Hernandez v. Molden et al

Plaintiff: Albert Hernandez
Defendant: Molden, Wendy Kelley, Robert Parker, Trout, Oneal, Charles Rawls, Debra Turner, Gay, McKenny, Perry, McCallum, Lau, Duensing and John Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00328
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 185 Order entered this date, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/11. (vjt)
April 1, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a dispositive motion addressing the issues raised in this Order within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/1/11. (vjt)
February 17, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 141 Witness List filed by Albert Hernandez' and directing the ADC to ensure plaintiff's attendance at the hearing scheduled for February 28, 2011, together with a copy of his medical records and institutional file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/17/11. (bkp)
October 20, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 131 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying 132 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 135 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing Clerk to refrain from filing any future motions to amend in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/20/10. (bkp)
June 8, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, the 85 Motion to Dismiss filed by defts Lau and Trout is hereby GRANTED and these defts are dismissed from pltf's complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/10. (vjt)
April 29, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to defendants' 85 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/10. (bkp)
April 5, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 78 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defts Gay, Perry, Wendy Kelley, Hallman, Parker, O'Neal, Rawls, and Turner is GRANTED, and these Defts are dismissed without prejudice from Pltf's complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/10. (vjt)
March 8, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 MOTION to Dismiss /Alternatively Motion to Consolidate Cases: This motion is construed as a motion for summary judgment and parties are granted ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to submit any additional evidence/exhibits in support of their positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/8/10. (bkp)
March 4, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Lau and Trout and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on defendants, in care of the ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/10. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on deft O'Neal in care of the ADC Compliance Division; and deft Duensing in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/9/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defendants Molden, Kelley, Parker, Trout, Rawls, Turner, Gay, Perry, Lau, Edwards, and Hallman, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons as directed in this Order, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
November 4, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Albert Hernandez and obligating him to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action through monthly collections from his prison trust account until the fee is paid in full; directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of this Order; directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff a section 1983 complaint form; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office and to the Warden, Diagnostic Unit, 7500 Correction Circle, Pine Bluff, AR 71603-1498. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Molden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?