Perry v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Zeckeya Perry
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Marshall Reed, Dexter Payne, R Watson, Gibson, Emsweller, McHan, Cashion, Budnik, Bolden, R Johnson, Claudia Harris, Stephens, Brown, Plumer, Philip Easaw, F Washington, Demery, Cedric Foots, Spencer, Dock King, Pittman, G Thompson, Evans and Felicia Piggee
Case Number: 5:2017cv00269
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 80 Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. All relief sought is denied, and the case is closed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/7/2019. (ljb)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Adopting 71 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendant Foot's 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Foots are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/29/2018. (mcz)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Adopting 63 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Easaw are dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of service. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/30/2018. (mcz)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Adopting 59 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. Defendant R. Johnson is dismissed without prejudice from this cause of action. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/12/2018. (mcz)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Adopting 53 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect the full and correct names of Defendants as follows: Tony McHan, Mark Cashion, Christopher Budnik, Kennie Bolden, Jame s Plummer, Flora Washington, Michael Demery, Tonda Spencer, Faye Pittman, Gloria Thompson, and Gladys Evans. Defendants' 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Budnik, Demery, Evans, Kelley, Payne, Piggee, Reed, Thompson, Washington, Cashion, Bolden, King, Pittman, Plummer, and Spencer are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant McHan for the denial of media and the denial of personal property are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Harris for the denial of media is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/22/2018. (mcz)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 9 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/20/2017. (ljb)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving and adopting 4 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; allowing Plaintiff to proceed on his claims regarding excessive confinement inpunitive isolation, denial of access to newspapers and other media, and denial of access to his personal property, in which he implicates Defendants Wendy Kelley, Marshall Reed, Dexter Payne, R. Watson, Gibson, Emsweller, McHan, Cashion, Budnik, Bolden, R. Johnson, Cla udia Harris, Stephens, Brown, Plumer, Easaw, F. Washington, Demery, Foots, Spencer, Dock King, Pittman, G. Thompson, Evans, and Felicia Piggee; dismissing without prejudice all other claims from this action; dismissing without prejudice Defendants Ro ry Griffin, Jason Kelley, Correct Care Solutions, Stringfellow, and Day; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/13/2017. (cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeckeya Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Reed
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Watson
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emsweller
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHan
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashion
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budnik
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolden
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Harris
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumer
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Easaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Washington
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demery
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Foots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dock King
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Thompson
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Piggee
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?