Fayetteville Public Library et al v. Crawford County, Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Fayetteville Public Library, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Central Arkansas Library System, Nate Coulter, Olivia Farrell, Jennie Kirby, Leta Caplinger, Adam Webb, Arkansas Library Association, Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Pearl's Books, LLC, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC doing business as WordsWorth Books, American Booksellers Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund and Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith, Todd Murray, Sonia Fonticiella, Devon Holder, Matt Durett, Jeff Phillips, Will Jones, Teresa Howell, Ben Hale, Connie Mitchell, Dan Turner, Jana Bradford, Frank Spain, Tim Blair, Kyle Hunter, Daniel Shue, Jeff Rogers, David Ethredge, Tom Tatum, II, Drew Smith, Rebecca Reed McCoy, Michelle C. Lawrence, Debra Buschman, Tony Rogers, Nathan Smith, Carol Crews, Kevin Holmes, Chris Walton and Chuck Graham
Case Number: 5:2023cv05086
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Sections 1 and 5 of Arkansas Act 372 of 2023 are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 29, 2023. (Brooks, Timothy)
July 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #35 The Crawford County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Crawford County Defendants' Answer must be filed no later than August 14, 2023.Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 29, 2023. (Brooks, Timothy) Modified on 7/31/2023 to edit text (jlm).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2023. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER regarding media request (see order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 25, 2023. (slc)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Rankin, James)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #44 Motion in Limine. For purposes of the preliminary injunction hearing, the evidence cited in the Motion is potentially relevant to the claims, issues, and defenses presently before the Court. This ruling is without prejudice to the County Defendants' ability to argue at the hearing why they believe this evidence should not be relied upon in arriving at the Court's ultimate ruling on the matter of preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 24, 2023. (ee)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #46 Separate Defendants Crawford County and Chris Keith's Motion for Leave to file a Reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 24, 2023. (jld)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Rankin, James)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #44 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Limit Testimony by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Rankin, James)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Limit Testimony by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pltf Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Sep Dfdt Crawford Co Witness List)(Rankin, James)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Adams, John)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Books, #2 Exhibit B - Crawford County Quorum Court - Journal of Procedures 12-19-22, #3 Exhibit C - Crawford County Quorum Court - Journal of Procedures 1-17-23)(Adams, John)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 7, 2023. (tg)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 7, 2023. (ee)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Adams, John)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rankin, James)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Reed McCoy, Tim Blair, Jana Bradford, Debra Buschman, Carol Crews, Matt Durett, David Ethredge, Sonia Fonticiella, Chuck Graham, Ben Hale, Devon Holder, Kevin Holmes, Teresa Howell, Kyle Hunter, Will Jones, Michelle C. Lawrence, Connie Mitchell, Todd Murray, Jeff Phillips, Jeff Rogers, Tony Rogers, Daniel Shue, Drew Smith, Nathan Smith, Frank Spain, Tom Tatum, II, Dan Turner, Chris Walton. (Watson, Noah)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Rankin, James)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Rankin, James)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 **CORRECTED DATE** TEXT ONLY ORDER setting a response deadline of JULY 3, 2023, for the pending MOTION to Transfer Case #29 filed by Separate Defendants Crawford County, Arkansas, and County Judge Chris Keith. Plaintiffs filed their collective response to the Motion today. If any other Defendant wishes to file a response, it must be received by the Court by the deadline. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 29, 2023. (ee) Modified on 6/29/2023 (slc).
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #29 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Adams, John)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Hughes Parker on behalf of American Booksellers Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Pearl's Books, LLC, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Parker, Rebecca)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Rodriguez on behalf of American Booksellers Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Pearl's Books, LLC, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Rodriguez, Kristen)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bamberger on behalf of American Booksellers Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Pearl's Books, LLC, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Bamberger, Michael)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE and NOTICE by Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith Notice of Related Case (Rankin, James) Modified on 6/28/2023 (slc).
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING on #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order :( Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2023 10:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks.) (See ORDER for specific deadlines). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 27, 2023. (lgd)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Gentry Carlin Wahlmeier on behalf of Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Wahlmeier, Gentry)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel McLelland on behalf of Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (McLelland, Samuel)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Rankin, III on behalf of Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Rankin, James)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Forrest Stobaugh on behalf of Crawford County, Arkansas, Chris Keith. (Stobaugh, Forrest)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Adams, John)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, American Booksellers Association, Arkansas Library Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Author's Guild, Inc., Leta Caplinger, Central Arkansas Library System, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Nate Coulter, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Olivia Farrell, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Jennie Kirby, Pearl's Books, LLC, Adam Webb, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Adams, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Deborah Caldwell-Stone, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Leta Caplinger, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Carol Coffey, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Nate Coulter, #6 Exhibit Declaration Christina Danos, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Olivia Farrell, #8 Exhibit Declaration of David Grogan, #9 Exhibit Declaration of David Johnson, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Jordan, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Hayden Kirby, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Mary E. Rasenberger, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew D. Stratton, #14 Exhibit Declaration of Jeff Trexler, #15 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Webb, #16 Exhibit Declaration of Kandi West)(Adams, John)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ORLANDO ECONOMOS appearing for Plaintiffs Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries and Arkansas Library Association. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 22, 2023. (slc)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. AMAN GEORGE appearing for Plaintiffs Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries and Arkansas Library Association. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 22, 2023. (slc)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Orlando Economos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2794117) by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Arkansas Library Association. (Economos, Orlando)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Aman George to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2793864) by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Arkansas Library Association. (George, Aman)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Otho Payne on behalf of Rebecca Reed McCoy, Tim Blair, Jana Bradford, Debra Buschman, Carol Crews, Matt Durett, David Ethredge, Sonia Fonticiella, Chuck Graham, Ben Hale, Devon Holder, Kevin Holmes, Teresa Howell, Kyle Hunter, Will Jones, Michelle C. Lawrence, Connie Mitchell, Todd Murray, Jeff Phillips, Jeff Rogers, Tony Rogers, Daniel Shue, Drew Smith, Nathan Smith, Frank Spain, Tom Tatum, II, Dan Turner, Chris Walton. (Payne, John)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Watson on behalf of Rebecca Reed McCoy, Tim Blair, Jana Bradford, Debra Buschman, Carol Crews, Matt Durett, David Ethredge, Sonia Fonticiella, Chuck Graham, Ben Hale, Devon Holder, Kevin Holmes, Teresa Howell, Kyle Hunter, Will Jones, Michelle C. Lawrence, Connie Mitchell, Todd Murray, Jeff Phillips, Jeff Rogers, Tony Rogers, Daniel Shue, Drew Smith, Nathan Smith, Frank Spain, Tom Tatum, II, Dan Turner, Chris Walton. (Watson, Noah)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leta Caplinger, Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Fayetteville Public Library, Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Author's Guild, Inc., American Booksellers Association, Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Pearl's Books, LLC, Jennie Kirby, Central Arkansas Library System, Arkansas Library Association, Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC, Association of American Publishers, Inc, Adam Webb, Nate Coulter, Olivia Farrell. All Defendants. (Adams, John)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Cryer on behalf of Rebecca Reed McCoy, Tim Blair, Jana Bradford, Debra Buschman, Carol Crews, Matt Durett, David Ethredge, Sonia Fonticiella, Chuck Graham, Ben Hale, Devon Holder, Kevin Holmes, Teresa Howell, Kyle Hunter, Will Jones, Michelle C. Lawrence, Connie Mitchell, Todd Murray, Jeff Phillips, Jeff Rogers, Tony Rogers, Daniel Shue, Drew Smith, Nathan Smith, Frank Spain, Tom Tatum, II, Dan Turner, Chris Walton. (Cryer, Christine)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. REBECCA HUGHES PARKER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2023. (slc)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. KRISTEN C. RODRIGUEZ is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2023. (slc)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MICHAEL A. BAMBERGER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2023. (slc)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. WILL BARDWELL appearing for certain Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2023. (slc)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. BEN SEEL appearing for certain Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2023. (slc)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2785311) by Leta Caplinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing)(Brownstein, Bettina)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Kristen C. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2785293) by Leta Caplinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing)(Brownstein, Bettina)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Michael A. Bamberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2785274) by Leta Caplinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing)(Brownstein, Bettina)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Will Bardwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2784956) by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Arkansas Library Association, Adam Webb. (Bardwell, Will)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Ben Seel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2784926) by Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries, Arkansas Library Association, Adam Webb. (Seel, Benjamin)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2784265), filed by Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library, Central Arkansas Library System, Nate Coulter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Act 372, #2 Exhibit 2 - Response to Demand, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Library)(Adams, John)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by All Plaintiffs. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fayetteville Public Library et al v. Crawford County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayetteville Public Library
Represented By: Brandon B. Cate
Represented By: Glenn Larkin
Represented By: Vincent Chadick
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eureka Springs Carnegie Public Library
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Arkansas Library System
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Coulter
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Farrell
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Kirby
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leta Caplinger
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Webb
Represented By: Will Bardwell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Seel
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Library Association
Represented By: Aman Tewari George
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Will Bardwell
Represented By: Benjamin M. Seel
Represented By: Orlando Economos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advocates for All Arkansas Libraries
Represented By: Will Bardwell
Represented By: Aman Tewari George
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Benjamin M. Seel
Represented By: Orlando Economos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl's Books, LLC
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wordsworth Community Bookstore, LLC doing business as WordsWorth Books
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Booksellers Association
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Author's Guild, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Represented By: John T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comic Book Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Hughes Parker
Represented By: Michael Bamberger
Represented By: John T. Adams
Represented By: Kristen Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford County, Arkansas
Represented By: James D Rankin, III
Represented By: Forrest Stobaugh
Represented By: Samuel McLelland
Represented By: Gentry Carlin Wahlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Keith
Represented By: Forrest Stobaugh
Represented By: James D Rankin, III
Represented By: Samuel McLelland
Represented By: Gentry Carlin Wahlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Murray
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Fonticiella
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Holder
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Durett
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Phillips
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Jones
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Howell
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Hale
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Mitchell
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Turner
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Bradford
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Spain
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Blair
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Hunter
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Shue
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rogers
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ethredge
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tatum, II
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Smith
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Reed McCoy
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle C. Lawrence
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Buschman
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rogers
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Smith
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Crews
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Holmes
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Walton
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Graham
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Represented By: John O. Payne
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?