Reef v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Vera Reef |
Defendant: |
Boston Scientific Corporation and C. R. Bard, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv11006 |
Filed: |
November 17, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Charleston Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph R. Goodwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 16 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice, for the reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/19/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn)
|
May 9, 2018 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER The 13 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice is DENIED without prejudice; the plaintiff must serve her completed PFS on BSC on or before 6/11/2018; failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal with prejudice upon motion by BSC; plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested, and file a copy of the receipt. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/9/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 8 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss, as more fully set forth herein; the plaintiff has 30 business days from the entry of this Order to submit to BSC a completed PPF; failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal upon motion by the defendant; plaintiff's counsel send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested, and file a copy of the receipt. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/14/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?