Butler v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Michael Lewis Butler
Defendant: Larry Norris, Harmon, Sherryl Evans, Franklin, Forman, Jones, Morrison, Phillips, Hubbard and Anderson
Case Number: 2:2007cv00128
Filed: October 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 181 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against Michael Lewis Butler re 180 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and 156 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/11/10. (bkp)
December 15, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 169 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting 175 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing that the amount of $1,439.25 be disbursed to Clinton D. McGue for reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses and that a copy of this Order, together with the application(s) be placed in the library fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/09. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending pltf's motion to vacate dismissal of this action be denied as moot 159 ; recommending the motion and amended motion to withdraw as pltf's attorney by Clinton McGue 161 162 be granted; further recommending pltf's pro se motion to vacate the settlement agreement 163 be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/9/09. (tjj)
December 3, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clinton McGue to file a supplement to his 169 MOTION for Bill of Costs for reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses and to provide the court with a proposed order on or before December 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing plaintiff's 163 Letter as a pro se motion to vacate the settlement agreement and set aside the September 14, 2009 dismissal of this action; defts shall file a response to pltf's letter/motion within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
September 14, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/14/09. (bkp)
August 21, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons on deft Kathy Stewart and the Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on deft at the address under seal and further directing the Marshal to send plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk who shall then remove the address prior to forwarding a copy to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 8/21/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherryl Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?