Coffey v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Defendant: Valarie Westbrook, David Brewer, Lisa Walker, Curtis-Tyler, Jenkins, Danny Burl, Kay Howell, Mark Cashion, James Banks, Grant Harris and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00274
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 42 Motion for Injunctive Relief. The Court directs the Clerk to docket 48 Objections as both an Objection and a Response to 39 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2014. (jak) (Docket text modified on 3/18/2014 to correct the file date). (jak)
January 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Hobbs without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/14/14. (kpr)
December 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Reconsideration re 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations 8 re 2 Complaint filed by Kenny Coffey. The Court vacates its November 19, 2013 Order 10 based on lack of timely notice to Coffey of the recommended disposition. Coffey has until December 31, 2013, to file any further objection he wishes to the recommendation 8 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/13. (kpr)
November 19, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; Plaintiff's claims against Hobbs are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/19/2013. (rhm)
October 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining acceptance of the 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis-Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?