Daniels v. Blair et al

Plaintiff: Marcus L Daniels
Defendant: Brown, Frazier, Crittenden County Detention Center, Blair, Zane Boyd, Coleman, Mobley, T Bonner, Fincher, Lindsey, John Dexter, Michael Beard and Correctional Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00150
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 61 Memorandum & Order entered in this matter on this date, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/25/2013. (srw)
March 15, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Response to 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/15/2013. (srw)
November 6, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing separate Defendant Lindsey Peterson from Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice for failure to serve. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/6/2012. (jak)
September 26, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide a present address on Defendant Peterson within thirty days of the date of this Order. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), failure to obtain service shall result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 09/26/2012. (jak)
September 7, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendant Lindsey Peterson and the United States Marshall to serve a copy of the Summons and 4 Amended Complaint on Defendant, in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 09/07/2012. (jak)
August 24, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Phillip Frazier, John Dexter, and Lindsey Peterson. The U.S. Marshall shall serve a copy of the Summons and 4 Amended Complaint on Defendants at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 08/24/2012. (jak)
August 22, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Set Aside Summons Returned Executed; granted as to Defendants Dexter and Frazier, denied as moot to defendant Lindsey Peterson. Defense counsel shall provide to the Court, under seal, the last-known addresses of Defendants Dexter, Frazier, and Lindsey Peterson within ten days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 08/22/2012. (jak)
August 20, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 of Magistrate Judge Joe J Volpe in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that Defendants Blair, Boyd, Coleman, Mobley, Bonner, Correctional Medical Services, Inc., and Crittenden County Detention Center are DISMISSED from this action, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/20/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Blair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fincher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus L Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?