Turner v. West Virginia Regional Jail Authority et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard Dale Turner |
Defendant: |
West Virginia Regional Jail Authority, Perry, Allen, Holiday, Toney and Medical Staff |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv04346 |
Filed: |
February 23, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
Cabell |
Presiding Judge: |
Dwane L. Tinsley |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Copenhaver |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 24, 2019 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS It is ORDERED that the findings made in both 39 and 48 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the magistrate judge are adopted by the court and incorporated herei n; defendant Holiday's 44 Motion to Dismiss for failure to prosecute be is granted and that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/24/2019. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record; United States Magistrate Judge) (ts)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing (1) That defendant Holidays objection to the PF&R is overruled; (2) That the magistrate judge's 36 Proposed Findings and Recommendation as to Sgt. Toney and C.O. Holiday are adopted and incorporated in f ull; (3) That the defendants' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the plaintiff's claim against Sgt. Toney is granted and that defendant Tony be dismissed from this action; (4) That the defendants' 29 Motion for Summar y Judgment with respect to the plaintiff's claim against C.O. Holiday is denied; and (5) That this matter is again referred to United States Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for additional proceedings. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (cc: plaintiff; the magistrate judge; counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
28
ORDER adopting and incorporating the 26 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge; directing that the 13 Motion by C.O. Holiday and Sgt. Toney to dismiss is denied as moot; the 16 Motion by West Virginia Regional Jail Authority to Dismiss is granted; the West Virginia Regional Jail Authority is dismissed from this action. The matter continues to be referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley as to the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 2/28/2018. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record; United States Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley) (taq)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?