Stompingbear v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Happy Stompingbear
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Wendy Kelley, Keith Waddle, Steven Mitchell, Tony McHan, Treas, Asa Hutchinson, Robinson, Brian Cockrell, Justine Minor, Faust, Clark, Jesse Jackson, Henig, Joshua Mayfield, Gibson, Terrie Banister, Raymond Naylor, James Lowe, Jackson, Grant Harris, Steven Williams, Sharon Cantrell, Garry Jenkins, Samuel Knight, Pearlie Johnson, Jada Lawrence, Randell Watson, David White, Marvin Evans, Does 1-5, Unknown Policy Makers, Publication Committee Members, Classification Committee Members, Liability Insurance Company, Unknown ADC Employees, Rickens, Fulk, Warren Walker, James Gibson, Sean Treas, Paul Fulk, Hazel Robinson, Jeffrey Henig, Moses Jackson, Adam Clark, Nurzuhal Faust and Steven Ricketts
Case Number: 4:2018cv00827
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 46 OBJECTION to #44 Partial Recommended Disposition by Happy Stompingbear. (llg)
December 12, 2018 Summons Reissued as to Sharon Cantrell, Marvin Evans, Paul Fulk, Grant Harris, James Lowe, Tony McHan, Hazel Robinson, Warren Walker, David White and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying, without prejudice #42 motion for court-appointed counsel; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare new summonses for Defendants Marvin Evans, Paul Fulk, Grant Harris, James Lowe, Tony McHan, Hazel Robinson, Warren Walker, David White, and Sharon Cantrell; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve these Defendants with summonses and copies of #2 complaint at the addresses provided under seal, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; and instructing the Clerk to update the docket to reflect the full names of Defendants James Gibson, Nurzuhal Faust, Moses Jackson, Paul Fulk, Jeffrey Henig, Sean Treas, Hazel Robinson, Adam Clark and Defendant "Rickens" should be updated to Steven Ricketts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/12/2018. (cmn)
December 12, 2018 Filing 44 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Happy Stompingbear be denied. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/12/2018. (csf)
December 10, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Happy Stompingbear. (ljb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Happy Stompingbear. (ljb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 41 Separate Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Terrie Banister, Clark, Brian Cockrell, Faust, Gibson, Henig, Jackson, Jesse Jackson, Garry Jenkins, Pearlie Johnson, Wendy Kelley, Samuel Knight, Jada Lawrence, Joshua Mayfield, Justine Minor, Steven Mitchell, Raymond Naylor, Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Rickens, Treas, Keith Waddle, Randell Watson, Steven Williams.(McFadden, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Terrie Banister, Clark, Brian Cockrell, Faust, Gibson, Henig, Jackson, Jesse Jackson, Garry Jenkins, Pearlie Johnson, Wendy Kelley, Samuel Knight, Jada Lawrence, Joshua Mayfield, Justine Minor, Steven Mitchell, Raymond Naylor, Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Rickens, Treas, Keith Waddle, Randell Watson, Steven Williams (McFadden, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 39 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Sharon Cantrell. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 38 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to David White. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 37 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Warren Walker. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 36 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Robinson. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 35 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Tony McHan. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 34 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to James Lowe. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 33 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Grant Harris. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 32 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Fulk. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 11/16/2018 as to Marvin Evans. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Terrie Banister served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clark served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Brian Cockrell served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Faust served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gibson served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Henig served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jackson served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jesse Jackson served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Garry Jenkins served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Pearlie Johnson served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wendy Kelley served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Samuel Knight served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jada Lawrence served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Joshua Mayfield served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Justine Minor served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Steven Mitchell served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Raymond Naylor served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dexter Payne served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marshall Reed served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rickens served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Treas served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Waddle served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Randell Watson served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Steven Williams served on 11/15/2018. (fjg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Partial Recommended Disposition by Happy Stompingbear. (ljb)
November 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to Terrie Banister, Sharon Cantrell, Clark, Brian Cockrell, Marvin Evans, Faust, Fulk, Gibson, Grant Harris, Henig, Jackson, Jesse Jackson, Garry Jenkins, Pearlie Johnson, Wendy Kelley, Samuel Knight, Jada Lawrence, James Lowe, Joshua Mayfield, Tony McHan, Justine Minor, Steven Mitchell, Raymond Naylor, Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Rickens, Robinson, Treas, Keith Waddle, Warren Walker, Randell Watson, David White, Steven Williams and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Mr. Stompingbear's claims against Defendant Asa Hutchinson be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/8/2018. (cmn)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for all Defendants, with the exception of Defendant Hutchinson; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of #2 complaint, with any attachments, and summonses for the Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/8/2018. (cmn)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Ouachita River Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/7/2018. (ljb)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Happy Stompingbear.(kdr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Happy Stompingbear. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stompingbear v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Reed
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Waddle
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony McHan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cockrell
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Jackson
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Mayfield
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrie Banister
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Williams
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Jenkins
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Knight
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlie Johnson
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Lawrence
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randell Watson
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5, Unknown Policy Makers, Publication Committee Members, Classification Committee Members, Liability Insurance Company, Unknown ADC Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Treas
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Henig
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Clark
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurzuhal Faust
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ricketts
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Stompingbear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?