Harris et al v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Harris and N. M. B.
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Anda, Inc., Indivior, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, Wal-Mart Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., H. D. Smith Holding Company, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, SpecGx LLC, Noramco, Inc., H. D. Smith, LLC, Rite Aid Corp., Depomed, INC., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00707
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to McKesson Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613225. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Mallinckrodt plc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613232. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Mallinckrodt LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613249. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613256. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Noramco, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613263. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Miami-Luken, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613270. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613287. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613096. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to H. D. Smith Holding Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613102. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613119. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613126. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Depomed, INC.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613133. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to CVS Health Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613140. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Cardinal Health, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613171. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Anda, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613188. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613201. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613195. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Johnson & Johnson. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613218. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Cephalon, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613164. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613157. (lca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Wal-Mart Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613331. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613294. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613300. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Walgreen Eastern Co. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613317. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/14/2019 as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002613324. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to Walgreen Co. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615120. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to The Kroger Co.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615137. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615151. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to SpecGx LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615168. (kew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615144. (kew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to H. D. Smith, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610361. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610323. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Allergan PLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610330. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Actavis LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610347. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610354. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610385. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610378. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Rite Aid Corp. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610408. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/12/2019 as to Indivior, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002610392. (ts)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Depomed, INC., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. D. Smith Holding Company, H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC, H. D. Smith, LLC, Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons as to Allergan PLC, #3 Summons as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #4 Summons as to Anda, Inc., #5 Summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #6 Summons as to Cephalon, Inc., #7 Summons as to Cephalon, Inc., #8 Summons as to CVS Health Corporation, #9 Summons as to Depomed, INC., #10 Summons as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #11 Summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #12 Summons as to H. D. Smith Holding Company, #13 Summons as to H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC, #14 Summons as to H. D. Smith, LLC, #15 Summons as to Indivior, Inc., #16 Summons as to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., #17 Summons as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #18 Summons as to Johnson & Johnson, #19 Summons as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #20 Summons as to Mallinckrodt plc, #21 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, #22 Summons as to Miami-Luken, Inc., #23 Summons as to Noramco, Inc., #24 Summons as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #25 Summons as to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #26 Summons as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #27 Summons as to Rite Aid Corporation, #28 Summons as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #29 Summons as to SpecGx LLC, #30 Summons as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #31 Summons as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., #32 Summons as to The Kroger Company, #33 Summons as to Walgreen Company, #34 Summons as to Walgreen Eastern Company, #35 Summons as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #36 Summons as to Wal-Mart Inc., #37 Summons as to Watson Laboratories, Inc., #38 Summons as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) (kew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Stacey Harris, N. M. B. for All Plaintiffs, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Actavis, LLC, #2 Allergan, PLC fka Actavis, PLC, #3 Amerisourcebergen Corporation, #4 Anda, Inc., #5 Cardinal Health, Inc., #6 Cephalon, Inc., #7 Costco Wholesale Corporation, #8 CVS Health Corporation, #9 DepoMed, Inc., #10 Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #11 Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #12 H. D. Smith Holding Company, #13 H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC, #14 H. D. Smith, LLC, #15 Indivior, Inc., #16 Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #17 Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #18 Johnson & Johnson, #19 Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC dba Mallinckrodt, LLC, #20 Mallinckrodt, PLC, #21 McKesson Corporation, #22 Miami-Luken, Inc., #23 Noramco, Inc., #24 Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #25 Par Parmaceutical Companies, Inc., #26 Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #27 Rite Aid Corporation, #28 Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., #29 Specgx, LLC, #30 Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, #31 Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #32 The Kroger Company, #33 Walgreen Company, #34 Walgreen Eastern Company, #35 Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #36 Wal-Mart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #37 Watson Laboratories, Inc., #38 Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. nka Actavis, Inc.)(Barney, David)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Image was a redlined version of complaint. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
September 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7398148. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Modified on 10/2/2019 to replace redlined version of complaint)(ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Harris
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Represented By: Stephen P. New
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M. B.
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Represented By: Stephen P. New
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?