Brown v. Busby et al

Plaintiff: Hank Brown
Defendant: Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Teresa Bonner and Lindsey Peterson
Case Number: 3:2009cv00114
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 61 Order entered this date, Plaintiff's inadequate medical care claims regarding his injured knee are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, & his inadequate medical care claims regarding tracheotomy are DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Further, the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a) (3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/8/2010. (jct)
April 7, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment is due on or before 5/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/7/2010. (jct)
January 26, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magaistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment is DENIED. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of 20 Answer. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/26/2010. (jct)
September 22, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Pursuant to the screening function mandated by 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A, (a) Plaintiff's moldy shower claim is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and (b) Plaintiff shall PROCEED with his wheelchair-accessible shower claim. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendants Busby, Boyd, Bonner & Peterson, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, & this Order on them without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?