Davis v. Busby et al
Plaintiff: |
Rickey Davis, Jr |
Defendant: |
Dick Busby, Zane Boyd, Tereasa Bonner and Jane Does |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00177 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Jonesboro Office |
County: |
Lincoln |
Presiding Judge: |
Beth Deere |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Leon Holmes |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting pltf 14 days from the entry of this Order to respond to defts' 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to file a short concise statement setting forth the facts he thinks need to be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/4/11. (vjt)
|
October 12, 2011 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 50 Defendants' Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions are now due by 11/3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/12/2011. (jct)
|
August 29, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 45 Defendants' MOTION to Continue Trial and for Extension of all Deadlines. The Court will promptly issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/29/2011. (jct)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER ADOPTING 25 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in all respects in its entirety. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against the Jane Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice under Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m) for failure to obtain service of process upon them. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/2011. (jct)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER, re 2 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint & 11 Second Amended Complaint, directing the Clerk to issue summons for Defendants Busby, Boyd & Bonner, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve said Defendants, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Service is not proper for the Doe Defendants. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed against the Jane Doe Defendants, he must identify & serve those Defendants before 1/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/9/2010. (jct)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order specifically identifying the individuals who acted unconstitutionally & stating how those individuals violated his constitutional rights. Failure to timely & completely respond to this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/24/2010. (jct)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?