McDaniel v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Ray McDaniel
Defendant: Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner and Beasley
Case Number: 3:2009cv00070
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 55 Memorandum and Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/12/2010. (jct)
June 26, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. in their entirety. Accordingly, Thomas G. Montgomery and Bart E. Ziegenhorn are DISMISSED from Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/09. (jct)
June 10, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 2 Complaint & 6 Amended Complaint, directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner, Supervisor Beasley & Angie Branstetter. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the named Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/10/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ray McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?