Briley v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Briley
Defendant: Edward Adams, Tracey Taylor, McClinton, Gerald Roberson, Turntine, Shaw, Johnson, Rose, Tyra Tyler, Cherry, T Johnson, Greg Bolin, Judy Browley, Cynthia Hunter and Alexander
Case Number: 5:2018cv00208
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing Counsel for those defendants, Caroline V. Hays and C. Burt Newell, to file under seal the last known address of Rose, Shaw, Greg Bolin, and T. Johnson no later than 30 days after this order's entry date, or inform the Court that these defendants were never employed by the Jefferson County Sheriff's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/21/2018. (cmn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 09/12/2018 as to T Johnson. (fjg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 09/12/2018 as to Greg Bolin. (fjg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 09/12/2018 as to Shaw. (fjg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 09/12/2018 as to Rose. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Edward Adams served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tyra Tyler served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cynthia Hunter served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Judy Browley served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cherry served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tracey Taylor served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Alexander served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. McClinton served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Turntine served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Johnson served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gerald Roberson served on 9/4/2018. (fjg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Burt Newell on behalf of Edward Adams, Alexander, Judy Browley, Cherry, Cynthia Hunter, Tracey Taylor, Tyra Tyler (Newell, C.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Edward Adams, Alexander, Judy Browley, Cherry, Cynthia Hunter, Tracey Taylor, Tyra Tyler.(Hays, Caroline)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline V. Hays on behalf of Edward Adams, Alexander, Judy Browley, Cherry, Cynthia Hunter, Tracey Taylor, Tyra Tyler (Hays, Caroline)
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #2 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Delta Regional Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the #1 complaint, this order, and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/23/2018. (ljb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Briley. (kdr)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Eddie Briley. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adams
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Taylor
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turntine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tyler
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Browley
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hunter
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?