Soto v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Robert Soto
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Larry D May, Grant Harris, Jimmy Banks, Darryl A Golden, R Evans, Sammy Johnson, D Boultinghouse, Donald Tate, Shirley Jones, Wells, N Dial, John Ponder, Larry Norris, Curtis Meinzer, Compton and Gorden
Case Number: 5:2010cv00212
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Nicholas Dial against Robert Soto re 160 Jury Verdict entered on June 27, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/7/13. (kpr)
June 24, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting pretrial conference by telephone conference on Tuesday, June 25, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The conference call information is set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/24/13. (kpr)
June 18, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of witness Kevin Weber, ADC #128139, who is presently confined at the Varner Unit; and witness John Ponder, ADC #111968, who is presently confined at the East Arkansas Uni t, at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, June 27, 2013, in Courtroom 4-C, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Ar. Upon completion of each witness's testimony, he should be returned to his original place of confinement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/18/13. (kpr)
June 12, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff at 8:30 a.m., Wednesday, June 26, 2013, and each day thereafter until the trial is concluded. The ADC is further directed to send with plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/12/13. (kpr)
February 21, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 122 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety. The Defendant's 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/21/2013. (dmn)
December 5, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 112 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas Dial. Plaintiff shall file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/5/12. (kpr)
April 4, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 105 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Robert Soto. Attorney shall file a response within ten days of the date of this ORder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/4/12. (kpr)
February 17, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate the remaining deft Dial's complete name.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/17/12. (kpr)
November 22, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion for Reconsideration re 88 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. After making a de novo review of the record, the Court affirms its November 7, 2011 decision to adopt the Magistrate Judge's Partial Report and Recommendation, which denied Defendant Dial's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/22/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing William Michael Powell to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/9/11. (kpr)
November 7, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 83 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against defts Hobbs, May, Harris, Banks, Golden, Evans, Johnson, Boultinghouse, Tate, Jones, and Meinzer are dismiss ed without prejudice. Defts' motion for summary judgment is denied in part, with respect to plaintiff's allegations against deft Dial. Counsel will be appointed by separate Order, and at that time, he will have the opportunity to move to amend plaintiff's complaint, if appropriate. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/7/11. (kpr)
August 30, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure pltf's attendance, along with his medical records and institutional file, at the hearing scheduled for 9/16/11 in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/11. (vjt)
November 30, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/10. (bkp)
September 10, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration re 22 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 910/10. (bkp)
August 30, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 3 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Ponder, Wells, Norris, Compton and Gorden. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/30/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER amending and superceding 5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl A Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Boultinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?