Martin v. Roden

Petitioner: Anthony Martin
Respondent: Gary Roden
Case Number: 1:2012cv10312
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Rya W. Zobel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gary Roden, Set Deadlines;( Responses due by 12/3/2012)(Urso, Lisa)
February 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. Claim 1 is DISMISSED for failing to state a violation of federal law. Claims 3 and4 are DISMISSED at petitioners request. Regarding claim 2, it is ORDERED thatpetitioner shall file a written statement as described above. (Urso, Lisa)
April 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Rya W. Zobel: Memorandum of Decision entered denying 5 Motion to Stay; denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration. A certificate of appealability is denied. (Urso, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Roden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Roden
Represented By: Amy L. Karangekis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]