Davis et al v. Hayes et al
Plaintiff: Keith Adair Davis
Defendant: William Hayes, Hikari Tamura, Gordon Karlsson, Todd Clark, Taylor, Bacon, Chris Womack, Robin Fox, McCain, Wade Silva, R Trajano, Murano, Kelli Williams, Roxanne Vierra, T Culver, Tammi, R Benham, Elizabeth Pine, Thomas Thompson, Benjamin Sanders, MD, LaDene Thomas, Mike Stanfill, Roger Higgs, Wheeler, Bliss, Frary, Rafanan, Gaynor, Frazier, Jellen, Gorman, Jones, McKindry, Elerick, M Williams, Robertson, Music Who, Jurado Who, Tomlin Who1, Mendoza Who, Putnam Who, Nguyen Who, Paget Who and Williamson Who
Case Number: 2:2016cv01709
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REOPENING TIME TO FILE AN APPEAL 132 . The Court Orders both parties to show cause why this Court should not construe Mr. Davis' filings as a timely motion to reopen the time to appeal and why such a motion should not be granted. Show Cause response due within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(PM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting the 118 Report and Recommendation and granting Defendants' 81 Motion for summary judgment; this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(PM)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 114 Motion to Deny or Stay signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379) (TH)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 110 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 81 ). Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by March 5, 2018. Defendants may file their reply by March 9, 2018. The Clerk is directed to re-note Defendants' motion for March 9, 2018. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379) (TH)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 response/motion for reconsideration signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(PM)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 99 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment is due 2/12/2018. Defendants' 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment is re-noted for 2/16/2018. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379) (PM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion to compel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379) (TH)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER striking as untimely Plaintiff Davis' 96 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(PM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Third 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(TH)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 55 61 Motions to Compel; directing parties to meet and confer per Rule 37, no later than 11/24/2017; Joint Statement due by 11/28/2017. If discovery dispute is not resolved, Plaintiff to file a motion for discovery by 12/4/2017. Clerk shall note Plaintiff's discovery motion for 12/15/2017. Signed signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(PM)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Plaintiff's 55 MOTION to Compel Discovery; Noting Date 11/3/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(SWT) Modified docket text on 10/16/2017 (SWT). Incorrectly titled "minute order."
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 216001169)(PM)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery completed by 11/21/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/21/2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 216001169)(RS)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by 1st Class Mail on 6/14/2017 to Gorman; McKindry; Bliss; Elerick. (cc: King County Prosecutor's Office)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 216001169)(ST)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STRIKING OBJECTIONS AS UNTIMELY 31 Objection, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (cc: Mailed to plaintiff to address on docket. Address has not been updated and previous mail returned)(SG)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 26 Report and Recommendations by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. All claims set forth in plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt. #20) is dismissed except as to plaintiff's claims that defendant(s) Gorm an, McKindrey, Bliss and Elerick used excessive force against plaintiff. Amended complaint (Dkt. #20) shall be served on defendant(s) Gorman, McKindrey, Bliss and Elerick only and those defendants shall be required to file an answer only as to the excessive force claims. Matter is re-referred to Judge Tsuchida. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Keith Adair Davis, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The Court, having reviewed Plaintiffs complaint, the amended complaint, the Report and Recommendat ion of the Honorable Brian A. Tsuchida, United States Magistrate Judge, Objections filed by Plaintiff, and the remaining record, does hereby find and ORDER: (1) The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation. (2) This case is dismissed without prej udice prior to service for failure to state a claim and the dismissal counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g),.(3) The Clerk is directed to send copies of this Order to Plaintiff and to JudgeT suchida.(SG)(cc: Mailed to Plaintiff)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 20 MOTION to Amend filed by Keith Adair Davis referred to Judge Tsuchida. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (swt) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DKT. 11), by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court, having reviewed the Report and Recommendation of the Honorable Brian A.Tsuchida, United States Magistrate Judge, any objections or responses to t hat, and the remaining record, finds and ORDERS as follows: (1) The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation;(2) Plaintiffs motion for order to show cause (Dkt. 11) is DENIED. (3) The Clerk of Court is directed to send copies of this Order to Plaintiff and to JudgeTsuchida. (copy mailed to Plaintiff)(SG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Hayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Adair Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikari Tamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Karlsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Trajano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Benham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Sanders, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaDene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Stanfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKindry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jurado Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomlin Who1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paget Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson Who
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?