Garrett v. Andrews et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Lee Garrett
Defendant: Boone, A Noel, Flowers, Hinton, Bryant, Andrews, Spaul, Thomas and Hardy
Case Number: 4:2012cv00230
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 144 Report and Recommendations because the parties have reached a settlement agreement; deft Hardy shall comply with this Order as directed within 30 days; upon deft's compliance, the Clerk shall disburse the funds accordingly; the complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/18/13. (vjt)
August 21, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 137 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Hardy's Motion to Dismiss 123 is GRANTED, and pltf's official capacity claims against Hardy are DISMISSED, but the individual capacity claims are not dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/13. (vjt)
August 13, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying objection 134 filed by Jesse Lee Garrett to this Courts July 17, 2013 Order (Doc. No. 130) listing the witnesses to be allowed at his August 21, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/13/13. (kpr)
July 17, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 119 Witness List filed by Jesse Lee Garrett. The following witnesses are permitted: Johnny Johnson, Gary Andrews, Darrell Flowers, Patricia Winter, and John Randall. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a subpoena directing the appeara nce of the following witness at the August 21, 2013, hearing at 9:30 a.m., United States District Court, 600 W. Capitol Avenue, Courtroom 4C, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201: Johnny Johnson. 74 W. Chrystal Hill Road, Greenbrier, AR 72058, or 475 E. Robi nson St., Lot #159, Conway, AR 72034. The United States Marshal is directed to serve these subpoenas without payment of costs or fees. Defendant shall ensure the presence of requested witnesses Gary Andrews, Darrell Flowers, Patricia Winter, and Jo hn Randall. The Arkansas Department of Correction shall ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Jesse Lee Garrett, together with his medical and institutional files, at the August 21, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 6814 Princeton Pike, Pine Bluff, AR 71602. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/17/13. (kpr)
July 10, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion to Clarify. Defendants' request for an additional seven days in which to provide copies of responses to pltf's discovery requests set out in the Court's Order dated June 25, 2013, is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/10/13. (kpr)
May 3, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 113 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft's 110 Motion to Strike pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment 104 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/13. (vjt)
March 28, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 100 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Hardy's 92 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/28/13. (vjt)
March 15, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 102 Motions to Compel as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/15/13. (kpr)
January 8, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 82 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by defts Andrews, Boone, Bryant, Flowers, Hinton, Noel, Spaul, and Thomas is GRANTED, and these defts are DISMISSED from pltf's amended complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/8/13. (vjt)
October 11, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 70 Response ( 63 First MOTION for Protective Order . Plaintiff is directed to respond to the Court concerning his agreement or disagreement with the proposed Protective Order within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/12. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/10/12. (kpr)
May 7, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Andrews, Bryant, Spaul, Thomas, Hardy, Hinton, Flowers, Boone, and Noel. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve defts in care of the Faulkner County Detention Center, 500 South German Lane, Conway, AR 72034-7014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Andrews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lee Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?