Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, #8 Exhibit A to Robertson Decl.)(Toll, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1868 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Time Records by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toll, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1867 Notice to Discontinue receipt of Notices of Electronic Filing in this case by Dan Johnson [Notice to Discontinue NEF for Francis J. Balint, Jr.] (Balint, Francis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1866 Notice to Discontinue receipt of Notices of Electronic Filing in this case by Dan Johnson [Notice to Discontinue NEF for Andrew S. Friedman] (Balint, Francis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1865 Response in Opposition re (19 in 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
June 12, 2020 Reset Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (rban, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1864 ORDERED that the previous order setting a status conference in this matter is amended. The status conference shall be held telephonically on 6/24/2020 at 1:00 p.m. The Court will issue a scheduling order at that time whether counsel has been retained or not. Plaintiffs must advise the court if counsel has been retained within 9 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 6/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, copies mailed to pro se plaintiffs)
June 11, 2020 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Dismissal Hearing set for 6/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claims for Relief, to be held in this matter on 6/19/2020 at 10:00 a.m. via videoconference be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Wednesday, 6/24/2020 at 11:00 a.m. via videoconference. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
June 11, 2020 Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (rban, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1862 ORDERED that a status conference in this matter shall be held telephonically on 6/24/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The status conference at which plaintiffs failed to appear was set for the purpose of providing plaintiffs with the opportunity to retain counsel. Plaintiffs are hereby placed on notice that the Court will issue a scheduling order on 6/24/2020 whether or not plaintiffs have retained counsel. Plaintiffs are directed to advise the Court in writing if counsel has been retained within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 6/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, copies mailed to pro se plaintiffs )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1861 ORDERED that the deadline for the Settlement Class Counsel to file their reply in support of their Motion shall be 6/22/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1860 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1859 Memorandum in Opposition, #1858 Memorandum by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Reply Brief)(Toll, Steven)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1859 Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees. (Clore, Robert)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1858 Memorandum in Opposition to to Class Counsels' supplemental briefing in support of their application for attorney's fees to #1843 Memorandum in Support, #1855 MDL Order, filed by Brice M. Johnston. (, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1857 ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to return to Ms. Cantu-Guerrero her appeal bond. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ORDER granting #1853 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 5/28/2020. (rban, )
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1855 Ordered that Class Members Brice M. Johnson and Diana Cantu-Guerrero shall have up to and including 6/4/2020, to submit their response to Class Counsels' supplemental briefing in support of their application for attorney's fees and the deadline for any reply by Lead Class Counsel shall be 6/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 1854 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1842 MDL Order, Unopposed by Brice M. Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting an Extension of Time)(, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1853 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert William Clore by Diana Cantu-Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 1852 Notice Regarding Representation by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch (Toll, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1851 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, Supplemental Declaration of Settlement Administrator by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Toll, Steven)
May 11, 2020 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Dismissal Hearing set for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1850 Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Defendant shall file its Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support on 6/1/2020. Plaintiff shall filed any Response in Opposition no later than 6/15/2020. A hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby noticed and shall take place via videoconference on 6/19/2020. The Court will provide the parties with further details before the date of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 5/11/2020.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1849 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of R. Ahdoot in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Ahdoot)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1848 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of A. Robertson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of A. Robertson)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1847 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of D. Bryson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Bryson)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1846 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of R. Lopez in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Lopez)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1845 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1844 Declaration re #1843 Memorandum in Support, of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives)(Toll, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1843 Memorandum in Support re #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives Supplemental Memorandum filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Toll, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1842 ORDERED that Lead Class Counsel file their supplemental briefing on or before 5/7/2020; that Defendant Lumber Liquidators and any objecting class members file any brief in response to Lead Class Counsel's Application on or before 5/21/2020; that Lead Class Counsel file any reply brief on or before 5/27/2020; See Order for more details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/22/2020.(rban, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1841 MOTION for Extension until May 7, 2020 to file a supplemental brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Service Awards by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch, In Re: Lumber Liquidators Chinese-Manufactured Flooring Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toll, Steven)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1840 Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Power. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1839 Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admissionof Halli Dee Cohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1838 Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Power. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Halli Dee Cohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:20-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1836 Order granting #1835 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/8/2020. (rban, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1835 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1834 Rule 16(B) Scheduling Order. The Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 4/3/2020.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 ORDERED that Lead Class Counsel file a supplemental brief in support of its application for attorney's fees and costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1712 on or before 4/23/2020; that Defendant Lumber Liquidators and any objecting class member file any brief in response to Lead Class Counsel's Application on or before 5/7/2020; that Lead Class Counsel file any reply brief on or before 5/13/2020. This Court will schedule a hearing once it reviews the briefs if it determines that a hearing would aid the decisional process. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/2/2020. (rban, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 1832 USCA Mandate re #1750 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 3/10/2020, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of FRAP. (rban, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 1831 Certified Copy of Transfer Order Entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 3/30/2020. (rban, )
March 27, 2020 Per MSN chambers the initial pretrial conference has been cancelled - Per JH (clar, )
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1830 Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Thomas M. West. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 3/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 1829 USCA JUDGMENT as to #1750 Notice of Appeal directing that in accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed in part and vacated in part. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision.This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate inaccordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (aott)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1828 Published Opinion of USCA (Copy) re #1750 Notice of Appeal directing that this matter is affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded. The attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (Attachments: #1 Opinion Attachment)(aott)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1827 ORDER granting Pro hac vice as to Halli Dee Cohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/5/2020. (aott)
February 27, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (rban, )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1826 Order Setting deadlines for Rule 16(b) conference, filing an amended complaint, filing a responsive pleading to the amended complaint, discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff 2/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02823-AJT-MSN(rban, )
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1825 SO ORDERED re Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 1/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-MSN(rban, )
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1824 ORDER granting (1822) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jacob Michael Robinson in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-MSN, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-MSN(rban, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 1823 Certified Copy of CTO 50 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Case has already been received.) (rban, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1822 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jacob Michael Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1821 NOTICE of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order 50. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02824-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1820 Certified Copy of Transfer Order entered by the United State Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1819 ORDER directing that defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 12, civil action 1:19-cv-2821(AJT/TRJ)is Granted, and that action is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/23/2019. (aott)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1818 ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiff Tiffany Stein be, and the same hereby are, dismissed without prejudice. See order for more details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 8/7/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1817 BRIEF by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ(Lacy, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1816 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1815 So OEDERED re #1814 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1814 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1813 NOTICE by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch of Withdrawal of Counsel Sally Handmaker Guido (Toll, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1812 Memorandum in Support re (1811 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 12 in 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Summary Judgment by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ(Lacy, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1811 MOTION Summary Judgment by Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ(Lacy, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 ORDER granting (1805) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ashley Walker Winsky terminated in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 Order granting #1800 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Yechezkel Rodal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1808 Order granting #1801 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas John Patti III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1807 SO Ordered re #1806 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/24/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1806 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1805 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Ashley Winsky by In Re: Lumber Liquidators Chinese-Manufactured Flooring Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel)(Winsky, Ashley)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 SO ORDERED re #1803 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1803 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDERED that the Parties are directed to appear before the Magistrate Judge for a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference on a date and time to be determined by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1801 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas John Patti III. Associated Cases:19-cv-2822 AJT-TRJ. (aott)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1800 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Yechezkel Rodal. Associated Cases:19-cv-2822 AJT-TRJ. (aott)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1799 Order granting #1797 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Power and #1798 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Halli Dee Cohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1798 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Halli Dee Cohn. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1797 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Power. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02822-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1796 ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear before the Magistrate Judge for a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference on a date and time to be determined by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/8/2019.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:19-cv-02821-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 1795 Certified Copy of CTO 48 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 SO ORDERED #1791 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 SO ORDERED re #1792 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 1792 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(Gann, Andrew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1791 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Gann, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 Third Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 4/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 1789 Certified Copy of CTO 47 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
April 13, 2019 Filing 1788 Memorandum in Support re (116 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Under Local Rule 7(F)(3) Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Exceed Page Limitation Under Local Rule 7(F)(3) Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Exceed Page Limitation Under Local Rule 7(F)(3). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
April 13, 2019 Filing 1787 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Under Local Rule 7(F)(3) Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Exceed Page Limitation Under Local Rule 7(F)(3). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
April 5, 2019 Motion for Reconsideration #1786 is resolved by order at #1786 . (rban, )
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1786 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 4/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 Order re: #101 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 3/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1784 ORDERED that this Court's Order entered on September 14, 2018 #1683 is vacated. The parties have reached an agreed upon settlement; therefore, the Court declines to impose any sanctions upon Plaintiffs or Plaintiffs' counsel and vacates the Order entered on September 14, 2018 #1683 . Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/22/2019. (dzir)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/22/2019. (dzir)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1782 Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/22/2019. (dzir)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1781 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Sealed Minutes held on 3/22/2019 as to Telephonic Status Conference. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 1780 Plaintiff Cami Stein's Reply to Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(B). (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1779 NOTICE of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1778 Memorandum in Support re (1777 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Protective Order Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Errata 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1777 MOTION for Protective Order Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1776 Memorandum in Opposition re (218 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Reconsideration/Relief from 1/16/2019 Order on Motion to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiff's Expert James Dahlgren Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(B). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1775 MOTION for Reconsideration/Relief from 1/16/2019 Order on Motion to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiff's Expert James Dahlgren Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b). (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1774 Order of Dismissal and Judgment. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 1/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1773 MOTION re: Rule 72 Objections to the Magistrate's Order on Motion to Exclude Opinion of Plaintiff's Expert James Dahlgren Filed 01/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 18, 2019 Correction: Motion #1740 terminated as moot per Judge Jones. Motion #1758 was granted by order entered at #1771 . See that order for details. (rban, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1772 BRIEF by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Proposed Rule 41(a)(2) Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1771 Order on Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Dahlgren. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 1/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 16, 2019 Motion #1758 Terminated as Moot per Judge Jones. (rban, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 SO ORDERED re #1769 NOTICE by Lin Doss Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 1/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1769 NOTICE by Lin Doss Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1768 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re #1758 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Opposition (Redmond, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1767 Memorandum in Support of Proposed Rule 41(a)(2) Dismissal by Cami Stein. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1766 ORDER of USCA as to #1750 Notice of Appeal filed by Brice M. Johnston. The Court consolidates Case No. 18-2351 and Case No. 18-2490. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case. (rban, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1765 Order granting #1761 Joint MOTION re (1727 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T. Rawles Jones, Jr. 1/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1764 SO ORDERED re: #1763 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 1/4/2018.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 1763 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1762 Memorandum in Support re (1761 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION re (1727 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order to Amend Scheduling Order . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1761 Joint MOTION re (1727 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order to Amend Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1760 Memorandum in Support re (1742 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1759 Memorandum in Support re (1758 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert Lumber Liquidators' Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1758 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiff's Substitute Expert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #1750 Notice of Appeal (dest, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1757 NOTICE by Sung Choe . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1756 NOTICE by David Thomas, Kathy Thomas . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1755 NOTICE by Kevin Parnella [Proposed] Order of Dismissal and Judgment (Toll, Steven)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1754 Letter from the 4th Circuit requesting the transmittal of record. (dest, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 1753 USCA Case Number 18-2490 4th Circuit, Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #1750 Notice of Appeal filed by Brice M. Johnston. (dest, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 1752 Memorandum in Support re (1748 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Proposed Rule 41(a)(2) Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1751 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1750 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (rban, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1750 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1726 MDL Order, by Brice M. Johnston. Filing fee $ 505. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rban, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1749 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Notice of Filing in Case No. 1:17-cv-02813 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redmond, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 Order on Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 12/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(aott)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 Order granting Stay; directing that this stay shall last for forty-five (45) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 12/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ(aott)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1746 Memorandum in Support re (1733 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss re (45 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) Amended Complaint Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc. and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1745 Memorandum in Support re (1733 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss re (45 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) Amended Complaint Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc. and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 ORDERED that Class Member Diana Cantu-Guerrero's Motion to Deny Appeal Bond is GRANTED to the extent that Ms. Cantu-Guerrero shall post an appeal bond in the amount of $7,500 to ensure payment of the appeal costs provided for in the Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 39(e) and the Motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 1743 Memorandum in Support re (1742 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1742 MOTION to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1741 Memorandum in Support re (1740 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support for Its Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1740 MOTION to Compel Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion to Compel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1739 Memorandum in Opposition re (1733 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 50 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss re (45 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) Amended Complaint Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDERED that Elijah Karriem's entire case and all his claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 12/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1737 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (1736 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1736 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1735 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/3/18 (Settlement Approval Hearing), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019.(montgomery, rhonda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1734 Memorandum in Support re (1733 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 61 in 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 50 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Dismiss re (45 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) Amended Complaint Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1733 MOTION to Dismiss re (45 in 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ) Amended Complaint Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s and Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 Order, for the reasons stated in Plaintiff Doss's motion for an extension of time #1728 , the Court finds that the requested relief is justified. The motion is accordingly GRANTED, and the time for file an amended complaint in this action is extended through 1/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 11/26/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 1731 Letter to the court re: Withdrawal of Objection. (rban, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1730 Amended Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1729 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1728 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Lin Doss. (Zeman, Amy)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1727 Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 11/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 Order re: Attorneys' Fees. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 Scheduling Order for Opt-Out Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 11/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1724 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1723 MOTION to Sever and for a Change of Venue. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ(rban, ) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct the file date(rban, ).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1722 Order granting #1717 Joint MOTION to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 10/29/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1721 Response to #1714 MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiff Lin Doss' Statement Concerning Pre-Trial Proceedings filed by A.G., Brandon Abshier, Sarah Abshier, Eli Adam, Joann Adaska, Miguel Alonso, Nicole Alonso, Robert H Alton, Don Ameye, Brenda Anderson, Linda J. Arons, Joshua Ashley, Nicole Ashley, Larry Attansio, Rita Attansio, Joaquin F Badias, Andrew Bailey, Joanna Bailey, Michael Bailey, Barbara Balderson, Thomas Balderson, Genevieve Baldwin, Joseph Michael Balero, Michael Ballerini, Derek Banka, William Banner, Casandra Barrett, Kenneth Barrett, Deanna Barrios, Abby Barron, Cindy Barry, Pat Barry, Roland Bartley, Samantha Bechel, Christopher Beckman, Peter Bednarski, Arlene Beech, Floyd Beech, Kyle Beerbohm, Sarah Beerbohm, Beatrice Bell, Russell Edward Bell, Tammie Ben-Efraim, Shlomo Benefraim, Cindy Bennet, Joseph Bennett, Nicholas Bennett, Noah L Bennett, Jr, Robert Bennett, Joshua Berg, Matthew Bible, Teresita Bible, Sarah Bloomfield, Jenene Boardman, Jonathan Boardman, Matthew Bogler, Kristina Bolling-Owen, Devonne Bowling, Kristin Brandt, Ryan Brandt, Scott and MaryAnne Bray, Constance Brody, Randall Brody, Bert Mahlon Brown III, Colette Bryant, Gregory H. Bryant, George Buccigrosssi, Diane B Buckner, Shawn Burke, Matthew Burns, Demetri Bychkowski, Sherry Bychkowski, C.A.H., C.M.H., Michael Caiola, Ryan Calderon, Scott Carl, Amanda Casali, Stephen Champion, Dennis Chapman, Anthony Chavez, Jewelia Chavez, Valerie Chavez, Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, Julie Christman, Christi L. Clark, Jason D. Clark, Devin Clouden, Sara Clouden, Brian Coats, Jon Cockson, Tracy Cockson, Jeff Coday, Lindsay Coday, Shari Collins, Jerome Condra, Kerry Constatine, Shelly Conte, Bradley Copenheaver, Hope Copenheaver, Patricia Cottington(an individual on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), Patricia Cottington(an individual, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated), James Cox, Michelle Cox, Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig, Jacqueline Crawford, David Cross, Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler, Jayme Davidson, Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Kevin DeVries, Joseph A. Del Braccio, Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch, Theresa Devillier, Linda Doremus, Lin Doss, Jay Duckworth, Tammy Duckworth, Matthew Dunn, Judith Dursi, Monty Earl, Cortney Eley, Evangeline Ellis, Liz Elson, Mark Emilio, Cassie Erga, Elizabeth Errett, Robert Espenschied, Russell A. Ezovski, James Kelly Fair, Susan Fajkus, Kara Fitterer, James Fitzgerald, John Flanagan, Daniel Flores, Mindi Flores, David Fox, Carol Franklin, Gregory Franklin, Donald Fugate, Ruth Fugate, Steve Fultineer, A. G., D. G., G.A., Darius Gandhi, Victor Garcia, Rosonna Garvey, Bryan Gaus, Danielle Gaus, Adam Gentry, Steven Ghiggeri, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman, Yvette Gilmore, Shawn Ginn, Angela Giorlando, Jennifer Gipp, Karen Githens, Laura Gonzalez, James Goray, Susan Goray, Toni L. Gott, Frank Graham, Jerry Green, Nydia Greene, Ronald Greene, Derek Griffiths, Richard J. Grisko, Arlen Grossman, Nicole Groton, Alyssa Gubler, Spencer Gubler, Bruce Guest, Barbara Guidry, Glenn Guidry, Amanda Guinane, David Guinane, Stacy Hahlen, Dora D Hall, Eric Hall, Judy Happe Humes, Irma Haseman, Vernon Haseman, Jim Heilman, Linda Heilman, Susette Hein, Kenneth Heistand, Rhea Heistand, Craig Henry, Jamie Henry, Monica Hensen, Eva Herbstova, Lynne Hesney, Solomon Hesney, Denisse Higgins, Raymond Higgins, Lauryn C. Holloway, Chad Hopkins, Patrice Hughes, David Hulse, Sheryl Hulse, Flora Hunter, Harvey Hurd, Melinda Hurd, Charmaine Hurst, Patty Irving, GREGORY JEGOU, IVY JEGOU, Eric Jacek, Fannie Jackson, Mark Jackson, Jeannate Jardine, Melanie Jeffcoat, Wilbur Jeffries, Brenda Jenkins, Miriam Jensen, Dan Johnson, Sarah Johnson, Stephen Johnson, Kathy T Jones, Rynelle Joseph, KB 1, KB 2, Joan Kahn, Thomas Kamm, Haridimos Kanellopoulos, Mary Kanellopoulos, Andrew M. Karlick, Carinne D. Karlick, Elijah Karriem, Jamie Kelly, Sherry Kisielius, Mary Kleinsasser, William Kluesner, Michelle Kolchins, Randall Kolchins, Justin Korona, Robert Kowalski, Alexander Kumnik, Lisa Kumnik, Theresa Labree, William Langston, Karen Lapratt, Ronald Lapratt, Jeffery Lee Larkins, Sara Latta, Laura Messer, Dana Lemaster, Paul Lessick, Cathleen Lester, Jack Lester, Herve Levy, Michelle Lewis, Sherry Liggins, Andrew Lipski, Corie Lipski, Rachel M. Loehn, Thomas E. Loehn, Claire Loup, Lumber Liquidators, Inc., Craig Lyznick, Scott Mabb, Toby MacDonald, Richard Mahoney, Stacie Mahoney, Pamela Marable, Lynn Marino, William Marmonti, Rickie Martin, Richard Martinez, Deberah Matthews, Kristin May, Michael May, Doreen McCray, Erik McDonald, Kari McDonald, L. Dianne McGreevy, Tabitha McHugh, Thomas McHugh, Rae Ann McMeekin, Susan McNutt, Brandon Mcdonald, Rosa Medina, Stewart Messer, Lisa Miller, Russell Mitchem, Wanda Mitchem, Amanda Molina, Angel Molina, Lauren Moreland, Christina Morris, Colton Morris, Heather Morris, Omar Morris, Rick Musgrave, Amy Myers, Jared Myers, Donia Neuhaus, Scott Neuhaus, James Barry Northern, Phyllis Nugent, Daniel Nunez, Richard O'Connor, Shari Orland, Geresa Orlik, Helyn Palmer, Mildred Parks, Kevin Parnella, George W Parsley, Jr, Lindel Perkins, Ronnie Perkins, Karen Pesce, Jacob Peterman, Beth Petho, Christine Pettijohn, Thomas P. Phelan, Peter Picard, Don Pickett, Stacey Pickle, Meri Pinelli, Eric Pinter, Miguel Prada, Salil Prasad, Pauline Rasmussen, Val Rasmussen, Mario Raygoza, Betty Redding, Mark Reyes, Caitlin Reznicek, Chelsey Reznicek, Dana Reznicek, Johnnie Reznicek, Danny R Roach, Terri Roberts, Alan Robson, Maria Ronquillo, Romualdo Ronquillo, Joseph Roth, Louann Rounds, Robert Rounds, Leticia Ruiz, Alfredo Russo, Justine Russo, Michael Sahn, Tara Sahn, Paul Said, Deborah Sampson, Douglas Sampson, George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez, Rogelio Sanchez, Jr, Shanna Sands-Muigal, Jennifer Sbarboro, Susan Schaber, Jamie Schaefer, Carrie Schafer, Joshua Schneider, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz(as Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Merlin Schwartz, Patricia Schwartz, Blake Scott, Sr, Cora Scott, Robert Scott, Twala Scott, Adriana Scotti, Mark Scotti, Constance Shannon, James Silverthorn, Robert Sirrine, James Sizemore, Daniel Skehan, Maria Carmen Smith, Robert Smith, Daniel Michael Snickles, Heather Snyder, Jason Snyder, Francesca Sommo, Thomas Sommo, Rodney Sowizrol, Dwight Spence, Mitchell Spence, Alan Spivak, Cami Stein, Tiffany S. Stein, Karen Steinlauf, William Steinlauf, Paul Steinmetz, Lynn Stock, Nicholas Strudgeon, Daniel Tacktill, Cindy Terrazas, Melissa Tesoro, Rick Tesoro, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas, Cyndy Thompson, Terri Thompson, Alan Toth, Patricia Toth, Jim Towrey, Andrew Tressler, Benjamin Turner, Keala Tyler, John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell, Harry Udit, Angela Della Universita, Dionne Vanardo, Bartholomew Vandrell, Maarten Verhoeven, Stacy Vickery, Jacqueline Vietz, Terry Vietz, Thalia Vincent, LYNN GIBSON WRIGHT, Clay Wagner, Scott Walker, Geneva Ware, Karen Warshaw, Laura Washington, Lila Washington, Brett Watson, Lindsey Watson, Earl Wells, Shirley Wells, Linda Wetzel, Adam White, Darlene White, Julia White, Alfred Wiggs, Susan Wiggs, Fredrick Wilkins, Tania Wilkins, John Williams, Kandria Williams, Todd Williams, Teresa Wilson, Carol Wineman, Eric Wolverton, Norma Wolverton, Mickey Yu, Michael Zebley, Laura Zurek, david bortnick, jeffrey gonzalez, tatiana leechee-sader, michael oddo, daniel pierce, Debora robb, terry robb, camil sader, gavin schneider, diana spence. (Zeman, Amy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1720 Memorandum in Support re (1719 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report of Davids E. Jacobs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1719 MOTION Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report of Davids E. Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1718 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Opt-Out Cases Pretrial Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1717 Joint MOTION to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Scheduling Order and Amending Scheduling Order. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 10/18/2018.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 1715 Cami Stein;s Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Previous Requests as Set Forth in the Notice of the Death of Plaintiff, Tiffany S. Stein, Filed Herein on 10/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan: Settlement Conference held on 10/17/2018 as to Craig v. Lumber Liquidators (1:18cv2816). Case settled. (rban, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1714 ORDERED that Defendant and any settlement class members who have opted out of the Settlement and have filed individual actions that have been transferred to this Court by the JPML as part of either the Formaldehyde Litigation or the Durability Litigation, including but not limited to the two actions named above, shall file, within 10 days of the issuance of this Order, their respective positions concerning what pre-trial discovery or other pre-trial proceedings remain outstanding and how the Court should proceed with respect to those outstanding matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 10/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 1713 MOTION For Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Lumber Liquidators' Petition for Attorney Fees Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Response)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1712 NOTICE by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas Filing Supplemental Expert Report. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1711 NOTICE by Derek Banka, Devonne Bowling, Lin Doss, Russell A. Ezovski, Sherry Liggins, Tabitha McHugh, Susan McNutt, Peter Picard, Deborah Sampson, Douglas Sampson, Robert Smith, Geneva Ware Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information (Zeman, Amy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1710 Addendum to Notice of the Death of Plaintiff, Tiffany S. Stein, on October 7, 2018 and Request for Relief. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 1709 Memorandum in Support re (1692 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Fees Regarding Dr. Sawyer's Deposition Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fee Petition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10: Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1708 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1695 MOTION Identify New Expert and Relief from Scheduling Order filed by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Edwards, Neil)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1707 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1706 NOTICE of Death of Plaintiff, Tiffany S. Stein, on October 7, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and the Class Action Settlement Agreement in Formaldehyde MDL and Durability MDL be, and the same hereby is, APPROVED; that the CARB1 Class for purchases of Chinese-manufactured laminate flooring from the Defendant from 1/1/2009 to 12/31/2010, and the CARB2/Durability Class for purchases of Chinese-manufactured laminate flooring from the Defendant from 1/1/2011 through 5/31/2015, be, and the same hereby are, CERTIIFED as Settlement Classes pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a) and (b)(3); that the Settlement Administrator post on the class action website updated information on current cash and voucher selection rates, and those rates' estimated effect on the pro rata cash award, and that the selection deadline fore class members in the CARB2/Durability Class to choose vouchers or the case award pursuant to the Settlement be, and the same hereby is, EXTENDED to 10/20/2018; that the objections filed with respect to the Settlement, be, and the same, hereby are, OVERRULED; that any objecting class member who appeals this Order shall file together with the required notice of appeal, a motion stating their position as to what appeal bond amount, if any, should be set pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 7; that the Court retains its jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the Settlement Agreement, the award of attorneys' fees, and this Order, and also its jurisdiction over those class members who have opted out of the settlement classes certified herein, including, but not limited to, those class member in pending cases that have been transferred to this Court by the JPML as part of either the Formaldehyde Litigation or the Durability Litigation. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 10/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 8, 2018 Filing 1704 Memorandum in Opposition re (1691 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Attorneys' Fees to Enforce Discovery Rights . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1703 Memorandum in Opposition re (1695 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Identify New Expert and Relief from Scheduling Order Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from the Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1702 Stein Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition re (1692 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 187 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Fees Regarding Dr. Sawyer's Deposition, (1691 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Attorneys' Fees to Enforce Discovery Rights, (189 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1694 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Amended MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Amended Declaration of Fees Regarding Dr. Sawyer's Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1701 ORDERED that the Motion for Clarification and for Miscellaneous Relief be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is granted to the extent that the Court has clarified, as set forth herein, the obligations of class members to file personally, and not through counsel, the appropriate Claim Form and filed it with the Settlement Administrator in accordance with the terms of the Settlement; it is otherwise DENIED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 10/4/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 1700 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga: Settlement Approval Hearing held on 10/3/2018. Appearance of counsel. The Court confirmed that a representative from Court call was connected. Status of the settlement put on the record by counsel. Lumber Liquidators indicated that they endorsed the settlement. Motion for attorneys' fees argued. The Court indicated that it intends to approve the settlement. The Court indicated that the results of the responses, with respect to cash or voucher, are to be posted on the MDL website, and that the date to make selections is to be extended to October 20. Motion for Clarification - Denied. (Attachments: #1 Sign in Sheet, #2 Court Call Sheet, #3 Deposition of Jill Piazza - Rec'd in open court) (Court Reporter: R. Montgomery)(tarm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1699 NOTICE by Maria Ronquillo . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Berman, Steve)
October 2, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (rban, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 1698 Stein Plaintiffs' Notice of Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 ORDER setting schedule for (1695) Motion leave to identify a new expert in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ :Defendant's response is due on October 5, 2018, and Plaintiffs' reply is due on October 9, 2018. The briefs should include reports on Counsel's availability for a telephone hearing on October 10, 11, and 12.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 10/01/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1696 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1693 MOTION for Clarification and for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas J. McNamara)(Toll, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1695 MOTION Identify New Expert and Relief from Scheduling Order . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1694 Amended MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Amended Declaration of Fees Regarding Dr. Sawyer's Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1693 MOTION for Clarification and for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1692 MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Fees Regarding Dr. Sawyer's Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1691 MOTION Attorneys' Fees Lumber Liquidators' Declaration of Attorneys' Fees to Enforce Discovery Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1690 Memorandum in Opposition re (1677 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Quash Subpoena to Legal Fulfillment Group Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Legal Fulfillment Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Correspondence with Opposing Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1689 Memorandum in Support re (140 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs David Thomas and Kathy Thomas Lumber Liquidators Inc. Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs David Thomas and Kathy Thomas. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1688 RESPONSE in Support re #1617 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas J. McNamara, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander Robertson IV, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel K. Bryson, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Robert F. Lopez, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Robert R. Ahdoot, #7 Exhibit Requests for Exclusion)(Toll, Steven)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1687 Memorandum in Opposition Lumber Liquidators' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of Remand to the Judicial Panel of Multi-District Litigation and Stay of Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1686 Memorandum in Opposition Lumber Liquidators' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of Remand to the Judicial Panel of Multi-District Litigation and Stay of Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1685 Addendum to NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel.(rban, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 ORDER ruling on motion for relief from scheduling order and second amended scheduling order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan for Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 9/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1683 ORDER dealing with request to disqualify counsel and other matters. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 9/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 1682 SEALED MOTION (pertaining to SEALED Order #1679 ). (jall)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1681 SEALED MOTION (pertaining to SEALED Order #1680 ). (jall)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/11/2018. (jall)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1679 SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/11/2018. (jall)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1678 Memorandum in Support re (91 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Quash Subpoena to Legal Fulfillment Group . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1677 MOTION Quash Subpoena to Legal Fulfillment Group . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1676 Memorandum in Support re (1655 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 181 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1675 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1674 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1673 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1672 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1671 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1670 Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/6/2018. (rban, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 1669 SEALED MOTION. (rban, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 1668 Memorandum in Opposition re (1655 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Defendant Lumber Liquidators' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from the Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1667 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Telephone Conference held on 9/6/2018. Parties present through Court Call.This matter came on for a Telephone Conference re: Petition for Approval of Minor Compromise Settlement. Based on the information provided to the Court finds the compromised settlement fair and reasonable and the Court approves the settlement. Once the executed Settlement Agreement is entered, the Court will enter the Order. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(jall) (Main Document 1667 replaced on 9/6/2018) (jall, ).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 Sealed ORDER re Sealed Motion #1665 . Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/06/2018. (jall)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1665 SEALED MOTION. (jall)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1664 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel.(rban, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1663 Memorandum in Support re (1649 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support, (1611 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order Reply in Support of Lumber Liquidators' Supplemental Motion to Modify the Court's July 19, 2018 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1661 Memorandum in Support re (140 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs David Thomas and Kathy Thomas . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 07-05-17 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Relevant portions of 04-12-18 David Thomas Deposition, #3 Exhibit 60 Minutes Program Script, #4 Exhibit Relevant portions of 02-27-18 David Thomas Fact Sheet, #5 Exhibit Relevant portions of 09-14-17 David Thomas Supplemental Fact Sheet, #6 Exhibit Relevant portions of 04-13-18 Kathy Thomas Deposition, #7 Exhibit Relevant Portions of Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Response to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, #8 Exhibit Relevant portions of 02-27-18 Kathy Thomas Fact Sheet, #9 Exhibit Relevant portions of 09-14-17 Kathy Thomas Supplemental Fact Sheet, #10 Exhibit Relevant portions of 07-19-18 Charles Schneller Deposition, #11 Exhibit 08-07-18 EMSL Analytical, Inc., Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 08-30-18 Segal, McCambridge, Singer & Mathoney, Ltd. Affidavit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1660 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs David Thomas and Kathy Thomas . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
September 4, 2018 Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/6/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on the Motions be, and the same hereby is, SCHEDULED for 9/6/2018 at 2:00 p.m. EST. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/4/2018.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1662 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1658 Memorandum in Opposition re (87 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support, of Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Modify Court's July 19, 2018 Order. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1657 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1656 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1655 MOTION. Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/10/2018. (rban, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 1654 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Status Conference held on 8/29/2018. Counsel enter their appearances and inform the court that the parties have reached a settlement. Court finds settlement to be reasonable and will enter the proposed order once the parties file the agreement. (Attachments: #1 Court Call Calendar) (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(awac, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 1655 Motion for Relief from Scheduling Order to allow late designation of an expert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, ) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit the docket text (rban, ).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1653 NOTICE by EDLab Environmental Diagnostics Laboratory to Court Requesting to Remove Attorneys Sheri M. Thome and Chad C. Butterfield from Service List. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Butterfield, Chad)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on the Motions be, and the same hereby is, SCHEDULED for 8/29/2018 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 8/28/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
August 28, 2018 Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
August 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1611 MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order . Responses due by 8/31/2018 Replies due by 9/5/2018. (rban, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1651 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1650 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (1480 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Defendant Lumber Liquidators' Notice Regarding Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1649 Memorandum in Support re (1611 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Lumber Liquidators' Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 37(b) Motion to Modify the Court's July 19, 2018 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1648 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rban, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1647 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
August 20, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1623 Declaration, #1624 Declaration, #1642 Declaration, #1630 Declaration, #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives, #1639 Declaration, #1620 Memorandum in Support, #1626 Declaration, #1627 Declaration, #1618 Memorandum in Support, #1643 Declaration, #1617 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, #1632 Declaration, #1622 Declaration, #1645 Memorandum in Support, #1625 Declaration, #1621 Exhibit, #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #1634 Declaration, #1628 Declaration, #1635 Declaration, #1646 Declaration, #1641 Declaration, #1631 Declaration, #1640 Declaration, #1637 Declaration, #1633 Declaration, #1638 Declaration. The filing user has been notified to file future documents using events found in the MDL Cases Only category in CM/ECF (this will allow the filings to be spred to proper cases). (rban, )
August 19, 2018 Filing 1646 Declaration re #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives (Substituted) Declaration of Steven J. Toll in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve)
August 19, 2018 Filing 1645 Memorandum in Support re #1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 19, 2018 Filing 1644 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Corrected) Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1643 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Robert R. Ahdoot in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1642 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Joseph Michael Balero in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1641 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Jim Moylen in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1640 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Karen Hotaling in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1639 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Kelly Ryan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1638 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Sara Clouden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1637 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Devin Clouden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1636 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Kevin Parnella in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions (1) for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives; and (2) for Final Approval of Class Settlement by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1635 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees DECLARATION OF LOGAN PEREL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS (1) FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, EXPENSES, SERVICE AWARDS TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES; AND (2) FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1634 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Shawn Burke in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1633 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Maria Ronquillo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1632 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Romualdo Ronquillo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1631 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Laura Washington in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1630 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Kristin Brandt in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1629 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Ryan Brandt in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1628 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1627 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Linda M. Dardarian in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1626 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Daniel K. Bryson in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1625 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Alexander Robertson, IV in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1624 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Alexander E. Barnett in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1623 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Steven J. Toll in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1622 Declaration re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Services Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1621 EXHIBIT Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses and Service Awards to Class Representatives by Ryan Brandt.. (Berman, Steve)
August 18, 2018 Filing 1620 Memorandum in Support re #1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, Service Awards to Class Representatives filed by Ryan Brandt. (Berman, Steve)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1619 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ryan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Berman, Steve)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1618 Memorandum in Support re #1617 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Steven J. Toll, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander Robertson)(Toll, Steven)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1617 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toll, Steven)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. On all of the foregoing findings, PI Plaintiffs' motions to compel additional Rule 30(b)(6) discovery (ECF nos. 1523, 1568, and 1596) are DENIED, and Defendant's motion for a protective order to prevent further deposition of Defendant (ECF no. 1466) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 8/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 Order. On July 19, 2018, the Court entered an order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a) granting Defendant's motion to compel discovery from the plaintiffs in Craig, et al, v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc., no. 1:18-2816. Defendant has now moved (ECF no. #1611 ) to modify and enforce that order asserting that Plaintiffs are not in compliance with its requirements. The Court construes this motion as invoking Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b). Upon consideration of the motion and the briefs in support and in opposition, and for the reasons stated in a telephone hearing on August 14, 2018, the Court finds that Plaintiffs haveviolated the July 19 order, and that Defendant is entitled to relief. It is accordingly ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b), that:1. Plaintiffs shall obtain from all of all Plaintiffs' medical care providers, and deliver to Defendant by August 31, 2018, all medical records from all medical care providers relating to any diagnosis and treatment for any condition, including well patient visits. 2. All of Defendant's discovery deadlines are suspended until the last such record is actually delivered to Defendant's counsel. The deadline for service of Defendant's expert reports shall be 45 days thereafter. 3. In all other respects the July 19 order is in full force and effect. 4. The Court holds under advisement whether to impose sanctions and whether the Court was misled at the July 19 hearing. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(cmar, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 1614 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Reply In Support of Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Modify the Court's July 19, 2018 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1613 Memorandum in Opposition re (81 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (80 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1612 Memorandum in Support re (1611 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order Memorandum in Support of Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1611 MOTION To Modify The Court's July 19, 2018 Order re (1594 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1610 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1609 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/13/18 (Status Conference), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2018.(montgomery, rhonda)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1608 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Franklin Gann, Jr on behalf of Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Gann, Andrew)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1607 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. of Appearance of Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Gann, Andrew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1606 Memorandum in Opposition re (1601 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Brief Lumber Liquidators, Inc's Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Supplemental Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1605 Memorandum in Opposition re (1596 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION re (1523 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee by Craig Plaintffs Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition of Plaintiffs' Request for Leave. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1604 Memorandum in Support re (1603 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE, Defendant Lumber Liquidators' Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Deem Its First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Admitted. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1603 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Defendant Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Deem Its First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Admitted. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2018 (rban, ).
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 8/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
August 3, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (yguy)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1601 BRIEF by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas . (Edwards, Neil)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1600 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1599 Letter Regarding Corrective and Supplemental Notice Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Weisbrot)(Toll, Steven)
July 25, 2018 Filing 1598 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/17/18 ( #1565 Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Compel), before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2018.(montgomery, rhonda)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1597 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing by telephone held on 7/24/2018 re #1523 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee filed by David Thomas, Kathy Thomas, Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, #1568 MOTION for Leave to Join in Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Defendant's 30(B)(6) Representative and Representative of Special Committee by Plainitffs, Sung and Carolyn Choe and Kathy and David Thomas and to Participate ina Single 30 (B)(6, #1468 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627,and #1466 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions .Appearances of Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant.Motions argued.The Court instructs plaintiffs counsel to file supplemental briefs within a week, by Tuesday, July 31, 2018, wrapping up whatever needs to be wrapped up.A response will be due from defense counsel a week after, Tuesday, August 7, 2018.Parties will receive a ruling from the Court soon thereafter. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(jall)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1596 MOTION re (1523 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee by Craig Plaintffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
July 23, 2018 Filing 1595 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1594 Order granting in part and taken under advisement in part #1565 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 7/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1568 MOTION for Leave to Join in Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Defendant's 30(B)(6) Representative and Representative of Special Committee by Plainitffs, Sung and Carolyn Choe and Kathy and David Thomas and to Participate ina Single 30 (B)(6, #1523 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee , #1466 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions , #1468 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1593 Stein Plaintiffs' Reply to Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition of Plaintiffs' Request for Leave. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Richard Cutler and Sharon Cutler's claims for personal injury, including, but not limited to, negligence, strict liability, conspiracy, and loss of consortium are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1589 Order of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 Order of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 Order of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 Order Approving Mino Compromise Settlement. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 Order of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1582 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 Order granting #1577 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Patrick Lanciotti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 7/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(rban, ) Modified on 7/17/2018 to correct the docket text (rban, ).
July 17, 2018 Filing 1580 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2018 re #1565 MOTION To Compel. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and GRANTED in part/taken under advisement in part. Order to follow. (Counsel to submit proposed order.) (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(cmar, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 1579 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (1578 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support, Notice of Filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1578 Memorandum in Support re (1565 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 66 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Compel Reply in Support of Lumber Liquidators' Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1577 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Patrick Lanciotti. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 1592 NOTICE of Intent to Object to the Court, Class Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. (rban, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 1576 Memorandum in Opposition re (1568 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Leave to Join in Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Defendant's 30(B)(6) Representative and Representative of Special Committee by Plainitffs, Sung and Carolyn Choe and Kathy and David Thomas and to Participate ina Single 30 (B)(6 . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1575 NOTICE by Dwight Spence Notice to Discontinue ENF (Parry, Zachariah)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1574 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig re (66 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Compel Corrected Exhibit 10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1573 Memorandum in Opposition re (66 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION To Compel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Thomas Balderson and Barbara Balderson's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Russell Mitchem and Wanda Mitchem's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 1570 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1569 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
July 2, 2018 Filing 1568 MOTION for Leave to Join in Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Defendant's 30(B)(6) Representative and Representative of Special Committee by Plainitffs, Sung and Carolyn Choe and Kathy and David Thomas and to Participate ina Single 30 (B)(6) Deposition of Defendant, Lumber Liquidators, on the Exact Same Issues Already Requested by the Choe/Thomas Plaintiffs with the Addition of Only 1 Injury Category Regarding Formaldehyde as Medically and Scientifically Known Cause of Auto Immune Diseases and Conditions, Including Lupos, Fibromyalgia, etc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1565 MOTION To Compel. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 1567 BRIEF by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
June 27, 2018 Filing 1566 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/21/2018, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tonia Harris, Telephone number 703-646-1438. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2018.(harris, tonia)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1565 MOTION To Compel. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1564 NOTICE by Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman of filing of Corrected Unopposed Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Petitions for Approval of Infant Compromise Settlements on Behalf of Individual Bednarski and Gilman Infant Plaintiffs and Correction of ECF Documents 1536, 1537, 1538, 1539, 1540, 1541, 1541, 1542, 1543 and 1545. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1563 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A Settlement Agreement on behalf of the Bednarski Infant KL.B., #2 Corrected Proposed Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Bednarski Infant KL.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1562 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order for Appointment of Shawn C. Reed as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Bednarski infant KL.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1561 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A Settlement Agreement on behalf of the minor KY.B., #2 Corrected Proposed Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Bednarski infant KY.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1560 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order for Appointment of Shawn C. Reed as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Bednarski infant KY.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1559 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement, #2 Corrected Proposed Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Gilman Infant D.G.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1558 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order for Appointment of Kevin Sullivan as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Gilman infant D.G.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1557 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement, #2 Corrected Proposed Order Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Gilman Infant AG)(Reed, Shawn)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1556 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order For Appointment of Kevin Sullivan as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of AG)(Reed, Shawn)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 ORDERED that Diane P. Flannery of McGuire Woods LLP is substituted in place of Annie C. Larson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 ORDERED that Diane P. Flannery of McGuire Woods LLP is substituted in place of Annie C. Larson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 1553 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Motion for Substitution of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Larson, Annie)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1552 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Motion for Substitution of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Larson, Annie)
June 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1523 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee . Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 1551 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Plaintiff's Amended Discovery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDERED that Plaintiff Keala Tyler's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Dwight Spence, Mitchell Spence, Diana Spence, and Dwight Spence, Jr.'s claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 1548 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. of Appearance of Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1547 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1546 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1545 NOTICE by Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman of filing Sealed Petitions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Approval of Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Bednarski and Gilman Minor Children. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1544 NOTICE by Leticia Ruiz of Change of Attorney Name and Firm Address. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ(LippSmith, Graham)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1543 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Settlement Document, #2 Proposed Order for Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Bednarski Infant KL.B)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1542 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Appointment of Shawn C. Reed as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Bednarski infant KL.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1541 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Settlement Document, #2 Proposed Order for Approving Infant Compromise Settlement on behalf of the Bednarski Infant KY.B)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1540 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Appointment of Shawn C. Reed as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Bednarski infant KY.B.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1539 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Settlement Document, #2 Proposed Order for Approving Infant Compromise Settlement)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1538 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Appointment of Kevin Sullivan as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Gilman infant D.G.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1537 Sealed Document re #1534 MDL Order, #1527 NOTICE, #1526 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Document, #2 Proposed Order for Approving Infant Compromise Settlement)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1536 Sealed Document re #1534 MDL Order, #1527 NOTICE, #1526 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Appointment of Kevin Sullivan as Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the Gilman infant A.G.)(Reed, Shawn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1535 Memorandum in Opposition re (1523 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lumber Liquidators Verified Response to Interrogatory No. 16, #2 Exhibit Sheehan et al. 2017 article)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1534 Order granting #1525 MOTION Motion to Seal Unopposed Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Approval of Infant Compromise Settlement Filed on behalf of the Bednarski and Gilman Minor Children. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz, and Brenda Schwartz as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwarts, III's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDERED that Plaintiffs George Sanchez and Maria Sanchez's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Val Rasmussen and Paulin Rasmussen's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 1530 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1529 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1528 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1527 NOTICE by Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman re (1526 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support, (1525 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Seal Unopposed Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Approval of Infant Compromise Settlement Filed on behalf of the Bednarski and Gilman Minor Children . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1526 Memorandum in Support re (1525 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Seal Unopposed Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Approval of Infant Compromise Settlement Filed on behalf of the Bednarski and Gilman Minor Children with Exhibits A-H attached and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1525 MOTION Motion to Seal Unopposed Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem and Approval of Infant Compromise Settlement Filed on behalf of the Bednarski and Gilman Minor Children. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 Order Conditionally Certifying Settlement Classes, Designating Class Counsel, Appointing Class Representatives, Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 14, 2018 Filing 1523 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Rep and Rep of the Special Committee by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Edwards, Neil)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1522 NOTICE by Maria Ronquillo, Romualdo Ronquillo, Kristin Brandt, Ryan Brandt re (1339 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement [PROPOSED] ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASSES, DESIGNATING CLASS COUNSEL, APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02819-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 ORDERED that Dana LeMaster's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Anthony J. Trenga 6/14/2018 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 ORDERED that Justine Russo and Alfredo Russo's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/14/2018.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 14, 2018 Set Hearings: Settlement Approval Hearing set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (cmar, )
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDERED that Solomon Hesney and Lynne Hesney's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 1517 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Status Conference held on 6/13/2018. Appearances of Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant. This matter came on for a Status Conference to conditionally certify the proposed settlement classes described in the proposed Settlement Agreement; and (2) whether to preliminarily approve the proposed Settlement Agreement. Parties advise the Court of the proposed settlement agreements.Def. Counsel advised the Court that Lumber Liquidators is settling this case with no admission of liability. Def. Counsel also advised that six cases that plaintiffs allege personal injuries related to Chinese laminate flooring that are carved out of the settlement. Def. Counsel enters an amended appendix A to the settlement agreement, which was part of the settlement package filed, that identifies the remaining six cases.The Court concludes, based on all the information it presently has, that the settlement is within the range of reasonableness and fairness and adequacy and that its likely that the Court, at the final hearing, based on the information it currently has, would give a final approval to the settlement. The Court also concludes that its likely that it would certify the classes as outlined in the settlement, as well as the class representatives.For those reasons, the Court preliminarily approves the proposed settlement and authorizes the fiving of notice for a final hearing and going forward with the other deadlines that are queued to the final hearing.The final hearing on this matter will be set for 10/03/2018 at 10:00 a.m.SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 amended appendix A) (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(jall) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2018: #2 sign in sheets) (jall, ).
June 13, 2018 Filing 1516 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1515 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02819-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1514 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1513 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1512 Memorandum in Support re (1501 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Personal Injury Lead Counsel's Partial Objection to Proposed Settlement . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1511 ORDERED that Plaintiffs John and Pearlene Friday's claims for personal injury are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 12, 2018 Filing 1510 NOTICE by Maria Ronquillo, Romualdo Ronquillo, Shawn Burke re #1501 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Personal Injury Lead Counsel's Partial Objection to Proposed Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' PERSONAL INJURY LEAD COUNSEL'S PARTIAL OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02819-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven) Modified on 6/12/2018 to put related case number in [ ](gwalk, ).
June 12, 2018 Filing 1509 Joint MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1508 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Sealed Minutes from the Telephone Conference held on 6/11/2018. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(jall) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2018: #1 court call) (jall, ).
June 11, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/11/2018 at 6:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (jall)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 Order - It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on the Motions for appointment of guardians ad Litem be SCHEDULED for Monday, June 11, 2018 at 6:30 p.m. EST. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 1506 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz(as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman re (1453 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (1452 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund : Notice by Personal Injury Plaintffs' Co-Lead Counsel of Withdrawal of Motion for Common Benefit Fund from Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1505 NOTICE by Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman Notice to the Court of Requests for Court Approval of Minor Child Settlements and Motions for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Behalf of Individual Plaintiffs Bednarski and Gilman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1504 Memorandum in Support re (71 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 109 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 94 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 41 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 149 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1466 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions , (151 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 43 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 96 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 111 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1468 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lumber Liquidators Inc.'s Verified Response to Interrogatory No. 16)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 Order granting #1499 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 Order granting #1497 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 6/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 1501 MOTION Personal Injury Lead Counsel's Partial Objection to Proposed Settlement. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1500 Memorandum in Support re (1499 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 124 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1499 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1498 Memorandum in Support re (1497 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 109 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1497 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1496 NOTICE by Kaleigh Craig, Rachael Craig, Scott Craig Plaintiff's Initial Discovery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Bethune, Scott)
May 31, 2018 Filing 1495 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas.(Edwards, Neil)
May 31, 2018 Filing 1494 RESPONSE to Motion re #1468 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627, #1466 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions - Supplemental filed by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe, David Thomas, Kathy Thomas. (Edwards, Neil)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1493 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski, Russell Mitchem, Wanda Mitchem Notice of Stipulation to Withdraw Opposition to Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1492 NOTICE by Barbara Balderson, Thomas Balderson, Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski Notice of Stipulation to Withdraw Opposition to Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1491 Memorandum in Opposition by the Balderson Plaintiffs re (1452 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 199 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 140 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 148 in 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 121 in 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 135 in 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 140 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 150 in 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 197 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 87 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 102 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 253 in 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 147 in 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 105 in 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 35 in 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 126 in 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 373 in 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 47 in 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 142 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 9 in 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 29, 2018 Filing 1490 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Mitchem Plaintiffs re (1452 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 199 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 140 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 148 in 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 121 in 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 135 in 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 140 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 150 in 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 197 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 87 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 102 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 253 in 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 147 in 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 105 in 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 35 in 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 126 in 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 373 in 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 47 in 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 142 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 9 in 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 29, 2018 Filing 1489 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman, Alfredo Russo, Justine Russo, Lynne Hesney, Solomon Hesney Notice of Stipulation to Withdraw Opposition to Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1488 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2018. Appearance of Counsel by phone for the Plaintiff and Defendant.This matter came on for a Telephone Status Conference re: the status conference following the Courts issuance of its order bringing this case back.The Court deems this case NOT a personal injury claim but a consumer protection claim and we will proceed on that basis.Order will follow. (Attachments: #1 court call) (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(jall)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1487 Declaration of Barry S. Kantrowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 1486 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc., Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (145 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1484 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Diane Flannery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1485 Declaration re (1484 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 1484 Memorandum in Opposition re (1452 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 142 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ) Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 1483 NOTICE by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler . (Marcek, Cliff)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 ORDER - The motion (no. 1458) is to this extent, with remaining issues under consideration, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Other pending motions will be the subject of one or more subsequent orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/23/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )See Order for details
May 21, 2018 Filing 1481 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2018 re #1448 MOTION Motion to Compel Production of Depositions and Documents Sealed Without Notice as Required by Pre Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5 re (1423 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION, #1464 MOTION Motion to Compel Discovery and for Remand to Conduct Case Specific Discovery on Behalf of the Stein Plaintiffs, #1422 MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents, #1458 MOTION PI Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Appearances of Counsel for the Plaintiff and Defendant. Motions argued and all motions taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter T. Harris.)(lgue, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to ExtendLumber Liquidators' Expert Deadline. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Joint Motion. The Court EXTENDS the Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosure deadline for Lumber Liquidators from June 7, 2018, to 21 days after the date the deposition of Dr. William Sawyer concludes. This Court also EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiffs to disclose any rebuttal experts until 14 days after service of Lumber Liquidators' Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/21/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Lumber Liquidators' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion. The Court EXTENDS the Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure deadline for Lumber Liquidators from June 7, 2018, to July 12, 2018, and the deadline for Plaintiff Tyler to disclose rebuttal reports from June 21, 2018, to July 26, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/21/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 ORDER granting (1447) Motion to substitute counsel in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ and (137) Motion to substitute counsel in case 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/21/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
May 21, 2018 Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/25/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (rban, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 Order granting in part #1208 MOTION to Alter or Amend Voluntary Dismissal. It is granted to the extent it seeks to vacate the Court's entry of Plaintiffs' voluntary dismissal and is otherwise denied; that the Court's "So Ordered" regarding Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal be, and the same hereby is, VACATED, the Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #1204 be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN, and this action be, and the same hereby is, REINSTATED; that a telephone conference regarding the status of this case is scheduled for 5/25/2018 at 2:00 p.m. At that time, the Court will consider whether and on what conditions this case may be voluntarily dismissed. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 5/21/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02810-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 1476 NOTICE by EDLab Environmental Diagnostics Laboratory of Withdrawal of Joint Motion to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Completing Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Butterfield, Chad)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1475 BRIEF by Carolyn Choe Thomas, Stein, Jensen, and Craig in Opposition to untimely filings by Lumber Liquidators to thwart personal injury plaintiff discovery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1473 Memorandum in Opposition re (92 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1464 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 147 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 69 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 39 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 107 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Discovery and for Remand to Conduct Case Specific Discovery on Behalf of the Stein Plaintiffs . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1472 Memorandum in Opposition re (89 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 66 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 104 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 36 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1458 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 142 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION PI Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Duplicative 30(b)(6) Topics)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1471 Memorandum in Opposition re (1448 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 33 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 138 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 62 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 85 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 100 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Production of Depositions and Documents Sealed Without Notice as Required by Pre Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5 re (1423 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1470 Memorandum in Opposition re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 134 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1469 Memorandum in Support re (151 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 43 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 96 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 111 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1468 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627, (73 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1468 MOTION to Quash Deposition Notice and Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Outside Counsel and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Covington's Privileged Work Product re (81 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 134 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1467 Memorandum in Support re (41 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notices, #2 Exhibit Lumber Liquidators' Interrogatory Response No. 6)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 1466 MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order Preventing Improper Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1465 Memorandum in Support re (1464 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Discovery and for Remand to Conduct Case Specific Discovery on Behalf of the Stein Plaintiffs . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1464 MOTION Motion to Compel Discovery and for Remand to Conduct Case Specific Discovery on Behalf of the Stein Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1463 NOTICE by George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez to Court of Withdrawal of Pending Motions Filed as ECF 1422, 1448, and 1458. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ(Thomas, D.)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1462 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski, Jeff Gilman, Jessica Gilman Notice to the Court of Withdrawal of Pending Motions Filed as ECF 1422, 1448 and 1458 on behalf of Individual Plaintiffs Barrios, Schwartz, Bednarski and Gilman. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1461 Memorandum in Support re (144 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1460 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION to Extend Lumber Liquidators' Expert Deadline . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1460 Joint MOTION to Extend Lumber Liquidators' Expert Deadline . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1474 Reply in Support re #1409 MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 1459 Memorandum in Support of PI Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1458 MOTION PI Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1457 Memorandum in Support re (11 in 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ, 1456 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Extend Expert Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1456 MOTION to Extend Expert Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 Order granting #1446 MOTION Pro Hac Vice Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 1454 NOTICE to the Court Made By Plaintiffs Solomon and Lynne Hesney of Withdrawal of All Pending Motions. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1450 Joint MOTION To Extend Discovery for Limited Purpose of Completing Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions . Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 1453 Memorandum in Support re (1452 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund for Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1452 MOTION Lead Counsel's Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1451 Memorandum in Support re (1450 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION To Extend Discovery for Limited Purpose of Completing Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Butterfield, Chad)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1450 Joint MOTION To Extend Discovery for Limited Purpose of Completing Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Butterfield, Chad)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1449 Memorandum in Support re (197 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 7 in 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ, 138 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 140 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 101 in 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 119 in 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 33 in 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 148 in 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1448 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 195 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 33 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 138 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 251 in 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 62 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 85 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 100 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Production of Depositions and Documents Sealed Without Notice as Required by Pre Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5 re (1423 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Production of Depositions and Documents Sealed Without Notice as Required by Pre Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1448 MOTION Motion to Compel Production of Depositions and Documents Sealed Without Notice as Required by Pre Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5 re (1423 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Support,, (1422 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents, (1440 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed and Redacted Documents Without Notice as Required by Pre-Trial Order #7 and Local Rule 5. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 10, 2018 Filing 1447 MOTION to Substitute Counsel Barrios and Schwartz Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ECF #1446, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 10, 2018 Filing 1446 MOTION Pro Hac Vice Application. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 10, 2018 Filing 1445 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 1444 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiffs Tiffany Stein and Cami Stein. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 1443 Memorandum in Opposition re (1409 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1442 Memorandum in Opposition re (185 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (182) Response in Opposition to Motion, And Motion for Leave of Court, (1408 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (1407) MDL Order,,, Opposition to Motion to Strike . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rasmussen Discovery to LL, #2 Exhibit Bednarski Discovery to LL, #3 Exhibit Emails)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1332 MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 154 and 155 re (154 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION, (155 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION , #1415 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1407 MDL Order,,, Opposition to Motion to Strike . Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
May 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1440 MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed and Redacted Documents. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (rban, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 1441 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. of Appearance. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Larson, Annie)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1440 MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed and Redacted Documents by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler. (Marcek, Cliff)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1439 Designation Expert Witnesses by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler. (Marcek, Cliff)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1438 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Notice of Appearance by Annie Cai Larson. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02819-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1437 Order granting #1431 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 Order granting #1424 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 1435 NOTICE by George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez of Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ(Thomas, D.)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1434 NOTICE by Sung Choe Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1433 NOTICE by David Thomas, Kathy Thomas Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1432 Memorandum in Support re (29 in 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1431 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1430 Memorandum in Opposition re (1424 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1429 Memorandum in Support re (144 in 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 8, 2018 Filing 1428 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 Order granting #1417 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 Order granting #1420 MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 Order granting #1418 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Miriam Jensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 8, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1424 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . The filing user is reminded to follow the electronic filing instructions for this MDL action. Most docketing will be done using the MDL Events Only category in CM/ECF. This will allow the filing user to spread the docket entry to the pertinent case(s). (Please do not use the regular motions category for filing in this case.) Additionally, in the future, please file the memorandum in support of a motion as a separate docket entry. The document is not an attachment to the motion. (rban, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 1424 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Pauline Rasmussen, Val Rasmussen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Christensen, Steven)
May 7, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1423 Memorandum in Support,, #1422 MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents. In the future, please only spread the docket entry to the applicable cases listed on the face of the document. (rban, )
May 5, 2018 Filing 1423 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 5, 2018 Filing 1422 MOTION to Compel Production of Sealed & Redacted Documents. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1421 Memorandum in Support re (1420 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 191 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ) MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 1420 MOTION to Extend Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 1418 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Miriam Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel, #3 Memorandum in Support to Extend Deadlines)(Stralen, John)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1419 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 1417 MOTION re (1363 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Extend Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1416 Certified Copy of CTO 45 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, ) Modified on 5/1/2018 to correct the docket text (rban, ).
May 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1415 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1407 MDL Order,,, Opposition to Motion to Strike . Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr.. (rban, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 1415 MOTION for Leave to file an Amended Complaint as to #1408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1407 MDL Order,,, Opposition to Motion to Strike by Pauline Rasmussen, Val Rasmussen. (, ) Modified on 5/1/2018 to correct the docket text (rban, ).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 Order granting #1358 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 Order granting #1343 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02818-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 Order granting in part #1403 Joint MOTION Extend Deadlines. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 ORDER granting #1386 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lauren Palmer Scott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/1/2018. (rban, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 ORDER granting #1398 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/1/2018. (rban, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 1408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1407 MDL Order,,, Opposition to Motion to Strike by Pauline Rasmussen, Val Rasmussen. (, )
April 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1332 MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 154 and 155 re (154 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION, (155 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION . Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr.. (rban, )
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDERED that Plaintiffs in Rasmussen, et al, vs. Lumber Liquidators, Inc., no. 1:16cv2782, shall forthwith refile the document docketed as ECF no. 182 in Case no. 1:16cv2782 properly to (a) include it in the docket in the MDL and (b) have it docketed in both as a motion; the Clerk will docket the said motion for hearing on 5/17/2018 at 2:00 p.m., in courtroom 401. The brief in opposition is due on 5/9/2018, and any reply on 5/14/2018; the Clerk will also docket for hearing on 5/17/2018, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 401 Defendant's motion to strike docketed as no. 1332 in the MDL and as no. 157 in the member case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 4/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 1409 MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 1405 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 1404 Memorandum in Support re (132 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1403 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Joint MOTION Extend Deadlines . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
April 26, 2018 Filing 1403 Joint MOTION Extend Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
April 26, 2018 Filing 1402 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 20, 2018 Filing 1401 Certified Copy of CTO 44 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
April 20, 2018 Filing 1399 Sealed Document. (gwalk, ) Modified on 4/20/2018 to correct the DE#(gwalk, ).
April 20, 2018 Filing 1400 Sealed Document (c/s) (gwalk, ) Modified on 4/20/2018 to correct the DE# (gwalk, ).
April 19, 2018 Filing 1398 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Keith Edward Patton. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 ORDER granting #1387 Motion for Pro hac vice by Jason Edward Causey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/19/18. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 ORDER granting (1388) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Sheridan Bethune in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ; and (25) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by in case 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/19/18. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER granting (1384) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Whitwell Bowron, II. in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ; and (127) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Whitwell Bowron, II. in case 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/19/18. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 ORDER granting (1383) Motion Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Reidy in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ; and(129) Motion Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Reidy in case 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/19/19. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER granting (1381) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ; (184) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le in case 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ; granting (38) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le in case 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/19/18. (gwalk, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/19/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
April 18, 2018 Filing 1391 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
April 18, 2018 Filing 1390 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1389 MOTION Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1388 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Sheridan Bethune as to Rachael Craig.. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 1387 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Edward Causey.(gwalk, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 1386 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren P. Scott . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
April 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing set for 6/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (gwalk, )
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 Order - It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing be, and the same hereby is, SCHEDULED for Wednesday, June 13, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. EST to determine ( 1) whether to conditionally certify the proposed settlement classes described in the proposed Settlement Agreement; and (2) whether to preliminarily approve the proposed Settlement Agreement.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 1384 MOTION to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Whitwell Bowron, II. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
April 6, 2018 Filing 1383 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Reidy . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 ORDERED that the Motion #1346 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED as set forth herein; that Shawn Reed, Esq. and Kevin Sullivan, Esq. be, and the same hereby are, APPOINTED as Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs, nunc pro tunc as of 8/24/2017, with the following duties and responsibilities. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 6, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1381 MOTION to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le . Counsel is reminded to select only the applicable cases to spread the docket entry to. Please do not select all cases unless it applies to all cases. If counsel has questions how to do that, please contact the clerk's office prior to filing. (rban, )
April 6, 2018 Filing 1381 MOTION to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Q. Le . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02816-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02817-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1380 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr: Status Conference held on 4/5/2018. Appearances of Settlement Counsel for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs and Counsel for Defendant. The Court confirmed that a representative from Court Call was connected. Counsel gave a status on remaining cases and issues. #1346 Motion from Settlement Counsel for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs seeking an order appointing them Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs heard. Shawn Reed and Patrick Sullivan appointed as Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Parties directed to schedule a settlement conference with Judge Brinkema. (Court Reporter T. Harris)(tarm)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga: Status Conference held on 4/5/2018. Appearances of Settlement Counsel for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs and Counsel for Defendant. The Court confirmed that a representative from Court Call was connected. Counsel gave a status on remaining cases and issues. #1346 Motion from Settlement Counsel for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs seeking an order appointing them Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs heard. Shawn Reed and Patrick Sullivan appointed as Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Parties directed to schedule a settlement conference with Judge Brinkema. (Attachments: #1 Sign in sheet, #2 Court Call) (Court Reporter: T. Harris)(tarm)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1378 NOTICE to the Court Re: Plaintiff Meriam Jensen's Service of Report Pursuant to the Court's 1/3/2018 Lone Pine Order. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 1377 Transfer Order Entered by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 Order granting #1367 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Dwight Bates, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 4/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 1375 NOTICE of Change of Change of Affiliation and Address. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 1374 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz(as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski re (1372 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,, (1164 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,, Amended Supplemental Report on Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
April 4, 2018 Filing 1372 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz(as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski re (1164 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,, Supplemental Report on Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDERED Robert Kowalski, Laura Zurek, individually and on behalf of their minor child, C.K.'s, claims are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, as to Defendants Lumber Liquidators Leasing, LLC, Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc., and Lumber Liquidators Services, LLC only. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 4/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 1371 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz(as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski Proposed Agenda for April 5, 2018 Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1370 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Defendants Lumber Liquidator Leasing, LLC, Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc., and Lumber Liquidators Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 1369 Reply by Dana Lemaster to Lumber Liquidator's Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 1368 NOTICE to the Court of Plaintiff Dana Lemaster's Compliance with 1/3/2018 Lone Pine Order. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 1367 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Dwight Bates, II. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 1366 BRIEF by Deanna Barrios, Brenda Schwartz(as the Representative of the Estate of Anton Schwartz, III), Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski Reply in Support of Motion for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1365 Reply to Lumber Liquidators Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs filed by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler. (Marcek, Cliff)
March 26, 2018 Filing 1364 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Notice to the Court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 Ordered that the provisions of paragraph 7 of the first Supplemental Rule 16(b) Order #1242 are amended as follows: All personal injury plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) expert reports on all issues are now due on 5/8/2018. Defendant's reports on all issues are now due on 6/7/2018. Any plaintiffs' rebuttal reports are now due on 6/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 3/26/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 1362 Memorandum in Opposition re (1346 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases (Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.'s Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email String)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1361 Sealed Document re #1358 MOTION (Motion to Seal Lumber Liquidators Inc.'s Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs) re (1346 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Portions of Opposition - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Redmond, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1360 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (1358 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION (Motion to Seal Lumber Liquidators Inc.'s Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs) re (1346 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases (Notice of Filing a Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 5(C)). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1359 Memorandum in Support re (1358 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION (Motion to Seal Lumber Liquidators Inc.'s Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs) re (1346 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1358 MOTION (Motion to Seal Lumber Liquidators Inc.'s Opposition to Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Plaintiffs) re (1346 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Placemarker for Document Filed Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 Order of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. It is ORDERED Plaintiffs Amanda Casali, Rae Ann McMeekin, and Christine Pettijohn's, personal injury claims are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, as to Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORDER - Upon good cause shown and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6, the Court hereby ORDERS that the deadline to respond to the pending Amended Complaint in the above-captioned case shall be extended until 21 days after this Court rules on the pending Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 1278 & 1332).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/20/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 Order - Upon good cause shown and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6, the Court hereby ORDERS that the deadline to respond to the pending Amended Complaint in the above-captioned case shall be extended until 21 days after this Court rules on the pending Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 1278 & 1332). Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 20, 2018 Filing 1354 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1353 Joint MOTION Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
March 16, 2018 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (gwalk, )
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 Order - it is hereby ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the date of this Motion, Defendants file any response to the Motion; and it is further ORDERED that within seven (7) days of receipt of Defendants' response, Settlement Counsel for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs file any reply; and it is further ORDERED that a status conference be, and the same hereby is, SCHEDULED for Thursday, April 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 16, 2018 Filing 1350 Memorandum in Support re (80 in 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1349 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re (1261 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1349 MOTION Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re (1261 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1348 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1261 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler. (Marcek, Cliff)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1352 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 1347 Letter to the Court. (rban, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 1345 Sealed Document re #1343 MOTION CORRECTED Motion to Seal Confidential Portion of Settlement Agreement re (1341 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1344 Memorandum in Support re (1343 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION CORRECTED Motion to Seal Confidential Portion of Settlement Agreement re (1341 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,,, . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1343 MOTION CORRECTED Motion to Seal Confidential Portion of Settlement Agreement re (1341 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1342 MOTION to Seal Confidential Portion of Settlement Agreement re (1341 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,,, . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1341 NOTICE by Jamie Deutsch, Lisa Deutsch re (1339 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Motion to Seal Confidential Portion of Settlement Agreement. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1340 Memorandum in Support re (1339 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 15, 2018 Filing 1339 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steve Toll, #3 Declaration of Alexander Robertson, #4 Declaration of Steve Weisbrot)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Toll, Steven)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 Order re Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Defendants Lumber Liquidators Leasing, LLC, Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc., and Lumber Liquidator Services, LLC only. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 13, 2018 Filing 1338 Letter to the Court. (rban, )
March 13, 2018 Filing 1336 BRIEF by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Answer to Third Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen Jay Herman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER setting schedule for (1332) Motion to Strike in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ: Plaintiffs shall file their brief in response by March 22, 2018, and Defendant shall file any reply by March 26, 2018. The Court will then decide whether and how to conduct a hearing.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 03/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1333 Memorandum in Support re (1332 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 157 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 154 and 155 re (154 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION, (155 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1332 MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 154 and 155 re (154 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION, (155 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 SO ORDERED re #1328 Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 3/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 1346 MOTION for Co-Lead Counsel for Personal Injury Cases. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
March 8, 2018 Filing 1328 Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER granting (1317) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven Alden Christensen in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ and 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/8/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 ORDER granting (1321) Unopposed Motion to withdraw Appearance of Patrick Luff as Counsel for plaintiffs John and Pearlene Friday in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/8/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(gwalk, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 1330 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Justine Russo. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 1329 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiffs Jeff Gilman and Jessica Gilman on Behalf of Dillon Gilman, Her Minor Child. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 1325 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiffs Tiffany Stein and Cami Stein. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 1324 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Solomon Hesney. (Attachments: #1 Letters)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 1323 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiffs Thomas Balderson and Barbara Balderson of Issuance of Their Report Required by the Lone Pine Order. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 1322 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Russell Mitchem of Issuance of His Report Required by the Lone Pine Order. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 6, 2018 Filing 1321 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Patrick Luff as Counsel for Plaintiffs John and Pearlene Friday. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1320 Memorandum in Opposition re (1278 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Renewed Motion to Strike All Claims of Persona Injury Made in Rasmussen et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc. et al, Class Action Complaint re (2 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) Complaint, . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1319 NOTICE of Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1318 NOTICE of Certificate of Service. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1317 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven Alden Christensen. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1316 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiffs Robert Kowalski and Laura Zurek. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
March 2, 2018 Filing 1315 NOTICE by Carolyn Choe, Sung Choe . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
March 2, 2018 Filing 1314 NOTICE by David Thomas, Kathy Thomas . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ(Edwards, Neil)
March 2, 2018 Filing 1313 NOTICE by George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1243 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Compliance. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Thomas, D.)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 ORDER granting (1280) Motion to Seal Exhibits in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, the Court finding that the documents meet the requirements for sealing of applicable precedents.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 ORDER terminating as unnecessary (1261) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER finding as presently moot (1258) Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Fact Sheets by Personal Injury Plaintiffs in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. The affected plaintiffs shall proceed in accordance with their respective agreements with defense counsel, and defendant has leave to file a supplemental motion if deemed necessary.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 ORDER finding as moot (1249) Motion to Strike Objections in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER granting (1248) Motion to Substitute Counsel in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. See the motion for details.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER finding as moot (1245) "objections" in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER finding as moot (1244) "objections" in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 ORDER finding as moot (1160) Motion to Compel in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
March 1, 2018 Filing 1304 NOTICE by Dwight Spence Notice of Compliance (Parry, Zachariah)
March 1, 2018 Filing 1303 NOTICE by Peter Bednarski re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1243 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Compliance. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
March 1, 2018 Filing 1302 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1243 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Compliance. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02815-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
February 28, 2018 Filing 1301 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Notice to the Court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 28, 2018 Filing 1300 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Notice to the Court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 1298 Certified Copy of CTO 43 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 1299 Letter regarding verification. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 1297 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 SO ORDERED re #1294 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Sheryl Hulse, David Hulse, (individually and on behalf of A.H., a minor) and Lumber Liquidators, Inc. ORDERED that the claims are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, as to Defendants Lumber Liquidators Leasing, LLC, Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc., and Lumber Liquidators Services, LLC only. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 2/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 SO ORDERED re #1286 Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims by Lauryn C. Holloway and Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 2/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 1294 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Sheryl Hulse, David Hulse, (individually and on behalf of A.H., a minor) and Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 1293 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (113 in 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE Answer of Lumber Liquidators, Inc. to First Supplemental and Amending Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1292 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (94 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,, (1 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ) Complaint, Answer of Lumber Liquidators, Inc. to First Supplemental and Amending Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1291 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (215 in 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ) Docket Annotation Answer of Lumber Liquidators, Inc. to Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1290 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1258 MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) filed by Dwight Spence. (Parry, Zachariah)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1289 Memorandum in Support re (235 in 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1288 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Strike All Claims of Personal Injury Made in Bogler, et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc., Class Action Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Dismiss Personal Injury Claims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted re (2 . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1288 MOTION Strike All Claims of Personal Injury Made in Bogler, et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc., Class Action Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Dismiss Personal Injury Claims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted re (231 in 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ) Docket Annotation . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1287 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 1286 Stipulation of Dismissal of Personal Injury Claims by Lauryn C. Holloway and Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 1285 Memorandum in Opposition re (1261 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1284 NOTICE by EDLab Environmental Diagnostics Laboratory re (1261 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ(Butterfield, Chad)
February 12, 2018 Filing 1283 Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 1282 Memorandum in Support re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 ORDERED that the Rule 72 Objections of Personal Injury Plaintiffs to First Supplemental Rule 16(B) "Lone Pine" Order #1254 be, and the same hereby is, OVERRULED; that the Rule 72 Objections by Personal Injury Plaintiffs to Language Contained in First Supplemental Rule 16(B) Order Requiring a Reasonable Degree of Medical Certainty Standard for Causation Issues Rather than Jurisdiction-Specific Standards #1256 be, and the same hereby is, OVERRULED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 2/12/2018.Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 9, 2018 Filing 1280 MOTION re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) , (1273 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Opposition, . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1279 Memorandum in Support re (1278 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 141 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Renewed Motion to Strike All Claims of Persona Injury Made in Rasmussen et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc. et al, Class Action Complaint re (2 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) Complaint, . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 9, 2018 Filing 1278 MOTION Renewed Motion to Strike All Claims of Persona Injury Made in Rasmussen et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc. et al, Class Action Complaint re (2 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ) Complaint, . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER granting (1276) Motion to extend time in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ.1. In Civil Action no. 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint on or before February 21, 2018. 2. In this Third Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs shall dismiss/remove all class allegations. Furthermore, Counsel will only seek personal injury relief for Robert Kowalski (and his minor daughter). 3. Upon the filing of this Third Amended Complaint, Lumber Liquidators shall have 21 days to respond to this amended complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 2/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
February 8, 2018 Filing 1276 MOTION Joint Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1275 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Tiffany Stein and Cami Stein re (90 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 1274 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Jeff Gilman and Dillon Gilman re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 148 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 1273 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1272 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1271 Memorandum in Opposition re #1258 MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) filed by George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Thomas, D.)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1270 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Margeaux Thomas on behalf of George Sanchez, Maria Sanchez (Thomas, D.)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1269 Memorandum in Opposition re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 92 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
February 6, 2018 Filing 1268 Memorandum in Support re (1266 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1267 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 31, 2018 Filing 1266 Memorandum in Opposition re (1254 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1243 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, , (1256 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION for Rule 72 Objection by Personal Injury Plaintiffs to Medical Causation Standard of Rule 16(B) Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Transcript of 12/5/17 Status Conference)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 1:18-cv-02814-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 ORDER granting (1251) Motion to Substitute Proper Party in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, and the Clerk is directed to substitute Brenda Schwartz as proper party plaintiff for the deceased Anton Schwartz III.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 01/26/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1264 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Service Regarding First Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1263 NOTICE by Colton Morris, Heather Morris FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ(Miller, Brian)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1262 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios Barrios and Schwartz Supplemental and Amending Complaint. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1261 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Richard Cutler, Sharon Cutler. (Marcek, Cliff)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER entered scheduling briefing on (1258) Motion to Compel Further Responses in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ : Counsel for the individual plaintiffs identified in the motion and supporting memorandum shall file briefs in response re their respective clients by February 7, 2018; and defendant shall file any rebuttal brief by February 12, 2018. The court will then determine whether and when to hold a hearing.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 01/23/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1259 Memorandum in Support re (1258 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 92 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 143 in 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 82 in 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 148 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 76 in 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 90 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 99 in 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 23, 2018 Filing 1258 MOTION Motion to Compel Further Responses to the Supplemental Fact Sheet (Required by the Court's September 6, 2017 Order) . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 ORDER granting (1211) Motion to Substitute Attorney in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 17, 2018 Filing 1256 MOTION for Rule 72 Objection by Personal Injury Plaintiffs to Medical Causation Standard of Rule 16(B) Order. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1255 NOTICE by Deanna Barrios, Anton Schwartz, Brenda Schwartz, Peter Bednarski re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1164 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,, of Plaintiffs' Request for Inclusion on Docket No. 1164 Report of Personal Injury Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stein Plaintiffs' Request for Inclusion in Report of Docket #1164, #2 Exhibit B - McMeekin Plaintiff's Request for Inclusion in Report of Docket #1164, #3 Exhibit C - Groton Plaintiffs' Request for Inclusion in Report of Docket #1164)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1254 MOTION re (1242 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, (1243 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MDL Order,,,,,,,,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Rule 72 Objection to 16(b) Lone Pine Order, #2 Exhibit A - Dec. 30, 2017 Objection to Proposed Draft Lone Pine Order to Magistrate Thomas Rawles Jones, #3 Exhibit B - Lumber Liquidator's Objections to Personal Injury Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 12, 2018 Filing 1253 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/5/17 (Status Conference and Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Motion for Separate Case Track), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2018.(montgomery, rhonda) (Main Document 1253 replaced on 4/26/2018) (rban, ).
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER granting #1246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Zachariah Parry. in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 11, 2018 Filing 1251 MOTION for Substitution of Proper Party Plaintiff on Behalf of Anton Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1250 Memorandum in Support re (1249 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 1244 and 1245 re (1244 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION All Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Objection to Air Testing and Inspection of Their Homes, (1245 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION re (1240 in 1 . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1249 MOTION Strike ECF Nos. 1244 and 1245 re (1244 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION All Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Objection to Air Testing and Inspection of Their Homes, (1245 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION re (1240 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,, Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Global Objections ro Defendant's First Discovery Responses . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Redmond, Robert)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1248 Joint MOTION to Substitute Counsel for Bednarski Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Motion to Substitute Counsel for Bednarski)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1247 Certified Copy of CTO 42 entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rban, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 1246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Zachariah Parry. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 1245 MOTION re (1240 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) NOTICE,,,,,,,,,,,, Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Global Objections ro Defendant's First Discovery Responses. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 8, 2018 Filing 1244 MOTION All Personal Injury Plaintiffs' Objection to Air Testing and Inspection of Their Homes. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 Order granting in part and denying in part #1236 Motion for entry of a lone pine type case management order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 1/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
January 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2017 re #1236 MOTION Entry for Lone Pine Order. (This matter was heard telephonically. No CRD was present and an FTR recording was not made.) (rban, ) Modified on 1/3/2018 to correct the date of the hearing to 12/28/2017 (rban, ).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 First Supplemental Rule 16(B) Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. 1/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(rban, )
December 28, 2017 Filing 1241 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Defendant's First Set Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspection to All Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1240 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to All Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 22, 2017 Filing 1239 Memorandum in Opposition re (1236 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Entry for Lone Pine Order with Attached Exhibits. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Reed, Shawn)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 ORDER Scheduling consideration of (1236) Defendant's Motion for issuance of a "Lone Pine" Order in case 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ:LEAD COUNSEL FOR PERSONAL INJURY PLAINTIFFS SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION BY DECEMBER 21, 2017. NO REPLY BY DEFENDANT IS NECESSARY.THE COURT PLANS TO HEAR THE MOTION BY TELEPHONE AS SOON AS PRACTICABLE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Jones, Thomas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1237 Memorandum in Support re (73 in 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 321 in 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 156 in 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 306 in 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 297 in 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 44 in 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 294 in 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 308 in 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 312 in 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 40 in 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 326 in 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 307 in 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 283 in 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 305 in 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 300 in 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 312 in 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 304 in 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 306 in 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 325 in 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 269 in 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 296 in 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 282 in 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 323 in 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 324 in 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 75 in 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 126 in 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 350 in 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 329 in 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 308 in 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 309 in 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 154 in 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 324 in 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 158 in 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 313 in 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 75 in 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 17 in 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ, 302 in 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 307 in 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 382 in 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 316 in 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 215 in 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 304 in 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 277 in 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 315 in 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 325 in 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 305 in 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 315 in 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 308 in 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 303 in 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 299 in 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 311 in 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 305 in 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 147 in 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 85 in 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 221 in 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 77 in 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 319 in 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 305 in 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 308 in 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 89 in 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 118 in 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 299 in 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 312 in 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 315 in 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 300 in 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 67 in 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 318 in 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 301 in 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 126 in 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 321 in 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 85 in 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 323 in 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 81 in 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 21 in 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 154 in 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 157 in 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 301 in 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 305 in 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 310 in 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 304 in 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 72 in 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 298 in 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 155 in 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 206 in 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 295 in 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 64 in 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 326 in 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 92 in 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 44 in 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 323 in 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 311 in 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 303 in 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 24 in 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 307 in 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 316 in 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 131 in 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 55 in 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 303 in 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 218 in 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 152 in 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 330 in 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 157 in 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 313 in 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 313 in 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 201 in 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 350 in 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 313 in 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 323 in 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 314 in 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 111 in 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1236 in 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 62 in 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 311 in 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 154 in 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 326 in 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 154 in 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 327 in 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 306 in 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ) MOTION Entry for Lone Pine Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Correspondence from Patrick Luff)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1236 MOTION Entry for Lone Pine Order . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1235 NOTICE by Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc. Regarding Conditional Transfer Order No. 40. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02730-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02731-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02734-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02735-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02736-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02740-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02741-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02742-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02745-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02746-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02747-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02749-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02750-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02751-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02752-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02756-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02757-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02759-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02761-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02762-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02763-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02765-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02766-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02767-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02768-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02769-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02770-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02771-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02772-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02773-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02774-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02775-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02776-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02777-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02778-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02779-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02780-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02781-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02782-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02783-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02784-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02785-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02786-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02788-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02790-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02791-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02792-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02793-AJT-TRJ, 1:16-cv-02794-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02795-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02797-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02798-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02800-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02802-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02803-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02804-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02805-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02806-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02807-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02808-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02809-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02811-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02812-AJT-TRJ, 1:17-cv-02813-AJT-TRJ(Flannery, Diane)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 Order- It is hereby ORDERED that the Personal Injury Plaintiffs Motion for Separate Case Track #1156 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that a separate case track be, and the same hereby is, ESTABLISHED for cases asserting personal injuries and that discovery in such cases, including that pertaining to experts, causation, and damages, be completed by May 31, 2018; and it is further ORDERED that the Courts Order dated August 17, 2017 staying all discovery, [ 1181], be, and the same hereby is, LIFTED as to those cases asserting personal injury claims, as listed in Plaintiffs Report on Personal Injury and Objections to Application of the Summary Judgment Ruling #1165 . Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02627-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02628-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02630-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02631-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02634-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02635-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02637-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02638-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02643-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02644-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02645-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02647-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02648-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02649-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02652-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02653-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02654-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02657-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02658-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02660-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02661-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02663-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02664-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02665-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02666-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02667-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02668-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02670-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02671-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02673-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02674-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02675-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02676-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02679-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02681-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02682-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02683-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02684-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02685-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02688-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02689-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02691-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02693-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02694-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02696-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02697-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02698-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02699-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02700-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02702-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02704-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02705-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02706-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02707-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02708-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02709-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02710-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02711-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02714-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02719-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02720-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02721-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02724-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02725-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-02726-AJT-TRJ, 1:15-cv-027