Saunders v. Frame et al
Plaintiff: Quantel Saunders
Defendant: John Frame, Scott Smith, Richard Toney, Unidentified SRT Team Officers, Mike Buzzard, Andrew Hill and Ryan Hill
Case Number: 2:2020cv00220
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Buzzard, John Frame, Andrew Hill, Ryan Hill, Scott Smith, Richard Toney, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to John Frame, #2 Summons as to Mike Buzzard, #3 Summons as to Richard Toney, #4 Summons as to Ryan Hill, #5 Summons as to Scott Smith) (kew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for Scott Smith, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for Mike Buzzard, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for Ryan Hill, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for Andrew Hill, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for Richard Toney, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Quantel Saunders for John Frame, re: #1 Complaint. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
May 20, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3, #4, #5, #6, #7 and #7 Summonses. ERROR: Summonses did not contain the addresses of the persons being served. CORRECTION: Images removed. (kew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 FILED INCORRECTLY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/20/2020 to remove image for filling error) (kew).
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 26, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7582283. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Frame et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantel Saunders
Represented By: Paul M. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified SRT Team Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Buzzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?