Cooper v. Department of the Army et al

Defendant: Secretary of the Army, Deborah R. Gilg, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr., Department of the Army, Attorney General of the United States and United States Attorney for Nebraska
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Cooper
Case Number: 4:2013cv03086
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's Motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion to transfer venue, (ECF No. 17 ), is granted in part. The clerk of the court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
January 13, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the plaintiff's Motion to Deny Dismissal or Change of Venue, ECF No. 21 , is denied; The defendant's Motion to Strike, ECF No. 22 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
June 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Cooper is directed to either pay to the clerk of the court the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or complete and return to the clerk of the court the Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit befo re July 3, 2013. Failure to comply with this memorandum and order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Cooper Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/3/2013: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application) Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed).(MKR)
June 25, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - My June 10, 2013, Memorandum and Order (Filing No. 4 ) is rescinded. Cooper need not pay any additional filing fees or submit an application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 requires se rvice of the complaint ona defendant within 120 days of filing the complaint. However, because summonses were not issued as to the defendants until June 18, 2013, Cooper is granted, on the courts own motion, an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. Failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. In accordan ce with General Order Number 2013-02, the clerks office is directed to remove this case from the pro se docket and reassign it to the appropriate magistrate judge. This order does not change the assignment of the district judge. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Service of Summons due by 10/23/2013.) Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party(MKR) Modified on 6/25/2013 to remove summons mailed as summons were previously issued(MKR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Department of the Army et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Army
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah R. Gilg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Himpton Holder, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]