Racy et al v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Cindy Renee Guy and Dottie DeShaee Racy
Defendant: Lewis, Adams, Tyler and Bolden
Case Number: 5:2011cv00155
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 64 Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/10/12. (kpr)
July 30, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tyler, Adams directing plaintiff to file a response to the motion within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/12. (kpr)
April 4, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 MOTION to Compel Separate Plaintiff Dottie Racy filed by Tyler, Adams. The plaintiff shall respond within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/4/12. (kpr)
December 21, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Initial Scheduling Order. The Clerk is directed to send this Order to Plaintiff's last-known address, even though the Initial Scheduling Order was returned to sender. Plaintiff shall notify this Court of her current address within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/21/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. The plaintiffs may proceed with the Due Process claim against defts Tyler and Adams and the retaliation claim against Adams. All other defts are dismissed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/11. (kpr)
October 6, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and referring the case back to Magistrate Judge Kearney to screen the amended complaint and make a recommendation on the pending motion to amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/11. (kpr)
August 25, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Reconsideration and vacating the Court's earlier Order and Judgment, document nos. 12 and 13; granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to the proposed findings and recommendations until September 9, 2011; and denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/25/11. (kpr)
August 2, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 12 Order entered in this case, Racy and Guy's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/2/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racy et al v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Renee Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dottie DeShaee Racy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?