Gardiner et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Kari Gardiner and Christopher Gardiner |
Defendant: |
Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, American Medical Systems, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Sofradim Production SAS, Boston Scientific Corporation, Coloplast Corp., Mentor Worldwide, LLC and Cook Medical, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv22370 |
Filed: |
August 28, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph R. Goodwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Timely Effect Service of Process; because there remains other defendants in this case that did not join the motion to dismiss, the court ORDERS that only Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson be DISMISSED from this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/11/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
|
July 21, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER Cook's motion to show cause is GRANTED and Cook's motion to dismiss is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; it is ORDERED that, within 30 days, the plaintiffs pay Cook a $500.00 monetary sanction and show cause why their case should not be di smissed with prejudice; in the event the plaintiffs do not pay Cook $500.00 and show cause within 30 days, the plaintiffs' claims against Cook shall be dismissed with prejudice without further notice to the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (cc: counsel of record; plaintiffs, via certified mail, return receipt requested) (hkl)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The 20 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Dismiss is GRANTED, and AMS is DISMISSED with prejudice. Other defendants remain in this case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/18/2016. (cc: counsel of record; plaintiffs, via certified mail, return receipt requested) (mek)
|
August 2, 2016 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 17 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Dismiss, as more fully set forth herein; the plaintiffs have 30 business days from the entry of this Order to submit a completed PPF to AMS; the plaintiffs are remin ded that the PPF and other forms relevant to participating in this MDL are available at http://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/amsinc/forms.html; information on where to submit the PPF is also available on the court's website; failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal with prejudice upon motion by the defendants. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/2/2016. (cc: counsel of record; plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested) (bdr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?