Hobbs v. May et al

Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Defendant: Denice Strickland, Earl, Danny Burl, Larry May, M Evans, W Strong, Ray Hobbs, Outlaw, Williams, Wendy Kelly, Todd Ball and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 2:2012cv00132
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 63 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Strickland. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/3/13. (kpr)
March 7, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 MOTION to Compel filed by Denice Strickland. Plaintiff must file a response within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/7/13. (kpr)
February 25, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Wendy Kelly, Williams, W Strong, Earl, Outlaw. These defts have supplied their correct names. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of these defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/25/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts May, Burl, Ball, Payne, Evans and Hobbs for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/12. (kpr)
September 6, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted on Denice Strickland. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for this deft, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint, in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/6/12. (kpr)
August 15, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for defts Outlaw, Strong, Wiliams, Earl, Strickland and Kelly. The Clerk shall prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and Amended Complaint on each deft c/o ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denice Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?