Wise v. Lappin et al

Plaintiff: Timothy S Wise
Defendant: Harley G Lappin, T C Outlaw, Darryl Maune, Reginald Weeks, Robbie Taylor, Gary Bowers, Amy Carlton, Matos, Angie Roach, Shaw, Cunningham, Phillips, Refender, Hamilton and Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv00138
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Timothy S Wise and directing the Clerk of the Court to distribute to Barrett & Deacon, PA, the amount of $488.11 from the Fund. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/14/11. (kpr)
May 10, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 119 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/11. (kpr)
July 12, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 95 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 77 Motion to Dismiss filed by Angie Roach and dismissing her as a party deft; denying 75 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gary Bowers, Daryl Maune, Robbie Taylor, 73 Motion to Dismiss filed by G Maldonado, Jr, Harley G Lappin, Harrell Watts and 81 Motion to Dismiss filed by T C Outlaw, Reginald Weeks, Amy Carlton. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/10. (bkp)
April 21, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 80 Response filed by defendants and directing the Clerk to make amend the docket sheet to reflect the correct names of defts Matos, Shah, Cunningham, Phillips, Refender, Hamilton and Barron. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/21/10. (bkp)
April 7, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Order dated March 19, 2010 71 directing counsel for defts to identify the first and last names of the defts whose names are not complete by no later than April 19, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/7/10. (bkp)
March 19, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for the week of April 12, 2010, to be reset by a separate order, and directing counsel for defts to file a pleading identifying the first and last names of the defts whose names are not complete. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/19/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 59 denying 45 Motion to Dismiss and denying 8 Motion for TRO; and ordered that this case is ready to be set for trial. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Lappin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley G Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Maune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?