Allee v. Streeval et al
Plaintiff: Justin J. Allee
Defendant: Saders, Streeval, Hicks, F.B.O.P. Director, Administrative Remedy Coordinator, Captain Kemmerer, Goldey, Higgins, William Barr, Lieutenant LaFave, Michael Horowitz, Carvajal, Lieutenant Mullins, Mrs. Sylors, Jefferey D. Allen, N. Mollica, C.O. Bradburn, United States of Amercia, Correctional Officers, J. C. Petrucci, United States Penitentiary Lee Union Officals, Correctional Officer J. Robbins and Michael Frazier
Case Number: 7:2021cv00088
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 31 Declaration by Michael Talley and Patrick Bailey filed by Justin J. Allee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration-Patrick Bailey)(slt)
April 1, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Reconsideration and Clarity re 29 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Justin J. Allee. (slt)
March 24, 2021 29 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail (slt)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying #23 Motion to Amend/Correct as moot based on Court's Order at 20 and filing of Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/23/21. (Order to be mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(PMS)
March 23, 2021 Filing 28 Additional Evidence by Justin J. Allee. (slt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 27 Declaration received from non-party Erik Vazquez-Velasco. (slt) Modified on 3/31/2021 (aab).Document viewing restricted due to letter received by non party
March 22, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jefferey D. Allen, William Barr, Bradburn, Carvajal, Correctional Officers, Michael Frazier, Goldey, Hicks, Higgins, Michael Horowitz, Kemmerer, LaFave, N. Mollica, Mullins, J. C. Petrucci, J. Robbins, Streeval, Sylors, United States Penitentiary Lee Union Officals, United States of Amercia, filed by Justin J. Allee. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint 2, #2 Attachments, #3 Cover Letter)(slt)
March 19, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's Letter returning faxed documents to Justin J. Allee. (slt)
March 16, 2021 22 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail. (slt)
March 15, 2021 Filing 24 Additional Evidence-Administrative Remedies by Justin J. Allee (Attachments: #1 Declarations of Matthew Constace, Louis Gilmore, Cesar Fuentes Ruiz, and Mario Avlos-Galvan)(aab)
March 15, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Justin J. Allee. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (aab)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER denying #21 Motion to Appoint Counsel for the reasons cited in the court's previous order #11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/15/21. (Order to be mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(PMS)
March 12, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin J. Allee. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (slt)
March 11, 2021 20 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail (aab)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his Amended Complaint with the court within 20 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/10/21. (Order to be mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(PMS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 19 Response re #18 Copy request. (slt)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Justin J. Allee. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Cover Letter with request for copies)(slt)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 Additional Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Justin J. Allee (slt)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 Response re #14 Letter . (slt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 Letters in Support by non-party Inmates Kenneth Ruff, Johnny L. Shelton, and Ryechine Money. (Attachments: #1 Letter by Johnny L. Shelton, #2 Letter by Ryechine Money)(slt) Modified on 3/31/2021 (aab).Document viewing restricted due to letter received by non party
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 Letter and copy request by Justin J. Allee. (slt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Justin J. Allee (slt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #8 Letter regarding Justin Allee; (No forwarding address given) Envelope had incorrect Prisoner ID#, clerk sending with correct Prisoner ID# (aab). (aab)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/26/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Response regarding Order #2 by Justin J. Allee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(aab)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin J. Allee. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (aab)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to plaintiff from Clerk's Office regarding return of $10.00 money order. (aab)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Letter regarding attempt to exhaust administrative remedies by Justin J. Allee (aab)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 3/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/22/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Justin J. Allee (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Response re #3 Statement of Assets and Letter regarding sending in money for a future habeas petition. (tvt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Assets and Letter regarding sending in money for a future habeas petition by Justin J. Allee (tvt)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/10/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 Bivens Act against Administrative Remedy Coordinator, F.B.O.P. Director, Goldey, Hicks, Kemmerer, Saders, Streeval, filed by Justin J. Allee.(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allee v. Streeval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin J. Allee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streeval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.O.P. Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Remedy Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kemmerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant LaFave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Sylors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferey D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Mollica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Bradburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of Amercia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Petrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Penitentiary Lee Union Officals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?