Meyers v. Dye et al
Plaintiff: David Meyers
Defendant: B. Dye, R. Bishop, S. Young, C. Cline, S. Yates, R. Walz, Investigator Johnson, W. Swiney, J. Kiser, T. Dorton, F. Stanley, M. Counts, L. Mullins, A. Kilgore, D. Tate, J. Fannin, J. Bentley, Arvil Galihar, Geraldine Baker, U/M Duncan, K. Counts, Marcus Elam, Kieth Dawkins and Art Rip
Case Number: 7:2022cv00298
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/1/2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/1/2022. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Assembled Supplemental Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #46 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (aab)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #46 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by David Meyers. USCA Case Number 22-6785. Case Manager: Rickie Edwards. (aab)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #46 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (tvt)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #45 Order to Respond - Prisoner, by David Meyers. (tvt)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #46 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Clerk sending plaintiff copy of Order #10 from case 7:19-cv-00573 and Order #45 in this case as well as blank complaint form)(tvt)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 21 days. It is further ORDERED that Meyers is not to file any other documents with the court in this case, other than his amended complaint. He is advised that his amended complaint and any future filings are all subject to the injunction order referenced supra at note 1. Responses due by 7/18/2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/22/2022. (Order, 1983 form, and injunction order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00616. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 6/9/2022. Copies mailed 6/9/2022.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Case Reopened. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order STAYED flag(s) removed. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Referred #40 to Staff Attorney. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #42 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUBMISSION BY PLAINTIFF. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the docket to reflect Plaintiff's current address of record as Scotland Correctional Institution, 22383 McGirts Bridge Road, Laurinburg, North Carolina 28353. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/1/2022. Copies mailed 2/1/2022.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Resent #40 to updated address re #41 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order. Pending the Court's receipt of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, this action is STAYED, and the action will be removed from the Court's active docket. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 1/13/2022. Copies mailed 1/13/2022. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Suspense due by 2/14/2022 re #40 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order STAYED flag(s) set. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 USCA Mandate re #32 Notice of Appeal. Rule 45 Mandate. This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 45 takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.(21-6637) (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of USCA as to #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Meyers.The court dismisses this proceeding for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 45. (21-6637) (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUBMISSION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #37 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUBMISSION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #35 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUBMISSION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 USCA Case Number 21-6337 - Richard H. Sewell, Case Manager for #32 Notice of Appeal filed by David Meyers. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #32 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (jmey, ) Modified on 4/26/2021 to edit filed on date. (jmey, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #32 Notice of Appeal. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #30 - #33 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Order by David Meyers. Filing fee $ 0.00. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Objection to #28 Order filed by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUBMISSION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #29 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUBMISSION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. It is ORDERED that all pending motions filed by Plaintiff - with the exception of Plaintiff's first-filed Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket any future motions filed by Plaintiff, other than any motions specifically authorized by Court order, as a submission. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/26/2021. Copies mailed 3/29/2021. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #27 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #26 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Recusal by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #24 and #25 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Under Imminent Danger Exception by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSOLIDATED MOTION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #20 - #23 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Objection filed by David Meyers. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Recusal by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Injunction by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #18 and #19 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Recusal by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #17 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSOLIDATED MOTION by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #14 - #16 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consolidated Motion for Injunction (TRO) by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(epri, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consolidated Motion for Injunction (TRO) by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(epri, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Submission by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #13 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #11 and #12 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amendment to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #10 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is ORDERED that #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases is DENIED. Plaintiff's Request for an Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED as unnecessary. #8 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED as unnecessary. Plaintiff request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/12/2019. Copies mailed 11/13/2019. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #7 and #8 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Imminent Danger by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #6 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #5 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #4 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Collection of Fees by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED to either sign the enclosed consent to collection of fees form and RETURN IT TO THE COURT or to submit the full filing fee of $350.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint" to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to comply with the procedural requirements outlined in that document. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order and the consent to collection of fees form to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 1/8/2018. Copies mailed 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Collection of Fees and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Suspense due by 2/19/2019 re #3 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Meyers. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Geraldine Baker, J. Bentley, R. Bishop, C. Cline, K. Counts, M. Counts, Kieth Dawkins, T. Dorton, U/M Duncan, B. Dye, Marcus Elam, J. Fannin, Arvil Galihar, Investigator Johnson, A. Kilgore, J. Kiser, L. Mullins, Art Rip, F. Stanley, W. Swiney, D. Tate, R. Walz, S. Yates, S. Young (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by David Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes - Notified Staff Attorney re #1 and #2 . (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/9/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Dye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Swiney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvil Galihar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/M Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieth Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Rip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?