Sigman et al v. CSX Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brandy Sigman, Deborah Abbott, Harley Cheyenna Abbott, Keeley Shey Abbott, Terry Abbott, D. A., Thomas Akers, James M. Angel, James Mark Ashwell, B. A., Drema Ruth Ballard, Margaret Barrough, Ronald Bobbitt, Rita Bohanna, Edith Bostic, Latosha Bragg, Tracy Bragg, A. B., J. B., K. B., M. B., T. B., Joseph M. Brogan, Kimberlie Brogan, Robert Brogan, Timothy D. Brogan, Travis A. Brogan, Jean Brown, Lawrence E. Brown, II, Harry Carelli, Suann Carelli, Destyne Copering, Randy Danbery, Ashley Denny, Anita Diaz, Ashley Duncan, Michael Shane Dunlap, Lynn Foster, Melinda Foster, B. F., M. F., Elizabeth Goodyear, Brandi Haberfield, M. G., Peggy Harper, Freddie Hill, Richard Houchins, Regina Houchins, H. B., Cathy Hudnall, Darrell Hudnall, III, Adam Neil Jones, Bradley Justice, Floyd Kenney, Sherri Kenney, Barbara Lehman, Andy R. Lovejoy, Jr., Andy Lovejoy, Sr., S. L., Eva Lovejoy, E. L., N. L., Jessica Lovejoy, Vickie Lovejoy, Myrtle V. Lucas, Chris Manley, Cody Manley, Patrick Manley, A. M., George McLamure, Jr., Harriet Sue McKown, Rebecca McMillion, Caroline Miller, Devon Miller, Joseph Miller, Bobby Proctor, Edward Reynolds, Rosa Runyon, Joshua E. Short, T. S., Travis Hayes Short, M. S., Dewayne Sigman, Debra L. Sizemore, Debra's Bookkeeping Service, Charles Stevenson, Susan Stevenson, Harold Stewart, C. S., Linda Stewart, Christian Stuber, Melanie Stuber, L. S., A. S. and Regina Yates
Defendant: CSX Corporation and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv13328
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Huntington Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting in part CSX Transportation, Inc.'s 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the punitive damages claim. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/9/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 OMNIBUS ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 223 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's 228 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the EPA Administrative Order on Consent; denying Defendant's 232 MOTION in Limine to Excl ude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. April Watkins; granting in part Defendant's 233 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Samuel Wood; holding in abeyance Defendant's 224 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Plaintiffs to file a Surreply on or before 3/2/2018 and Defendant to file a Surresponse on or before 3/6/2018; holding in abeyance Defendant's 227 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Plaintiffs; directing the parties to provide the Court with a si gnal by the end of the business day on 3/5/2018 regarding the parties' progress on this stipulation and any need for judicial intervention to resolve the question; holding in abeyance Defendant's 229 Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Refere nce, Testimony, or Evidence of Prior Derailments and Rail Defects; holding in abeyance Defendant's 230 Motion in Limine to Advise Jury as to the Settlement of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sperry Rail, Inc.; holding in abeyance Defendant 9;s 231 Motion in Limine to Exclude, or in the Alternative Limit, Evidence of CSXT's Financial Condition and Conditional Motion to Bifurcate Punitive Damages. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/28/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 162 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss the Individual Claims of Samira Dahbi and Abderahmane Eloirzazi Individually and on Behalf of His Minor Child, Alexander Eloirzazi; dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE the claims of these Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/13/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 MOTION by Sperry Rail, Inc. to Compel Plaintiffs to respond to Sperry Rail, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents; directing Plaintiffs to provide supplemental answers within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/27/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 67 MOTION by CSX Transportation, Inc. to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Discovery Questionnaires and for reasonable fees and costs associated with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/18/2016. (cc: counsel of record) (mkw)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant CSX Corporation's 39 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/5/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sigman et al v. CSX Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Sigman
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Abbott
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Cheyenna Abbott
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keeley Shey Abbott
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Abbott
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. A.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Akers
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Angel
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mark Ashwell
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. A.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drema Ruth Ballard
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Barrough
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bobbitt
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bohanna
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Bostic
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Bragg
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bragg
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Brogan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlie Brogan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brogan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Brogan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis A. Brogan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Brown
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Brown, II
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Carelli
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suann Carelli
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destyne Copering
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Danbery
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Denny
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Diaz
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Duncan
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Foster
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Foster
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. F.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Goodyear
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Haberfield
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. G.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Harper
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Hill
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Houchins
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Houchins
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. B.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Hudnall
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Hudnall, III
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Neil Jones
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Justice
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Kenney
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Kenney
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lehman
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy R. Lovejoy, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Lovejoy, Sr.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Lovejoy
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. L.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. L.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lovejoy
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Lovejoy
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle V. Lucas
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Manley
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Manley
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Manley
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McLamure, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Sue McKown
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McMillion
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Proctor
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Reynolds
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Runyon
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua E. Short
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. S.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Hayes Short
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Sigman
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Sizemore
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra's Bookkeeping Service
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stevenson
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Stevenson
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Stewart
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stewart
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Stuber
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Stuber
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. S.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Yates
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Wanda J. Edwards
Represented By: Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Represented By: April N. Ross
Represented By: Carolyn W. Wagner
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: Clifford J. Zatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Represented By: April N. Ross
Represented By: Carolyn W. Wagner
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: Clifford J. Zatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?