Akins et al v. Worley Catastrophe Response, LLC et al

Defendant: Worley Catastrophe Response, LLC, Worley Catastrophe Services, LLC and Michael Allen Worley
Plaintiff: Alcidez Andrade, James Rinker, Brian Peterson, Long Ho, Earl Jones, Richard Collins, Milas Love, John Shaffett, John Nguyen, James Vu, Jessee Meade, Kimberly Brown, Van Snider, Billy Saranthus, Tim Baldry, Dung Vu, Betty Jernigan, Laneta Hayes, James Montana, Russell McNeil, Robert Lynch, Craig Chavers, John Bier, Damian Day, Thuy Nguyen, Michael Szush, Jonathan McCraney, John McCraney, Shane Morel, David Vincent, John Akins, Tim Allen, Emory Archer, Mark Barlow, Joel Barton, Shirley Bates, Cory Bell, Steven Berry, Anthony Billiot, Harry Blue, Michael Boyce, Holly Branch, Leonard Branham, Denis Bray, Ryan Brown, John Burns, Roman Calabrese, Vance Campbell, Anthony Campo, Robert Carbo, Jeffrey Champion, Christine Chapman, David Coffman, Charlene Coker, Angela Craft, Booker T. Creighton, III, Carol Crump, Brian Curran, Eric Davis, Thomas Davis, Tom Davis, Dan Dawson, Gregory Del Cid, Kenneth Delcogliano, Lori Diaz, Adam Dilley, Shannon Dinger, Sylvester Drain, Christopher Dykes, Charlie English, Chris Erbach, Robbie Ewen, Bruce Faulkner, Mark Fender, Richard Finney, Virginia Finney, Linda Ford, Jason Fowler, Michael Fowler, Clifton Franklin, Sanford French, Donald Fritz, Dennis Fritz, Brian Fussell, Marlin Germany, Billy Gipson, Leslie Glade, Daniel Glover, Cynthia Gonzalez, Terrell Greene, Richard Grossman, Bobby Grubbs, Lance Guinn, James Hall, Jeff Hardigree, Allen Hayward, Matthew Head, Roberto Herrera, Kenneth Horne, Jr., Ronald Horst, Eric Howell, Greg Jack, Elizabeth Jack, Dale Jackson, Wanda Jacobs, Elwood Jacobs, Corey Jacobson, Dale Jakeway, Paul Johnson, Wayne E. Jones, Delia Jones, Mary Kelly, Mark Kemp, Warren Kopecky, Joseph Ladd, Guillermo Lago, Carita Langham-Williams, Maria Lara, Clayton Leverett, Brandon Lewis, Robert Lindley, Dean Lucius, Don Lynch, Michael Mackey, James Mark, Kenneth Mattair, Suzie Maxwell, Chris Mayes, Michael McCain, Rebecca McCoy, Ernest McLean, Rebekah McMaster, William McMurray, Preston Melton, Jr., Sandra Moffett, Roy Mooney, Bryan Moore, Philip Moore, Matthew Morgan, Susan Morris, Peter Muller, Jr., Michael Murray, Audrey Myhre, Dennis Myhre, Lanny Necaise, Charles Newton, Kristopher Norman, April Parker, Wade Partridge, Ryan Perrin, Adam Podzemny, Dwight Porshakin, Chris Putman, Ellis Reed, Chelsey Reeves, Martha Rehders, Andrew Reine, Thomas Richardson, Louis Roberts, Adam Rosenberg, Claude Royster, Louis Ruffino, Joshua Sanders, Rebecca Schayot, Lester Scott, Robert Scott, Jr., Leon Seabrooks, Randall Self, Clay Self, Robert Shelden, Stephen Skrocki, Keith Smith, Larry Smith, David Sololowski, Angel Soltero, Ronald Sorenson, Dale St. Clair, Jeffrey Paul Steeves, Thomas Steffes, George Sullivan, Terrance Sullivan, Jason Summerlin, Brant Summerlin, Charles Summey, Erin Thibodeaux, Jay Thornton, Thuy Tran, D. Brent Walker, John Walet, Jason Walls, Bethel Warden, Claudia Warden, Brian Warden, David Weber, James Wells, Bruce Wells, Linda West, Brandy Wheat, Jonathan Whitaker, Fred White, Tom White, Byron Wild, Jeffrey Williams, Richard Wolfe, Ronald Wright, Milford Yeager, Shawn York, John Young, Marc Young, Anthony Zanca, Lawana Stewart, Alma Zuniga, George Gonzales, Joe Castella and Thurston Smith
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02401
Filed: September 30, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216(b) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS on Plaintiffs' 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Having considered the complaint, as amended, the submissions of the parties and the applicable law, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED, for the reasons set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/8/13. (tbl)
April 14, 2014 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTION. For all of the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion to approve settlement is GRANTED as to all plaintiffs except Ronald Sorenson, Jr. (whose claims have been preserved and severed), but only as mod ified above concerning the amount of approved attorney's fees and resulting recalculation of the increased amounts to be paid to participating plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby dismissed, each party to bear its own fees and costs except as provided in the confidential settlement agreement, without prejudice to the rights of the parties to move for summary judgment seeking to enforce the settlement or to reopen the matter if settlement is not consummated, as provided in Local Rule 41.2. The court also retains jurisdiction over the parties and their confidential settlement agreement, including the fee-sharing agreement among plaintiffs attorneys, for purposes of enforcing such agreements should any controversy ar ise about the terms of the agreements or any party's performance of its obligations thereunder for a reasonable time after the final payment to any party is due to be paid under the confidential settlement agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, upon the court's receipt of a joint motion to dismiss to be filed by the parties no later than 60 days after the disbursement of the balance of the payments as specified in the confidential settlement agreement, the court will enter a final orde r dismissing with prejudice all claims of all plaintiffs in this action, each party to bear its own fees and costs except as provided in the confidential settlement agreement, except that the claims of any non-participating plaintiffs as defined in t he confidential settlement agreement shall be dismissed without prejudice to any rights such non-participating plaintiffs may have to refile such claims in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. The parties shall iden tify in their joint motion to dismiss the names of any non-participating plaintiffs, or shall indicate that there are no non-participating plaintiffs, as the case may be. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/11/14. (tbl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2014: # 1 Unredacted Version) (bbc). (Main Document 329 replaced on 4/14/2014) (bbc).
February 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS. For the reasons set forth herein, defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' claim against Mr. Worley is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/4/13. (tbl)
March 4, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the Sullivan Plaintiffs' motions to intervene are DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED IN PART pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502; Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(5)(B); and the parties' Stipulate d FRCP 26(c) Protective Order and FRE 502(d) and (e) Clawback Agreement/Order, Record Doc. No. 31, in that the CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED to place Record Doc. Nos. 48, 49, 49-1, 49-3 (Intervenors' Exhibit 1) and 55 under seal. The motion is DENIED insofar as it seeks to strike the motions to intervene, which I have ruled on above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Sullivan Plaintiffs must immediately return the subject privileged e-mail and all copies to plaintiffs' counsel and must cease immediately any further dissemination of its content. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/4/13. (tbl)
April 8, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTION. For the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to certify a collective class is GRANTED and that a collective class is conditionally certified, as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that and Wo rley must provide plaintiffs with the full names and last known addresses, telephone numbers and e-mail addresses of all potential collective action members no later than fourteen (14) days after entry of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaint iffs' motion is GRANTED as to the proposed Notice and Consent forms and the schedule set forth in their Exhibits 1 and 2, Record Doc. Nos. 71-4 and 71-5, which must be modified to provide for a 30-day opt-in period. Plaintiffs must prepare the revised forms of notice and consent in accordance with this order, and file them in the record no later than April 12, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/8/13. (tbl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Akins et al v. Worley Catastrophe Response, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Catastrophe Response, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Catastrophe Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allen Worley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcidez Andrade
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rinker
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Peterson
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Ho
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Jones
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Collins
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milas Love
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shaffett
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nguyen
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vu
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessee Meade
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Brown
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Snider
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Saranthus
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Baldry
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dung Vu
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jernigan
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laneta Hayes
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Montana
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell McNeil
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lynch
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Chavers
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bier
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Day
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Nguyen
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Szush
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan McCraney
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McCraney
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Morel
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vincent
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Akins
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Allen
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory Archer
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Barlow
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Barton
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Bates
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Bell
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Berry
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Billiot
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Blue
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyce
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Branch
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Branham
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Bray
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Brown
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burns
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Calabrese
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Campbell
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Campo
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carbo
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Champion
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Chapman
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Coffman
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Coker
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Craft
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Booker T. Creighton, III
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Crump
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Curran
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Davis
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Davis
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Davis
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Dawson
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Del Cid
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Delcogliano
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Diaz
Represented By: April L. Walter
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Dilley
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Dinger
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Drain
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dykes
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie English
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Erbach
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Ewen
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fender
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Finney
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Finney
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ford
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Fowler
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fowler
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Franklin
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford French
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Fritz
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Fritz
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fussell
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Germany
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Gipson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Glade
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Glover
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Greene
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Grossman
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Grubbs
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Guinn
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hall
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Hardigree
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Hayward
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Head
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Herrera
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Horne, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Horst
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Howell
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Jack
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Jack
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Jackson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwood Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jacobson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Jakeway
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne E. Jones
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Jones
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kelly
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kemp
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Kopecky
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ladd
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Lago
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carita Langham-Williams
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lara
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Leverett
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lewis
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lindley
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Lucius
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Lynch
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mackey
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mark
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mattair
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzie Maxwell
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mayes
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCain
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McCoy
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest McLean
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah McMaster
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McMurray
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Melton, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Moffett
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Mooney
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Moore
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Moore
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Morgan
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Morris
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Muller, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murray
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Myhre
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Myhre
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanny Necaise
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Newton
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Norman
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Parker
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Partridge
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Perrin
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Podzemny
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Porshakin
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Putman
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Reed
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsey Reeves
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Rehders
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Reine
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Richardson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Roberts
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Royster
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Ruffino
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sanders
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Schayot
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Scott
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Seabrooks
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Self
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Self
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shelden
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Skrocki
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Smith
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sololowski
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Soltero
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sorenson
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale St. Clair
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Paul Steeves
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Steffes
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Summerlin
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brant Summerlin
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Summey
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Thibodeaux
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Thornton
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Tran
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Brent Walker
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walet
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Walls
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Warden
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Warden
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Warden
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weber
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wells
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Wells
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda West
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Wheat
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Whitaker
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred White
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom White
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Wild
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Williams
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wright
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milford Yeager
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn York
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Young
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Young
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Zanca
Represented By: Joseph E. Fieschko, Jr.
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Represented By: Michael A. Starzyk
Represented By: April L. Walter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawana Stewart
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Zuniga
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gonzales
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Castella
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurston Smith
Represented By: J. P. Hughes, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]