Mays v. Hudgins et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Randolph Mays
Defendant: Richard Hudgins, Brent Miller, R. Clem, Ian Connors, D.J. Harman, John Doe, Officer Massey, Eddie Anderson, Rick Wilson, Jennifer Saad, A. Sligar and Alicia Wilson
Interested Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00181
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Orders, #15 Order to Answer. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/2020. (cmd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to REGIONAL DIRECTOR HARMON by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nogay, Maximillian)
November 9, 2020 Filing 25 Partial Filing fee: $ 18.99, receipt number WVNE015983 (cmd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brent Miller served on 10/30/2020. (cmd)
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rick Wilson served on 10/30/2020. (cmd)
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alicia Wilson served on 10/29/2020. (cmd)
November 4, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Eddie Anderson served on 10/29/2020. (cmd)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Attorney General Of the United States served on 10/28/2020. (cmd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Northern District of WV Attorney Powell served on 10/26/2020. (cmd)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/21/2020. Copy to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #5 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/21/2020. Copy to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 16.08, receipt number WVNE015908 (cmd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/28/2020 per USPS website. (cmd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/28/2020. (cmd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/28/2020. (cmd)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/23/2020. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mailed/emailed to E. Howell and Trustee Clerk FCI Gilmer. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO RESTRICT MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/23/2020. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Records L.R. Gen. P. 6.01 by Joseph Randolph Mays. (cmd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Joseph Randolph Mays. Exhibit SD4 original is sideways and cut off. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit SD1 - Memo re Water, #3 Exhibit SD2 - Memo Issues with Water, #4 Exhibit SD3 - letter, #5 Exhibit SD4 - handwritten letter, #6 Exhibit SD5 - Declaration, #7 Exhibit SD6 - Delaration McWilliams, #8 Exhibit SD7 - Chi Ray letter, #9 Exhibit SD8 - Declaration Mays, #10 Exhibit SD9 - Declaration Mays 2)(cmd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Joseph Randolph Mays. (cmd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Randolph Mays. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheet)(cmd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Randolph Mays. (cmd)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eddie Anderson, R. Clem, Ian Connors, John Doe, D.J. Harman, Richard Hudgins, Massey, Brent Miller, Jennifer Saad, A. Sligar, Alicia Wilson, Rick Wilson, filed by Joseph Randolph Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Cover letter) (cmd). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/23/2020) (cmd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #3 Exhibit 8 - medical records) (cmd). Modified on 9/23/2020 per #8 Order to Restrict Medical Records. (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Hudgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sligar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Randolph Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?