Gilliam v. Barnes et al

Plaintiff: Alonzo Gilliam, III
Defendant: Chatman, Brooks, Allen, Lang, Foreman, Lane, Butler, Warren, Sherman and Barnes
Case Number: 2:2012cv00091
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 255 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; granting 219 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Allen, Barnes, Butler, Chapman, Cobb, Foreman, Hoskin, Lane, Lang, Smith and Warren. Mr. Gilliam's constitutional claims against these Defendants are DISMISSED, with prejudice. His state law tort claims are dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/14/2014. (mcz)
October 11, 2013 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 216 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, granting Stormi Sherman's 189 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Stormi Sherman are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/11/2013. (mcz)
September 9, 2013 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 199 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Mr. Gilliam's 186 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/9/2013. (mcz)
June 24, 2013 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in all respects 164 Partial Report and Recommendations. Mr. Gilliam's 163 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/24/2013. (dmn)
January 23, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 95 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/23/13. (kpr)
September 13, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/13/12. (vjt)
September 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office; the ADC is directed to file, under seal, deft Clayton Brooks's last-known address, if known, within 14 days from the entry of this Order, so that service of process can be effected; the Clerk is directed to correct names of defts Steven Chapman, Antonio Warren, Harrison Foreman, James Lang, Stephen Lane, Levester Butler Jr., Tony Barnes, Clayton Brooks, and Michael Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/5/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Gilliam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?