Thornton v. Harmon et al

Plaintiff: Billy Thornton, Jr
Defendant: Greg Harmon, Ray Hobbs, James Gibson, Clay and Kendra S Mayo
Case Number: 5:2009cv00110
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 60 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, in favor of Defendants on all claims; case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. Further, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), it is hereby certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment & the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/2010. (jct)
December 16, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defendant Kendra Mayo without prejudice due to a lack of service; and certifying that an ifp appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/16/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations allowing plaintiff to proceed with his due process claim regarding his transfer to the VSM, but dismissing without prejudice his remaining due process claims for failure to state a claim upon whic h relief may be granted; certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for defts Harmon, Hobbs, Gibson, Clay, and Mayo and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, Complaint, Partial Recommended Disposition, and this Order upon them without prepayment of fees and costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Thornton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra S Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?