Anderson v. York-Huckabee et al

Plaintiff: Clarence Anderson, Scott H Callahan and Billy Blevins
Defendant: Allison York-Huckabee, David Carter, M Keller, C Looney, N Cobb, Jones, Matthews, Cagle, Cook, Underwood and K Johnson
Case Number: 3:2016cv00258
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/5/2017. (jak)
April 25, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send another copy of 41 Order to Mr. Anderson. The Clerk also is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Pine Bluff Unit. If Mr. Anderson is no longer incarcerated at that Unit, the Warden (or another ADC official) is instructed to provide that information to the Court within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/25/2017. (jak)
April 13, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Anderson an opportunity to file a response opposing the 38 Motion for Summary Judgment within 14 days of this Order. If Mr. Anderson files a response, he must also file a separate, short statement setting forth the disputed fact s that he believes must be decided at a trial. While Mr. Anderson is not required to respond to the motion for summary judgment, if he does not respond, the Court may deem as true the facts set out in the Medical Defendants' 40 Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/13/2017. (jak)
December 8, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Johnson and Huggins. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint, and 25 Supplement to the Amended Complaint on each Defendant without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/8/2016. (jak)
November 1, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt the 7 Recommendation as to Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claim, that claim will proceed. The Recommendation is approved and adopted in all other respects. Anderson may proceed on his excessive force claim agai nst Defendants Cook, Matthews, Jones, Cagle, and Underwood in their individual capacity and on his deliberate indifference claim against K. Johnson and T. Huggins. The Clerk is directed to add LPN K. Johnson and LPN T. Huggins as Defendants in this c ase. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants York-Huckabee, Carter, Keller, Looney, and Cobb as party Defendants. Plaintiff seeks to add Scott H. Callahan and Billy Blevins as Plaintiffs in this case. The Clerk is directed to sever these claims and file them as separate lawsuits. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/1/2016. (jak)
October 14, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Cook, Matthews, Jones, Cagle, and Underwood. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and 5 Amended Complaint and a summons for each of these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/14/2016. (jak)
September 27, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiff Anderson thirty days to file an amended complaint curing the defects identified by the Court. Failure to comply with this Court's Order could result in the dismissal of some, or all, of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/27/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. York-Huckabee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott H Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison York-Huckabee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?