Fitzgerald v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Defendant: Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner, Jane Doe and Strong
Case Number: 3:2009cv00065
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/24/2011. (jct)
January 12, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 137 Order entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/12/2011. (jct)
July 14, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure Plaintiff Nathaniel L. Fitzgerald's appearance at the 8/20/10 evidentiary hearing scheduled in Jonesboro, along with Plaintiff's complete medical file & any medical records the ADC may have received from the Crittenden County Detention Center concerning that confinement. A copy of this Order has been provided to the ADC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/14/2010. (jct)
June 21, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, (Evidentiary Hearing rescheduled for 8/20/2010 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere); The Scheduling Order 111 will remain in effect with regard to the deadlines for submission of witness & exhibit lists. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/21/2010. (jct)
January 4, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 23 Answer, directing the Clerk to update the docket to reflect Defendant Strong as Rodney Strong. Counsel for Defendant Shrader is directed to respond to this Order w/i 21 days identifying Dr. Shrader's full name, which was not included in 43 Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/4/2010. (jct)
November 23, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 86 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Lindsey Peterson & 88 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/23/09. (jct)
October 16, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 64 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Although tardy, it appears that Plaintiff has complied with the Court's Order to identify "Nurse Mandy" as Mandy Childress. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/16/09. (jct)
October 14, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Attorney James Matthew Coe to represent Nathaniel L Fitzgerald in all further proceedings in this case. Under Rule 83.7, counsel must make written application to withdraw within 15 days of the date of this Order; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/09. (jct)
July 13, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Babin are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Boyd contained in his Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/13/09. (jct) Modified on 7/13/2009 to correct typo (jct).
July 8, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's pleadings docketed as Docket Entries 26 Letter, 27 Notice, 28 Statement, 29 Statement & 30 Statement are stricken from the record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/09. (jct)
June 8, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 2 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint & 11 Second Amended Complaint, the Clerk is directed to issue Summons for Defendant Shrader & Defendant Peterson, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Defendants without prepayment of fees and c osts or security. Service is not appropraite for Defendant Babin or the Doe defendant. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed against the Doe defendant, he is ordered to identify the Doe defendant on or before 10/1/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/8/09. (jct)
May 22, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Busby, Boyd, Bonner & Strong, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint & Amended Complaint on the named Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed against the Doe Defendant, he is ordered to identify the Doe Defendant on or before 9/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?