Martin et al v. Corizon Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Martin
Defendant: Corizon Correctional Medical Services, Gaylon Lay, Crystal Wood, Jones, Brown, Warner, Plucket, Lanvanda White-Matthews, Brenda Swygart, Larry May, Bland, Eddie Selbey and Mike Beebe
Case Number: 5:2013cv00364
Filed: November 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 195 Order that was entered on this date, it is considered and adjudged that this case is dismissed. This dismissal is with prejudice as to plaintiff Lawrence Martin's claims against defendants Estella Bland, L avanda White-Matthews, Jeremy Jones, Gaylon Lay, Larry May, Brenda Swygart, and Crystal Wood, and without prejudice as to Mr. Martin's claims against defendants Eddie Selvey, Mark Warner, Christopher Brown, and Phillip Puckett. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/31/2015. (ks)
February 18, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 113 141 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 102 104 motions for TRO; noting 102 Mr. Martin's change of address; denying 130 motion for summary judgment; denying as moot 146 motion for ruling; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/18/2015. (rhm) (Docket text modified on 2/18/2015 to correct a typographical error.) (thd).
May 5, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 9 19 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and for an injunction/restraining order; dismissing Mr. Martin's claims against Corizon without prejudice; dismissing Mr. Martin's claims against Governor Mike Beebe without prejudice; and dismissing Mr. Martin's claim that defendants violated HIPAA by disclosing his personal medical information with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/05/2014. (rhm)
March 7, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Lay, Wood, Jones, Brown, Warner, Plucket, White-Matthews, Swygart, May, Bland, and Selbey. The USMS shall serve copies of the 2 Complaint and Summons for these Defendants withou t prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service for Defendants Lay, Wood, Jones, Brown, Warner, Plucket, Swygart, May, andSelbey should be through the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, Arkansas 71612. Service for Defendants White-Matthews and Bland should be through counsel for Corizon, Humphries & Lewis, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, Arkansas 72612. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/7/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Corizon Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plucket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanvanda White-Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Swygart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Selbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?