January 20, 2015 |
Filing
486
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Motion for a New Trial) denying Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s 450 MOTION for New Trial; denying as moot Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s 479 Request for Ruling, or Alternatively for Hearing, on Motion for New Trial; denying as moot Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s 482 Second Request for Ruling, or Alternatively for Hearing, on Motion for New Trial and Motion to Remit Punitive Damages Award and Amend Judgment; denying as moot the plaintiffs' 458 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Materials Submitted With Bard's Motion for a New Trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/20/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
|
October 18, 2013 |
Filing
448
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying C. R. Bard, Inc.'s 439 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/18/2013. (cc: counsel of record) (skh)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing
356
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification on the Court's Ruling on Bard's Failure to Test, and for a Ruling on Bard's Objections to Evidence that Bard Claims "Implies Bard had a Duty to Conduct Clin ical Trials or Additional Testing") granting as discussed herein Plaintiffs' 352 Motion for Clarification on the Court's Ruling on Bard's Failure to Test, and for a Ruling on Bard's Objections to Evidence that Bard Claims "Implies Bard had a Duty to Conduct Clinical Trials or Additional Testing." Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
July 5, 2013 |
Filing
316
ORDER (Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena) granting in part and denying in part with the limitation outlined herein 313 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Quash Trial Subpoena to Roger Darois. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/5/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
June 27, 2013 |
Filing
302
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Parties' Motions in Limine) granting Plaintiffs' 265 Motion in Limine No. 1 - 510(K) Clearance of the Avaulta Products by the United States Food and Drug Administration ("FDA"), or Lack of FDA Enfor cement Action; denying Plaintiffs' 266 Motion in Limine No. 2 - Surgical Consent Forms; granting in part and denying in part Bard's 268 Motion in Limine No. 24 and denying Bard's remaining motions in limine; denying Bard's 298 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/27/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
June 14, 2013 |
Filing
280
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration) plaintiffs' 276 Motion for Reconsideration is granted in part as to Dr. El-Ghannam and Dr. Klosterhalfen and denied in part as to Dr. Ostergard. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
June 4, 2013 |
Filing
274
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motions) granting 91 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Denniz Zolnoun, MD, MPH; granting 94 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dean Alte nhofen, M.D.; granting 98 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Bob Shull, M.D.; granting 100 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Timothy J. Loving, Ph.D. and Janell L. Carroll, Ph. D.; granting in part and denying in part 103 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians; granting in part and denying in part 108 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Te stimony of Dr. Bernd Klosterhalfen, M.D.; granting in part and denying in part 110 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Lennox Hoyte, M.D.; granting in part and denying in part 113 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of David A. Kessler, M.D.; granting in part and denying in part 127 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anthony B. Brennan, Ph.D; granting in part and denying in part 130 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ahmed El-Ghannam, Ph.D.; granting in part and denying in part 154 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Julia E. Babensee, Ph.D.; granting in part and denying in part 250 MOTION by Dan Cisson, Donna Cisson to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Marta Villaraga, Ph.D. and Maureen Reitman, Sc.D. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/4/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
May 17, 2013 |
Filing
257
ORDER (Bard's Motion for Protective Order to Seal) the 240 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Protective Order to Seal is Denied as to Exhibit B and taken under advisement as to Exhibit A. By 5/22/2013, Bard is directed to submit to the court' ;s law clerk via email (1) a chart with the identifying information for each exhibit identified in Exhibit B (to the extent exhibits are used in duplicate pleadings, each exhibit must have a separate entry) and (2) a copy of the exhibit for each entr y on the chart. By 5/24/2013, Bard is directed to file a chart as outlined herein, along with a set of newly dedesignated or redacted exhibits, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/17/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh)
|
May 2, 2013 |
Filing
243
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Supplemental Deposition Of Roger Darois and the Deposition of Dan Lafever) granting in part and denying in part 177 MOTION by Dan Cisson, Donna Cisson for Leave to Take the Sup plemental Deposition of Roger Darois and the Deposition of Dan LaFever. Plaintiffs may take the supplemental deposition of Mr. Darois, but may not depose Mr. LaFever. Granting Plaintiffs' motion for leave to reopen discovery for the limited purpose of deposing Mr. Darois on the email communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/2/2013. (cc: counsel of record) (skh)
|
April 22, 2013 |
Filing
201
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Defendant's Motion for Protective Order) granting in part and denying in part 133 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Entry of Protective Order as outlined herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/22/2013. (cc: attys) (skh)
|