Carter v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher Carter
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Charleston Comprehenstive Treatment Center, Mark Elliot McDaniel and Jared Muse
Case Number: 2:2023cv00461
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the unopposed #15 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Vacate the #3 Order and Notice; the dates and deadlines in the #3 Order and Notice are VACATED. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/22/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Carter in support of #15 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Vacate #3 Order and Notice. (Mincer, David)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Vacate #3 Order and Notice. (Mincer, David)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY by Christopher Carter to #9 Response In Opposition. (Mincer, David)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by David J. Mincer updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Christopher Carter. (Mincer, David)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Robert J. MacDonald from Circuit Court of Kanawha County filed on behalf of Christopher Carter. (Mincer, David)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Mark Elliot McDaniel, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Mark Elliot McDaniel served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (kew)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Acceptance of Service. ERROR: Incorrect filing code used. CORRECTION: Image removed and refiled at entry #11 using correct filing code. (kew)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #11. (Modified on 8/15/2023 to remove image filed using incorrect filing code; see entry #11) (kew).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. in opposition to #6 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and Award of Attorney's Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dean, Mark)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION extending time to respond to the Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal is extending 30 days after a decision on the #6 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and Award of Attorney's Fees by Christopher Carter, Mark Elliot McDaniel. (Mincer, David) (Modified on 7/28/2023 to add link to #1 notice of removal and #6 motion and to add party filer) (kew).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Carter in support of #6 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and for Award of Attorney Fees (ts)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Christopher Carter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County and Award of Attorney's Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ts). (Modified on 7/27/2023 to add motion for attorney fees) (ts)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jared Muse. (Dean, Mark)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Dean, Mark)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED PURSUANT TO #17 ORDER: ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 7/31/2023. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 8/14/2023. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 8/21/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 8/25/2023, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/30/2023. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 9/8/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/11/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo) Modified on 8/22/2023 to note vacated. (arb)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8449199. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Carter
Represented By: David J. Mincer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Charleston Comprehenstive Treatment Center
Represented By: Mark C. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Elliot McDaniel
Represented By: Katherine B. Capito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Muse
Represented By: Mark C. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?