Garrett et al v Waupaca Foundry
Plaintiff: Darrell McCarthy, Jason Stallings, Thomas Marshall, Steven Bell, Terry Graham, Roger Howard, Anthony Owens, Joseph Leduff, James Lawson, JR., Joseph Gillespie, Anthony Castello, John Aull, Matthew Milburn, Robert Gogel, Jr, Gerald Chamberlain, Mark Christian, Jermiah Sturgeon, Brandon Ford, Wesley Ball, Mark Sandage, Donald Graves, Josh Hurm, Matthew Hakes, Chris Roark, Christopher Applegate, Donald Buckman, Dewey Dever, III, Michael Seibert, Bruce Hunt, Clint Stoner, Larry Cooper, Jr, Jeremy Hidgon, William Tinch, Merle Denny, Dustin Lindsey, Jamie Wanniger, John Ballew, Aaron Cook, Stephen Byrne, Dean Knepper, Joseph Riley, Gregory Weise, Nicholas Payne, Stephen Richards, Benjamin Horsting, Jonathan Hardman, Brian Devine, Jeremy Galloway, Kenneth Austin, James Holmes, Jr, Jared Ahl, Jeremy Brown, Robert Rudd, David Hakes, Scott Austin, Leon King, Edward Boehman, Christopher Adams, Lucas Shoultz, Gary Austin, John Lashley, Hoy Garrett, Jr, James Faught, Rodney Powers, Casey Banks, David Gunn, Thomas McCauley, JR., Gregory Strathmann, James Franz, Gregory Frizzel, Eric Martin, Gary Butts, Eric Alderson, Michael Richards, Michael Holder, Ronald Howell, III, Howell Roach, Jr, Joseph Roccia, Nicholas Edge, John Thomas, Trevor Dunn, Kenneth Williamson, Donald Lightfoot, Dane Winkler, Thomas Hardman, Christopher Risely, Brian Burnett, Jr, James Spurling, II, Keith Yano, Kevin Sexton, Justin Masterson, Nathan Winings, James Burns, Anthony Plantz, Robert Lee, II, Joshua Hardin, Jason Stiles, David Sandage, William Carwile, Jr, Aaron Strahl, Kenneth Sexton, Jr, Bradley EBerle, Terrence Evrard, Michael Berry, Alan Petri, James Moore, David McStoots, Matthew Sims, Jefferson Taylor, Steven Nunn, Traci Schaefer, Steven Dewitt, Troy Todd, Kyle Greenwell, Stanley Fuqua, Jr, Bryan Young, Kevin Brock, David Beertzer, Jr, Michael Simmons, James Craig, Robert Johnson, William Shadwick, Annette Kurger, Stephen Bruce, Clyde Miller, Jr, Jason Powers, Timothy Campbell, Kenneth Williams, Paul Carver, Jesse Underhill, Eric Frizzel, Scott Dewitt, Michael Thorn, William Martin, Jim McCallister, Richard Carlisle, Bernard Byrd, Isaac McCarty and David Zazzetti
Defendant: Waupaca Foundry Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01186
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/14/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 14, 2018 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. The Court approves the preliminary settlement. The parties will submit a proposed order to the Court for e-filing. (Tape #091418) (lh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 63 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Benson, Paul)
August 22, 2018 Filing 62 DISCLOSURE Statement by Waupaca Foundry Inc. (Benson, Paul)
August 2, 2018 Filing 61 LETTER to Eric Presnell regarding admission and ECF filing (sent via USPS) (jcl)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2018 Filing 59 CLOSED TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin for settlement approval. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 8/1/2018.(TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Settlement Approval, filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minutes of 7/19/18 Telephonic Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William C. Griesbach. The parties have reached a global settlement for the Indiana, Wisconsin, and Tennessee cases and will be seeking the transfer of the Tennessee case to EDWI. Upon approval of the transfer of the Tennessee case, the parties anticipate filing a settlement agreement by 7/30/2018 and a motion for preliminary approval by 8/2/2018. The Court grants the parties' request for a stay of all deadlines. The Telephone Status Conference in this matter set for 8/3/2018 09:00 AM is removed from the court calendar. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
July 19, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/19/2018 04:30 PM (Central Time) before Judge William C. Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you should have any questions. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 56 LETTER filed by Plaintiffs' counsel, J Gordon Rudd in ED-WI Case 1:08-cv-00488-WCG advising the Court that the parties have reached a proposed settlement in the Wisconsin, Indiana, and Tennessee cases and requesting a telephone conference. (TF)[Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 55 Defendant's ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint in Collective and Class Action and Request for Jury Trial, filed by WAUPACA FOUNDRY.(DeGuire, Alexander) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Judge William C. Griesbach: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. The parties' oral motion to consolidate Case No. 3:18-CV-00026 with this action is granted. All future docketing will occur in this action and Case No. 3:18-CV-00026 will be terminated. The Court orders the case caption amended in accordance with the #50 Consolidated Amended Complaint. The proposed notice and notice program for the FLSA claims is to be filed within 28 days. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2018 09:00 AM (Central Time) before Judge William C. Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael D. Bess for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 6/26/2018. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Lee M. Seese for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 6/26/2018. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Alexander M DeGuire for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 6/26/2018. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Complaint in Colletive and Class Action and Request for Jury Trial against WAUPACA FOUNDRY, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (Adams Opt-In Plaintiffs), #2 Exhibit - B (Sarrell Opt-In Plaintiffs))(Rudd, J.) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 49 Statement Supplemental Joint Statement Concering Case Management Issues by All Plaintiffs. (Rudd, J.) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Bess to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4937650), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lee M. Seese to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4935581), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexander M. DeGuire to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4935535), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Benjamin A. Kaplan on behalf of WAUPACA FOUNDRY (Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Judge William C. Griesbach. The court will contact counsel via email with call-in information. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 6/11/2018.(Griesbach, William)[Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff (Shoultz)) (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 42 Statement Concerning Case Management Issues (Joint) by All Plaintiffs. (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER approving #40 Stipulation signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/23/2018. The due date by which the parties shall either submit an agreed upon proposed notice and notice program for the FLSA claims in this case, or pleadings that set forth the items upon which they agree and a single brief of no more than 10 pages explaining their respective positions on the items upon which they do not agree, is extended to 4/27/2018.(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 40 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline in 3/26/18 Order by One Week, re #39 OrderTerminate HearingsTerminate Motions, filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Deadline in 3/26/18 Order by One Week)(Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting re #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The conference scheduled for 3/27/18 is removed from the court's calendar. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Joint Motion to Adjourn Case Management Conference in which to #36 Scheduling ConferenceSet Hearings , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Adjourn Case Management Conference)(Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Agreed Proposal Concerning Consolidation by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Proposal Concerning Consolidation) (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C. Griesbach: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/9/2018. The parties anticipate filing a joint motion to consolidate 3:18-cv-00026-WCG Shadwick v. Waupaca Foundry, Inc with this case. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2018 10:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge William C. Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Filing 35 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
January 8, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference rescheduled to 2/9/2018 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Judge William C. Griesbach. (TF) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Adjourn Case Management Filing and Conference, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 1/5/2018. The January 12, 2018 Scheduling Conference is removed from the Court calendar. The WIED Clerk is directed to reschedule the conference as requested. See Order for Full Detail.(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 33 Submission of Proposed Order , re #32 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Case Management Filing and Conference, filed by All Plaintiffs . (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Case Management Filing and Conference, filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order dated 12-27-17)(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint , filed by WAUPACA FOUNDRY.(Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 12/19/2017. Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2018 10:20 AM (Eastern Time) before Judge William C. Griesbach.(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #23 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's fraud claim is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to set a scheduling conference in this matter. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 12/19/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 28 REPLY in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss [PARTIAL] Re: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has leave to file its reply brief, in support of its #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, on or before 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 11/27/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to 12/01/2017 re #23 MOTION to Dismiss [PARTIAL] Re: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss [PARTIAL] Re: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Joseph Snodgrass, #2 Exhibit A - Shadwick Declaration)(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss [PARTIAL] Re: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss [PARTIAL] Re: Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant Waupaca Foundry Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Benson, Paul) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 11/7/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by All Plaintiffs . (Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Collective and Class Action against WAUPACA FOUNDRY, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Snodgrass, Thomas) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mitchell W. Quick for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 10/11/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Benjamin A Kaplan for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 10/11/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul E. Benson for WAUPACA FOUNDRY added. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 10/11/2017. (Griesbach, William) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 16 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mitchell W. Quick to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4575500), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin A. Kaplan to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4575448), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul E. Benson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-4575409), filed by Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wm Michael Schiff on behalf of Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Schiff, Wm) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Shoulders on behalf of Defendant WAUPACA FOUNDRY. (Shoulders, Patrick) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(a), this matter will proceed without the assignment of a magistrate judge. Please include the new case number: 3:17-cv-00140-WCG on all future filings in this matter. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 10/3/2017. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(NLR) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP057098 for FILING fee in the amount of $400, paid by Attorney Thomas J. Snodgrass. (MEH) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 7 Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b) the Honorable William C. Griesbach has been randomly assigned to perform the duties of the district judge in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana for this matter. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge William C. Griesbach. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 3:17-cv-00140-WCG-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge William C. Griesbach for all further proceedings. This case is related to Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number, 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/7/2017.(JD) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 2 Submission of Docket Sheet for Case #1:08-cv-488-WCG Eastern District of Wisconsin. (JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Severing Case - Originally docketed in the Eastern District of Wisconsin Case Number 1:08-cv-488-WCG. Signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(JRB) [Transferred from insd on 8/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v Waupaca Foundry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell McCarthy
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Stallings
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Marshall
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bell
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Graham
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Howard
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Owens
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leduff
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lawson, JR.
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gillespie
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Castello
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Aull
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Milburn
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gogel, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Chamberlain
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Christian
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermiah Sturgeon
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ford
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Ball
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sandage
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Graves
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Hurm
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hakes
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Roark
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Applegate
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Buckman
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewey Dever, III
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Seibert
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Hunt
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Stoner
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Cooper, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hidgon
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tinch
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle Denny
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Lindsey
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Wanniger
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ballew
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Cook
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Byrne
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Knepper
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Riley
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Weise
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Payne
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Richards
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Horsting
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hardman
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Devine
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Galloway
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Austin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Holmes, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Ahl
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Brown
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rudd
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hakes
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Austin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon King
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Boehman
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Adams
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Shoultz
Represented By: Paula R Jackson
Represented By: J Russ Bryant
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Gordon E Jackson
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Austin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lashley
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoy Garrett, Jr
Represented By: Paula R Jackson
Represented By: J Russ Bryant
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Gordon E Jackson
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Faught
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Powers
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Banks
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gunn
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McCauley, JR.
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Strathmann
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Franz
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Frizzel
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Martin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Butts
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alderson
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richards
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Holder
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Howell, III
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howell Roach, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Roccia
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Edge
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Dunn
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Williamson
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lightfoot
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Winkler
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hardman
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Risely
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Burnett, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spurling, II
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Yano
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sexton
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Masterson
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Winings
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burns
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Plantz
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee, II
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Stiles
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sandage
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Carwile, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Strahl
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Sexton, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley EBerle
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Evrard
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Berry
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Petri
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McStoots
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sims
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson Taylor
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nunn
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Schaefer
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dewitt
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Todd
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Greenwell
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Fuqua, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Young
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Brock
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Beertzer, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Simmons
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Craig
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Shadwick
Represented By: Paula R Jackson
Represented By: J Russ Bryant
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Gordon E Jackson
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Kurger
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bruce
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Miller, Jr
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Powers
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Campbell
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Williams
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Carver
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Underhill
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Frizzel
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dewitt
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thorn
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Martin
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim McCallister
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carlisle
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Byrd
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac McCarty
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zazzetti
Represented By: John Gordon Rudd, Jr
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waupaca Foundry Inc
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Patrick A. Shoulders
Represented By: Michael D Bess
Represented By: Paul E Benson
Represented By: Eric T Presnell
Represented By: Lee M Seese
Represented By: Wm Michael Schiff
Represented By: Benjamin A Kaplan
Represented By: Alexander M DeGuire
Represented By: Mitchell W Quick
Represented By: Patrick A Shoulders
Represented By: W Michael Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?