Woods v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius Woods
Defendant: Larry Norris, James Gibson, Wendy Kelley, Lay, Strawn, Wendall Taylor, Barnett, Mowles, Pat Myers, Clint Stanley, Blackmon, E Walker and Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00203
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 92 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/11. (vjt)
September 29, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against Dr. James Blackmon and the "Doe" defts are hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to obtain service of process; James Blackmon and Does terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/10. (vjt)
May 24, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 66 ORDER re Partial Report and Recommendations 58 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/10. (vjt)
May 20, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 28 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rory Griffin, Anita Weast and dismissing all claims against these defts without prejudice; 35 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by James Barnett , Nele Hughes, William Straughn, Gaylon Lay, Clint Stanley, Wendy Kelley, David Mowles is granted in part and denied in part: Claims against defts Mowles, Hughes and Kelley are dismissed without prejudice; deliberate indifference claims against defts Straughn and Lay are dismissed without prejudice; and plaintiff is permitted to proceed on his retaliation claims against defts Barnett, Stanley, Straughn, and Lay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendall Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?