Johnson v. Paige et al

Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Defendant: Paige, Ramsey, Weekly, Robertson, Haley, Russell, Hubbard, Lee, Faust, Evans and Hutcherson
Case Number: 1:2014cv00163
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 101 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/01/2016. (rhm)
February 22, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 77 80 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 73 motion for declaratory judgment; granting 64 motion for summary judgment; and dismissing Mr. Johnson's claims against defendants Haley, Faust, Evans, and Hutchinson without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/22/2016. (rhm)
June 19, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/19/2015. (jak)
February 4, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants Aundrea Weekley and James Russell. Weekley's and Russell's last known addresses shall not be made part of any public record. The Clerk of t he Court shall prepare a summons for Weekley and Russell and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons, 2 Complaint, and this Order at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. U pon re-issuance of the summons and complaint, the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to send Plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk of the Court, who shall then remove the addresses prior to forwarding a copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/4/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Paige et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?