Vanzant v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Mark Edward Vanzant
Defendant: L Norris, W Straughn, S Owney, Brooks, Burton, Outlaw and Etta Mike
Case Number: 5:2010cv00363
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 80 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/15/12. (kpr)
February 3, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 68 Partial Report and Recommendations, and denying 65 Motion for Judgment and 67 Motion for Appointed Counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2012. (dmn)
April 19, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct names of defts Larry Norris, William Straughn, Steve Outlaw, Alfred Burton, Verna Brooks, and Sherley Owney, as set forth in their answer 42 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/19/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's motions for reconsideration 37 and to amend complaint 38 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/12/11. (vjt)
April 4, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Etta Mike (originally sued as Mike); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on deft Mike (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/4/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanzant v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edward Vanzant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Owney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etta Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?