London v. Brush-Strode et al
Plaintiff: Barry D London
Defendant: Brush-Strode, Shana D Brink, R Hicks, E Mendez, Jones, Lillian L Landrigan, Richord Shawn, Glenn, Smith, West, M Hall, S Lake, M Hearyman, Murray, Peterman, Does 1-3, Nurses and Dentist, Does 1-3, Med Provider, Sick-Call Nurse and Dentist Ouachita River Unit, A Schubert, B Sight, Johnson, U Roger and J Wilson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00197
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Barry D London. (ldb)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/12/2021. (lmc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend by Barry D London. (kdr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #15 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Jones, Glenn, Smith, Johnson, Mendez, Lake, and Hearyman. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the #10 Second Amended Complaint and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2021. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #10 Plaintiff's official capacity claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's deprivation of personal property claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's conspiracy claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's co-pay related claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's supervisory liability claims against Defendant Hall be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's dental-related claims against Defendant Landrigan be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Glenn and Smith for violation of prison rules be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claims the he was denied Tums and Tylenol 325 from May, 2021 to July, 2021 be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's legal mail claims be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted.Defendants Brush-Strode, Hicks, Landrigan, Schubert, Sight, Wilson, and Does be DISMISSED as parties from this action. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2021. (lmc)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to file objections to the #7 Court's recommendation. The #12 recommendation has been withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1//2021. (lmc)
November 1, 2021 Summons Issued as to Jones, Glenn, Smith, Johnson, Lake, and Hearyman; and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER withdrawing #7 Recommended Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2021. (jak)
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Barry D London. (llg)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barry D London against All Defendants. (ldb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Barry D London. (ldb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Barry D London. (ldb)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; plaintiff's claims against Defendants Hall, Hearyman, Lake, Johnson, and Glenn regarding MSF-207 be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which reliefmay be granted; Plaintiff's deprivation of personal property claims against Defendants Hicks, Hall, and Mendez be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims against Defendant West be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's conspiracy claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's co-pay related claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's supervisory liability claims against Defendant Hall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's dental-related claims against Defendant Landrigan be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Glenn and Smith for violation of prison protocol be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's claims the he was denied Tums and Tylenol 325 from May, 2021 to July, 2021 be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; Plaintiff's legal mail claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; and Defendants Brush-Strode, Brink, Hicks, Mendez, Landrigan, Glenn, Smith, West, and Does be dismissed as parties from this action. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/13/2021. (jak)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Barry D London. (wbb)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $19.17 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments collected from plaintiff's institutional account to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint in accordance with the instructions contained in this Order within 30 days. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff the 1983 complaint form. #3 Motion for service is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the North Central Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/2021. (jak)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/22/2021. (lmc)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 9/17/2021 as marked on the document. (jak)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Barry D London. (kdr)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Barry D London.(kdr) (Docket entry modified on 9/20/2021 to correct the file date) (jak)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barry D London. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: London v. Brush-Strode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry D London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brush-Strode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shana D Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian L Landrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richord Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hearyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3, Nurses and Dentist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3, Med Provider, Sick-Call Nurse and Dentist Ouachita River Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Sight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?