Sorg v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: Mike Sorg
Defendant: Butler, Does and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 2:2015cv00179
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendant Butler's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This cause of action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/11/2016. (mcz)
December 8, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants Does and Arkansas Department of Correction are DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to state viable claims against them. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/8/2015. (mcz)
November 23, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendant Butler without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/23/2015. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorg v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?