Deborah Abeel et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Olga L. Collazo, Edna Wenning, Kevin Keehl, Roman Olivos, Kim Bridges, KC Crandall, Margo Cruz, Sean Combs, Donald Rey, Irene Cardenas, Dan Klein, Diane Grubic, Brent Komourous, David Appel, Brian Gurnee, Vickie Brock, Melissa Owen, Victoria Wallace, Basheer Murad, Charley Smith, Don Peden, Javier Jimenez, John Macias, Reginald Santiago, Virginia Hosking, Ruby Tam, Carmen Linares, Armando Hinojosa, Nelson J. Gonzalez, Nida Smith, Jon Carlson, Alan Parsons, Editha Restauro, Robert Rockwood, Raymond Tran, Teri Skrdla, Martin Silva, Jose Oseguera, Lidia Garcia, Kirk Carmichael, Willie Smith, Eduardo Marquez, Elizabeth Matsik, Marie Joseph, Dinorah Llanes, Juan Carrillo, James Fraser, Roger Sanchez, Don Decker, Erica Morgera, Thomas Lockhart, Eddie Rivera, Raquel Chavez, Corrine Fraysinette, Patrick Paygar Boyd, Mazlina Lai, Alexander Arroraci, Marcella Hernandez, John Phillingane, Diane Brown, Lawrence Bracco, Norma Fogelstrom, Carl Sanko, Erenstine Brinkley, James Yocum, Francis Talbot, Rita Ucheka, Irving Phan, Luis Zavala, John Oxidine, Rose Chang, Mark Blanco, Pete Kreuzer, James Snyder, -, Farahnaz Mirshafiee, Lisa Rodriguez, Shyam Sunder, Jaspal Kochar, Talia Olivera, Daniel Freeman, Maria Navarro, Francis Celo, Jon Withrow, Deborah Abeel, Senen Ochoa, Hector Sanchez, Arthur Rodriguez, Wilfredo Feliciano, Stella Markley, Lance Kennison, James Eblen, Steven Ehlers, William Rabello, Ernesto Nepomuceno, Thereisi Villaruze, John Charlson, Jonny Marie Torres, Dennis Bulmer, Todd Widener, Alma Townsend, Katherine Charlson, Mark Chasteen, Nancy Holcombe, Kaivalya Rawal, Artemio Concepcion, Dexter Brown, Mitch Van Mechelen, Alex Bacaron, Marciano Rodriguez, Romina Paredes, Joe Garcia, Noorollah Rahdar, Linda Lizardo, Joanne Snyder-Davidson, George Seeley, Grant Clark, Lucy Carlson, Marian Canady Meixner, Casey Kauer, Linda H. Vo, Guadalupe Sanchez, James Wray, Scott Armstrong, Richard Sorensen, Joseph K. Lyons, Margarita Shea, Jeff Turner, Calvin Matthews, Thomas Herbst, David Herron, Maria Guzman, Felicia Flores, Mirtha Bernes, Rebecca Abad, Toby Butterworth, Derrick Sanders, Robbin Stites, Bruce Lawson, Susan Franco, Edwin Aldana, Bruce Milligan, Jose Chavez, Michael Wiederhold, Art Iturbe, Barry Bozarth, Barbara Kikugawa, Maria De La Paz Jimenez, Jennifer Kauer, James Shipman, Milton Smith, II, Altina Patrick, Christina Ornelas, Rosalinda Lockhart, Virginia Peterson, Clarence Irving, Greg Townsend, Brian Carlson, Raul Pernett, Ronnie Green, Muhammad Islam, Caamie Murad, Ricardo Perez, Jennifer Langlo, Joseph Ignacio, Eric Anderson, Robert Berry, Benjamin Corona, John Kealy, Renee Baylis, Enriqueta Espinosa, Catherine Nutt, Harjinder Waraich, Ralph Newson, Nadia Villarreal, Kevin Thompson, Sheryl Seim-Montoya, David Starkey, Enrique Romero, Arturo Concha, Carlos Gonzales, Diane Kepley, Leroy Anderson, Steven Campanelli, Greta Gregorio, Socorro Pereda, Maria Elena Fuentes, Christopher Villaruz, William Tucker, Bayaani Simpliciano, Maria Tavares, Brenda Copper, Wayne Furr, George Coburn, Charlotte McArdle, Mark C. Lilly, Leonides Morales, Clint West, Dan Schwartz, Mario Herrera, Mara Lavender, Patrick Vuong, Dale Schmidt, Sherrie Safko, Crayton Smith, Cary Cruz, Ana Gonzalez, Deborah Brigman, Kelvin Hurdle, Ashmelley Thervil, Aaron Mir, Sabrina Anderson, Honorio Dizon, Ruth Vargas, Hiroshi Nakayama, Donald Vitak, II, Maria Gonzales, Hugh Collins, Robert Akashi, Kenneth Simonsen, Alan Fogelstrom, Paul Strohecker, Arvin Serrano, Anna Maria Prezio, Michelle Favazzo, Frank Pacheco, Jose Cuesta, Jimmy Alauria, Simona Garcia, Jorge L. Hernandez, Albertina Figueroa, Virginia Rotramel, Joanna Singh, Jose Alfredo Segovia, Lisa Higgens, Patrick Martinez, Modjulita Hernandez, Darlene N. Holloway, Jack Lefler, Cindy Patelski, Cheryl Shaw, Valery Bubela, John Tedesco, Jessica Cabasal, Bruce Barmakian, Sandra Duarte, Joseph Cina, Walter Grubic, Maga Guzman, Benjamin Gamez, Wayne Fontz, Darlene Beeks, Nancy P. Rodriguez, George Bennett, Maria Cruz, Sandra Ness, Leonarda Macasa, Andrew Stolz, Jamie Wetzel, Miguel Hernandez, George Stroup and Ruben Parra
Defendant: Ally Bank, N.A., CWALT, Inc., Norwest Venture Partners VII-A FVCI Mauritius, Norwest Venture Partners VII-A FII Mauritius, Bank Handlowy W Warszawie S.A., Citibank - Distribuidora De Titulos E Valores Mobiliarios S.A., Jeffrey Huvelle, GMAC Cypress Holdings Limited, JPMorgan Greater China Property Fund Cayman SLP LP, Countrywide International Technology Holdings Limited, Indopark Holdings, Ltd., J.P. Morgan S.A., Aurora Bank, F.S.B., Countrywide Capital III, Citigroup Global Markets, Bank of America (Asia), Banco Citibank S.A., Kenneth Lewis, U.S. Bancorp, First Century Bankshares, Inc., China Construction Bank (Asia) Corporation Limited, Ally Bank, Citifinancial Promotora De Negocios & Cobranca Ltda, ABA Seguros, S.A. DE C.V., Jeremy Ben-Ami, Joseph Crudo, Jr., Chelsea Participacoes Societarias E Investmentos Ltda, Citigroup Netherlands Holdings B.V., Golden Funding Company, Danielle Lee, EMC Mortgage Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Citicorp Capital Philippines, Inc., U.S. Bank N.A., Zeus Recovery Fund, S.A., JPMorgan Distressed Debt Master Fund Ltd., HSBC Holdings, Inc., Latin American Investment Bank Bahamas Limited, J.P. Morgan Bank Luxembourg S.A., Alan Rothenberg, Citigroup Global Markets Luxembourg, Does 1-1000, GMAC International Holdings B.V., Countrywide Commercial Mortgage Capital, USB Netherlands B.V., U.S. Bank Trust National Association, GMAC Bank GMBH, Countrywide Capital VI, China Construction Bank (Macau), MBNA America Bank, N.A., Countrywide Hillcrest I, Cohm Overseas Mexico Holding, S. De R.L. De C.V., Countrywide Mortgage Ventures, LLC, Elavon Do Brasil Solucoes De Pagamento S.A., Elavon European Holdings B.V., Howard Miller, USB Trade Services Limited, J.P. Morgan Grupo Financiero, Danube Holdings I C.V., Elavon Puerto Rico, Inc., Bank of America Canada, Danube Holdings III C.V., Bank of America Corporation, Elavon European Holdings C.V., Zao Citibank, GMAC Holdings U.K. Limited, J.P. Morgan Mansart Investments, U.S. Trust Corporation, Bancamerica Robertson Stephens, USB Realty Corp., Holdings PTE. Ltd., Norwest Venture Partners VII-A Mauritius, Citigroup Global Markets India Private Limited, Countrywide Commercial JPI LLC, Norwest Venture Partners VI-A, LP, Coutrywide Captial V, Sapotoro Cooperatief U.A., CWABS II, Inc., National Association FIA Card Services, J.P. Morgan Research Total Return Master Fund Ltd., Anthony West, Cyrus Access, Ltd., JPMorgan Asset Management Holdings (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., One Equity Partners LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Citigroup Global Markets Deutschland AG, ING Group, Norwest Venture Partners Singapore Private Limited and J.P. Morgan Dublin Financial Holdings Limited
Case Number: 2:2012cv10586
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margaret A Nagle
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge John F. Walter, ORDERING Miscellaneous Loose Documents submitted by Plaintiff Deborah Abeel received on 7/8/13 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: This case terminated on 12/27/12. Mr. Bernadel is not a party to any action in this Court. (mz)
January 8, 2013 Filing 75 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel James Horwitz re Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #62 . (kbr)
January 8, 2013 Filing 74 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel James Horwitz re Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #64 . (kbr)
January 8, 2013 Filing 73 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel James Horwitz re Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #60 . (kbr)
January 8, 2013 Filing 72 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel James Horwitz re Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #61 . (kbr)
January 8, 2013 Filing 71 Mail Returned addressed to Daniel James Horwitz re Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV) #63 . (kbr)
December 27, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Deborah Abeel. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Fiedler, James)
December 21, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE by Judge John F. Walter re: Stipulation to Substitute Attorney #68 : The Court has not received a proposed order via email to the Chambers email. The request will remain pending receipt of the proposed order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 19, 2012 Filing 68 STIPULATION to Substitute attorney Justin D. Balser in place of attorney William G. Sandelands filed by defendant Aurora Bank, F.S.B..(Balser, Justin)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge John F. Walter. (cb)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO DELIVER COURTESY COPIES TO CHAMBERS; ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT REPORT REGARDING STATUS OF ACTION by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel for the Plaintiffs is ordered to deliver a courtesy copy to Chambers of each document on the docket for this action through the date of this Order. On the first page of each courtesy copy, in the space between lines 1 - 7 to the right of thecenter, counsel shall include the date the document was filed and the document number. Thecourtesy copies shall be placed in a slant D-ring binder in chronological order with each documentseparated by a tab divider on the right side. All documents contained in the binder must be threehole punched with the oversized 13/32" hole size, not the standard 9/32" hole size. The binder shall include a Table of Contents and the spine of each binder shall be labeled with its contents. Counsel shall also file a Joint Report summarizing the status of the action which shall include a description of all motions filed in the action and the Court's ruling on the motions. The courtesy copies shall be delivered to Chambers, and the Joint Report shall be filed, on or before January 18, 2013. (jp)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge Gary A. Feess. Case transferred from Judge Gary A. Feess to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 12-10586 JFW(MANx). (rn)
December 13, 2012 Filing 51 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern
December 11, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Christine B Cesare for Defendant Bank of America Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Scott Harris Kaiser for Defendant Bank of America Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Matthew Richard Kalinowski for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Mitra Singh for Defendant Ocwen Financial Corporation. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Lisa Fried for Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney David Dunn for Defendants Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Daniel James Horwitz for Defendants EMC Mortgage Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney William Graig Sandelands for Defendant Aurora Bank, F.S.B.Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Nicholas M Moccia for Plaintiff Deborah Abeel. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney David C Singer for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Richard Gerard Haddad for Defendants Onewest Bank, F.S.B., PNC Bank, N.A., Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap) Modified on 12/13/2012 (ghap).
December 11, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap)
December 11, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:12-CV-04269-JBW-RML from USDC, Eastern District of New York at Brooklyn. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the Civil Case Number: CV 12-10586 GAF (MANx) (Attachments: #1 CV-18)(ghap)
December 11, 2012 *** Party Thomas Adler, Bibian Afable, Robert Akashi, Michael Akin, Jimmy Alauria, Suren Alaverdyan, Edwin Aldana, Dora Aldrete, Debbie Edith Alegria, Audrene Ann Alencastre-Roberts, Izaida Altamirano, Roberta Alvarez, Patricia Alvert, Karl Amrine, Elmer Anderson, Eric Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Pamela Anderson, Sabrina Anderson, Donald Andrews, Fatima Aponte, David Appel, Olga Araniva, Antonio Arcinas, Manuel Arechiga, Jr, Scott Armstrong, Robert Arrington, Alexander Arroraci, Laura Aupperle, Ewy Axelsson, Jose P. Ayala, Alex Bacaron, John Bahura, Gloria Bailey, Lephas Bailey, Irma Baker-Parra, William Barber, Bruce Barmakian, Rodrick Barnett, Philip Barr, Mauricio Barragan, Francisco Barrios, Kevin Batman, Lori Batman, Gurdayal Batna, Kamlesh Batna, Renee Baylis, David Beaubien, Marilyn Beaubien, Darlene Beeks, James Beeks, Tom Beinar, Andrew Belcher, Andres Benavidez, Andres Cardenas Benavidez, Amanda Bennett, George Bennett, Mirtha Bernes, Annette Berry, Robert Berry, Nassar Bey, Judith Anne Blair, Alvin Blake, Tawana Blake, Mark Blanco, John Bobek, Carole Booth, John Booth, Edward Bostock, Araceli Bowman, Billy Bowman, Patrick Paygar Boyd, Barry Bozarth, Elinor Bozzone, Lawrence Bracco, Nathan Brehm, Kim Bridges, Mike Briggs, Arnold Brigman, Deborah Brigman, Erenstine Brinkley, Suzan Brittan-Bergman, Vickie Brock, Dexter Brown, Diane Brown, Valery Bubela, Andrew P. Buckley, Bonnie Buckley, Dennis Bulmer, Linda Burger, Bonnie Butterworth, Toby Butterworth, CWABS II, Inc., Jessica Cabasal, Carla Caler, Norman Caler, Paul Campagna, Steven Campanelli, Harry Campbell, Jose Campos, Nelida Campos, Jerry Canaday, Maria Antonia Canales, Gerard Cannella, Melanie Cannella, Larry Capots, Irene Cardenas, Maria Carino, Brian Carlson, Jon Carlson, Kimberly Carlson, Lucy Carlson, Dinorah Carmenate, Dawn Carmichael, Kirk Carmichael, Juan Carrillo, Jacqueline Carroll, Jaqueline Carroll, Richard Carroll, Josephina Casellon, Shawn Cassidy, George Castro, Jose Z. Castro, Paul Cater, Francis Celo, Eloy Certeza, Carlos Cervantes, Rose Chang, John Charlson, Katherine Charlson, Geoffrey Charlton, Mark Chasteen, Vipin Chaturvedi, Antonio Chavez, Daniel Chavez, Jose Chavez, Raquel Chavez, Joseph Chavoen, Kevin Cheek, William Chin, Mehrdad Chitsaz, Hector Cibrian, Joseph Cina, Renata Circeo, Elizabeth Clampet, Grant Clark, Sonia Clark, Stephen Clarke, Mary Clowney, William Clowney, Doris Coburn, George Coburn, Christopher Cockrell, Danielle Cockrell, Geoffrey Cockrell, Luise Cohen, Olga L. Collazo, Rolando Collazo, Hugh Collins, Sean Combs, Artemio Concepcion, Arturo Concha, Karen Contier, Larry Contier, Kat Conway, Cherie Cook, Denise Cook, Randall Cook, Brenda Copper, Dean Copper, Benjamin Corona, Ruth Corona, Dionico Cortez, Luis Cosio, KC Crandall, Patricia Crespo, Bertha Crevolin, Ronnie Crevolin, Matthew Crosbie, Cary Cruz, Margo Cruz, Maria Cruz, Octavio Cruz, Rosemary Cruz, William Cubias, Jose Cuesta, Houston Curtis, Eric Cutler, Donna Dalton, Lorraine Danella, Troy Danella, Charles Daniels, Christina Daniels, Christine Dao, Ricardo Davalos, Curtis Davidson, Troy Davis, Sargis Davoddaniel, Lourdes Ruiz De La Torre, Don Decker, Tammy Decker, Celon D. Dennis, Keith Denson, Douglas Dent, Christian Diaz, Martha Diaz, Paz Diaz, Nicholas Dietel, Donna Dills, Jeffrey Dixon, Avelina Dizon, Honorio Dizon, Ira Dorfman, Patricia Dowling, Sandra Duarte, Ana Duenas, Olic Dunning, III, Daniel Dwyer, David Ebadat, James Eblen, Hotosa Ebrahimzadeh, Kenneth Edgecombe, Nicole Edgecombe, Steven Ehlers, Mehrdad Emsha, Glen Eng, Martin Escobedo, Yolanda Escobedo, Enriqueta Espinosa, Felipa Espinosa, Francisco Espinosa, Jose Espinosa, Patricia Espinosa, David Estrada, Ty Etterlein, Fatemeh Fadakar, Nasir Faizi, Alicia Fajardo, David Faulhaber, Michelle Favazzo, Clovis Fearon, Wilfredo Feliciano, Roger Fenstermacher, Sally Figueiredo, Albertina Figueroa, Roberto Figueroa, Fumiko Fisher, Joseph Fitzgerald, Carol Flemming, Corey Flinn, Felicia Flores, Leonardo Flores, Carlos Flores-Carrillo, Alan Fogelstrom, Norma Fogelstrom, Richard Fomin, Lourdes Fontz, Wayne Fontz, Donna Foote, Cheryl Ford, Diane Forsman, Roger Fosdick, Julie Fraley, Susan Franco, James Fraser, Jo Ellen Fraser, Corrine Fraysinette, Daniel Freeman, D'Ann Friend, Matthew Friend, Dennis Frost, Christopher Fructus, Antonio Fuentes, Maria Elena Fuentes, Vicki Furr, Wayne Furr, Phillip Galera, Susan Gallagher, Joyce Galvez, Joyce Galvez, Benjamin Gamez, Joe Garcia, Jonique Garcia, Josefina Perez Garcia, Lidia Garcia, Oscar Garcia, Simona Garcia, Spencer Garner, Traci Gehm, Phillip Genovese, Barbara Gibbs, James Gilbert, Bradley Gipolan, Dennis Gleason, Tommy Glover, Anthony Golden, Joseph Gomez, Carlos Gonzales, Maria Gonzales, Ana Gonzalez, Edgart Gonzalez, Ester Gonzalez, Nelson A. Gonzalez, Nelson J. Gonzalez, Oscar Gonzalez, Robert Graham, Ronnie Green, Susanna Green, Robert Gregg, Greta Gregorio, Christopher Grossman, Diane Grubic, Walter Grubic, Nestor Guillen, Magdalena Guizar, Steven Gumienny, Brian Gurnee, William Gutierrez, Enrique Guzman, Maga Guzman, Maria Guzman, Ahmad Hakimjavadi, Richard Hale, Jack Halley, Tracey Hampton, Allison Hanson, John Hanson, Cherise Hansson, Steven Hardie, Cindy Harrison, Joan Henderson-Brown, Silvia Hendon, Leslie Hendricks, Russel Hendricks, Thomas Herbst, Cenobio Hernandez, Jorge L. Hernandez, Leonard Hernandez, Marcella Hernandez, Miguel Hernandez, Modjulita Hernandez, Alfredo Herrera, Lorena Herrera, Mario Herrera, David Herron, Brett Heskett, Rizza Heskett, Sessing Hewitt, Lisa Higgens, Raymond Hill, Armando Hinojosa, Heath Hodel, Nancy Holcombe, Darlene N. Holloway, Ralph Holloway, Virginia Hosking, Vince Hubbard, Salvador Huizar, Patrick Hunt, Harley Hunter, Jean Hunter, Kelvin Hurdle, Michelle Hurtado, Gerda Hyppolite, Joseph Ignacio, Rebecca Ignacio, Cynthia Ireland, Clarence Irving, Evelyn Irving, Muhammad Islam, Art Iturbe, Athena Jackson, Glen Jackson, Hillary Jackson, Paul Jackson, Roger James, Armando Jimenez, Javier Jimenez, Maria De La Paz Jimenez, Sandy Jimenez, Harlene Johnson, Jesse Johnson, Nicholas Jones, Jean Joseph, Marie Joseph, Portia Joseph, Dejan Jurokov, Jerome Kamins, Gus Katsikides, Casey Kauer, Jennifer Kauer, John Kealy, Kevin Keehl, Carleen Keller, Dennis Kemp, Glory Kennison, Lance Kennison, Diane Kepley, Richard Kepley, Julie Kestenbaum, Paul Kestenbaum, Barbara Kikugawa, Chris Kim, Jay Kim, Lynn Kimberly, Dan Klein, Louis Klein, Harkrishnan Kochar, Jaspal Kochar, Brent Komourous, Steve Kong, Dean Kraemer, Gladys Krantz, Nancy Krantz, Richard Krantz, Joshua Kreitzer, Kathryn T. Kreitzer, Pete Kreuzer, Belinda Krumsiek, John Krumsiek, Mazlina Lai, Deborah Lamb, Manuel Landavazo, Stephanie Landen, Sherrie Landovaso, Jennifer Langlo, Ashley Larsen, Christian Larsen, Jeff Lavender, Mara Lavender, Morgan Lawley, Bruce Lawson, Thein Lam Le, Travis Leage, Lisa Lefebvre, Raymond Lefebvre, Jack Lefler, Joella Lefler, Jose Duarte Lemus, Ken Leon, Bobbie Leonard, Jacquelynn Leonardo, Robert Lewin, Mark C. Lilly, Carmen Linares, Luis Linares, Miroslava Litterdragt, Douglas Lizardi, Ed Lizardo, Linda Lizardo, Dinorah Llanes, Cheryl Locey, Lauren Locey, James Locker, Rosalinda Lockhart, Thomas Lockhart, Alan Locklear, Consuelo Lombera, Maria Dolores Lombera, Angel Lopez, Moises Lopez, Delores Lucas, Hilario Lucero, Burt Lund, Mae Lund, Danilo Luquias, Yolina Luquias, Alejandro Luzardo, Ronnie Lyles, Brian Lynch, Joseph K. Lyons, Adelfo Macasa, Leonarda Macasa, Bruce Macbride, Anita Machado, Tanya Machado, John Macias, Louis Mages, Patricia Mages, Stefan Mahaley, Heather Mahoney, Denise Manriquez, Nancy Mae Maresh, Laurie Marino, Stella Markley, Eduardo Marquez, Teresa Marquez, Elnora Marshall, Janet Marshall, Avelino Martinez, Bruno Martinez, Frank Martinez, Luis Martinez, Melando Martinez, Mike Martinez, Patrick Martinez, Julio Martins, Elizabeth Matsik, Calvin Matthews, Charlotte McArdle, Elizabeth McCullough, Sean McDonald, Saovanni Meas, Mitch Van Mechelen, Mary Medina, Roberto Medina, David Medlin, Marian Canady Meixner, Daniel Melendez, Gloria Melo, Aida Meza, Jose Meza, Margarita Milam, Lizette Milan-Fiedler, Marie Miller, Bruce Milligan, Rene Minnaar, Aaron Mir, Arlyn Mir, Rabia Mir, Maria Miranda, Bahman Mirshafiee, Farahnaz Mirshafiee, Kimberly Mitchell, William Mitchell, Jason Moeding, Virgen Mondragon, Veronica Monterrubio, Toby Moore, Leonides Morales, Erica Morgera, Pete Morgera, Maria Moules, Erik Mumford, Antonio Munoz, Carmen Munoz, Basheer Murad, Caamie Murad, Cindy Murrillo, Juan Carlos Murrillo, Valliur Nadu, Hiroshi Nakayama, Jose Nario, Yolanda Natividad, Cristina Navarro, Joe Navarro, Maria Navarro, Oscar Navarro, Micah Neely, Richard Neely, Ernesto Nepomuceno, Alan Ness, Sandra Ness, Diana Newson, Ralph Newson, Steven Newton, Anna Nguyen, Karen Nierhake, Michelle Nunies, Catherine Nutt, Williams Oaks, John Ocampo, Cindy Ochoa, Senen Ochoa, Noel Olivares, Talia Olivera, Roman Olivos, Christina Ornelas, Deana Oseguera, Jose Oseguera, Karol Ousley, Melissa Owen, Michael Owen, John Oxidine, Frank Pacheco, Armando Padilla, Juan Padilla, Mecia Padilla, Manuel Castro Palma, Jose Pantoja, Maria Pantoja, Angela Parada, Romina Paredes, Ken Parker, Ruben Parra, Alan Parsons, Janice Pasion, Steve Pasion, Cindy Patelski, Kazimir Patelski, Eugene Paterra, Altina Patrick, Connie Patterson, Don Peden, Maria Pelcastre, Mario A. Peralta, Socorro Pereda, Ricardo Perez, Roland Perkins, Raul Pernett, James Peterson, Virginia Peterson, Irving Phan, John Phillingane, Michael Phillips, Clarisse Piche, Leslie Pollack, Thomas Poupard, Carter Powell, Carol Powers, Douglas Powers, Anna Maria Prezio, Rebecca Quick, Steven Quick, Hewlett Dan Quillen, Mery Quintana, William Rabello, Merle Ragan, Noorollah Rahdar, Angelica Ramirez, Daniel Ramirez, Francisco Ramirez, Luz Ramirez, Dominador Ramos, Eliseo Ramos, Petronilla Ramos, Israel Rapuri, Kaivalya Rawal, Seyed Razavi, Joe Reid, Dinyah Rein, Norman Jay Rest, Editha Restauro, Donald Rey, Jose Reyes, Michael Ricciardi, Marjorie Richardson, Dave Richman, Connie Ricotta, Nancy Riley, Eddie Rivera, Rafael Rivira, Gary Roberts, Gerald Roberts, Barbara Robinson, Stephen Robinson, Hermelindo Rocha-Vargas, Robert Rockwood,
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The claims of all Plaintiffs, except Deborah Abeel, are dismissed without prejudice. The claims of Plaintiff Deborah Abeel are transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. The Clerk of the Court is directed to effectuate the transfer of Plaintiff Deborah Abeel's claims against all Defendants to the United States District Court for the Central District of California and to close this case in this Court, see Order. Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.,. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 11/272012. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 30, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 9, 2012, before Judge HONORABLE JACK B. WEINSTEIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary Agnes Drury, RPR, Telephone number (718) 613-2615. Email address: Mad78910@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 29, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION to Intervene of Right (w/Exhibits); filed by Natallia V. Piatrova. W/Attachments: #1 Letter, dated 11/21/2012. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 29, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION to Intervene of Right (w/Exhibits); filed by Mark Huber. W/Attachments: #1 Letter, dated 11/15/2012. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 26, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION to Intervene of Right; filed by Alice Burns, dated 11/14/2012. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation Proposed Order and Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #43 ; The motion of Kenneth Gomez, Lynette Gomez, Ronald Porath, and Marzella Porath to intervene in the captioned case is denied as moot in view of the court's oral order of November 9, 2012. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 11/14/2012. (Fernandez, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Intervene submitted by Kenneth Gomez, Lynette Gomez, Ronald Porath, and Marzella Porath. (Fernandez, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER dated 11/14/12 denying #41 Motion to Intervene of Edmund and Judith Smith as MOOT in view of the court's order of 11/9/12. ( Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 11/21/2012 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 9, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Intervene submitted by Edmund Smith and Judith Smith. (Guzzi, Roseann) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 9, 2012 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jack B. Weinstein: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2012 re #26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer filed by PNC Bank, N.A., OneWest Bank, F.S.B. Counsel for all sides present. Motion argued & granted. Order to be submitted by defendants as soon as possible. Motion to sever is granted and the claim by the named plaintiff is referred and transferred to the Central District of California. The other defendants are dismissed for impermissible joinder. Amended complaint is accepted and filed retroactively. (Court Reporter Mary Agnes Drury.) (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 9, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Horwitz on behalf of EMC Mortgage Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Horwitz, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
November 2, 2012 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT ERRATA FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Deborah Abeel. (Moccia, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 31, 2012 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jack B. Weinstein: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2012 re #26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer filed by PNC Bank, N.A., OneWest Bank, F.S.B. Counsel for all sides present. Case adjourned to 11/9/2012 for hearing. (Court Reporter V. Butler.) (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 25, 2012 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maga Guzman, Patricia Crespo, Michael Owen, William Tucker, Cheryl Locey, Cynthia Ireland, Louis Mages, Heath Hodel, Leonard Hernandez, Brett Heskett, Steven Ehlers, Shyam Sunder, Rebecca Quick, Suzan Brittan-Bergman, Corrine Fraysinette, Armando Jimenez, Cherie Cook, Elmer Anderson, CWABS II, Inc., Carole Booth, Leonides Morales, Renata Circeo, Armando Padilla, Portia Joseph, Irma Baker-Parra, Norma Fogelstrom, Jose Cuesta, Kevin Batman, Jon Withrow, Ricardo Perez, Jose Meza, Eric Cutler, Pete Kreuzer, Gary Roberts, Julio Martins, Michael Phillips, Lucy Carlson, Jose P. Ayala, Raymond Tran, Tony Trujillo, Connie Ricotta, Ethan Ross, Joseph Fitzgerald, Jay Kim, Mark C. Lilly, Maria Pelcastre, Roberta Alvarez, Corey Flinn, Dinorah Carmenate, Edwin Aldana, Christina Daniels, Malcolm Turner, Veronica Monterrubio, Nelson A. Gonzalez, Editha Restauro, Stella Markley, Ty Etterlein, Guadalupe Sanchez, Kamlesh Batna, Christopher Cockrell, Joseph Gomez, Joan Henderson-Brown, Rene Minnaar, Lizette Milan-Fiedler, Marie Miller, Glory Kennison, Steven Gumienny, Lidia Garcia, Patricia Dowling, Cherise Hansson, Carmen Linares, Carter Powell, Harry Campbell, Roman Olivos, Richard Fomin, Scott Armstrong, Reginald Santiago, Arvin Serrano, Virginia Peterson, Kimberly Mitchell, Kevin Thompson, Robert Gregg, Deborah Abeel, Joella Lefler, Sessing Hewitt, Tommy Glover, Zane Walker, Benjamin Corona, Noorollah Rahdar, George Wilcox, Bruce Macbride, Grant Clark, Ken Parker, Catherine Nutt, Nassar Bey, European Credit Fund Sicav II, Tracy Weber, Vipin Chaturvedi, Raymond Hill, Rebecca Villanueva, Joshua Kreitzer, Jorge Torres, Del Staudinger, Socorro Pereda, David Medlin, Gladys Krantz, David Ebadat, Sandy Jimenez, Andrew Belcher, Suzanne Suggs, Athena Jackson, Hillary Jackson, Jeff Turner, Gerard Cannella, Casey Kauer, Maria De La Paz Jimenez, Hermelindo Vargas, Michelle Favazzo, Maria Moules, Tawana Blake, Yolina Luquias, Nancy Holcombe, Debbie Sciortino, Lisa Higgens, Sally Figueiredo, Walter Weiss, Ester Gonzalez, Stefan Mahaley, Philip Barr, Kirk Carmichael, Traci Gehm, Robert Arrington, Shawn Cassidy, Dora Aldrete, Barbara Gibbs, Valliur Nadu, Arlyn Mir, Gloria Melo, Nancy Riley, Mary Jane Tuma, Leonarda Macasa, Cindy Harrison, Kenneth Simonsen, Angela Parada, Pete Morgera, Doris Coburn, John Phillingane, Delores Lucas, Diane Brown, Kevin Walker, Izaida Altamirano, Kaivalya Rawal, Lawrence Bracco, Alan Parsons, Frank Martinez, Crayton Smith, Jose Saucedo, Alexander Arroraci, Luis Martinez, Simona Garcia, Brannon Scianna, John Ocampo, Avelina Dizon, Marjorie Richardson, Kevin Keehl, Melissa Widlund, Francisco Ramirez, Talia Olivera, David Appel, Maria Dolores Lombera, Eloy Certeza, Toby Butterworth, James Beeks, Harjinder Waraich, Steven Newton, Ed Lizardo, Curtis Davidson, Russel Hendricks, Michael Waldheim, Paul Strohecker, Oscar Navarro, Jill Walker, Billy Bowman, Hugh Collins, Terry Shaffer, Maria Guzman, Gunter Weissman, Antonio Sanchez, Paul Siboro, Bruce Lawson, Manuel Tavares, Jaspal Kochar, Jennifer Kauer, John Hanson, Antonio Chavez, Rosemary Cruz, Joanne Snyder-Davidson, Joseph Ignacio, Israel Rapuri, Robert Schmalfeldt, Ofelia Romero, Jeffrey Dixon, Richard Carroll, Matthew Friend, Arthur Rodriguez, Charles Tam, Darlene N. Holloway, Toby Moore, Joseph R. Rodriguez, Jr, Dominador Ramos, Lidia Tapia, Donna Foote, Heather Mahoney, Sean McDonald, William Chin, Sheryl Seim-Montoya, Hector Cibrian, D'Ann Friend, Dinorah Llanes, Sargis Davoddaniel, James Eblen, Brian Lynch, Dinyah Rein, Bonnie Butterworth, Robert Berry, Stephen Wayne, Robert Graham, Jack Halley, William Vickery, Gurdayal Batna, Cindy Vickery, Andrey Todorov, Juan Carlos Murrillo, Diane Forsman, Bibian Afable, George Coburn, Roger Sanchez, Richard Neely, Nelida Campos, Evelyn Irving, Charlotte McArdle, Jeff Lavender, Irving Phan, David Faulhaber, Teresa Marquez, Matthew Crosbie, Michael Wiederhold, David Wallace, Esme Ross, Jerome Kamins, Hilario Lucero, Dennis Kemp, Brian Carlson, Eric Anderson, Joanna Singh, John Bahura, Jimmy Alauria, Jose Campos, Charley Smith, Elnora Marshall, Anna Nguyen, Diana Newson, Guillermo Sanchez, Lisa Rodriguez, Nancy P. Rodriguez, Octavio Cruz, Ahmad Hakimjavadi, Jose Reyes, Carroll Walters, Dennis Gleason, Arturo Concha, Simon Sarkisian, Peter Sheldon, Patricia Espinosa, Melanie Cannella, Glen Jackson, Gus Katsikides, Eugene Paterra, Jose Pantoja, Edgart Gonzalez, Mecia Padilla, Vicki Furr, Laura Waldheim, Silvia Hendon, Cindy Ochoa, Craig Williams, Lisa Lefebvre, Kat Conway, Alex Zaets, Bruce Barmakian, Douglas Powers, Farahnaz Mirshafiee, Mery Quintana, Elinor Bozzone, Harley Hunter, Barbara Kikugawa, Nikki White, Evergreen ECM Holdings B.V., Nida Smith, Caamie Murad, Raul Pernett, Sabrina Anderson, Martha Rodriguez, Diane Grubic, John Tedesco, Richard Sorensen, Iliana Sorensen, Morgan Lawley, Marian Canady Meixner, Jose Z. Castro, Oscar Garcia, Robbin Stites, Jessica Cabasal, Jean Joseph, Deborah Lamb, George K. Zink, Courtney Scott, Jose Chavez, Jorge L. Hernandez, Hiroshi Nakayama, Rabia Mir, William Gutierrez, Laurie Marino, Juan Carrillo, Edna Wenning, Roger James, Brenda Copper, Philip Wright, Elizabeth Matsik, Tammy Decker, Salvador Huizar, Mailin Tomlinson, Avelino Martinez, Hilda Sanchez, Rita Ucheka, Thomas Lockhart, Antonio Fuentes, Manuel Castro Palma, Hotosa Ebrahimzadeh, Dennis Bulmer, Daniel Melendez, Vince Hubbard, Thomas Adler, Mehrdad Emsha, Magdalena Guizar, John Macias, Larry Capots, Amanda Bennett, Gilda Tahmureszadeh, John Oxidine, Karol Ousley, Deborah Brigman, Carlos Gonzales, Rizza Heskett, Carl Sanko, Celon D. Dennis, Gloria Bailey, Armando Hinojosa, Robert Lewin, Bertha Crevolin, Norman Caler, Marguerite Vita-Matuzola, Sociedad Anonima, Alicia Fajardo, Fatima Aponte, Alan Ness, Jack Lefler, Veronica Widener, Wayne Fontz, Ronald Williams, Hugo Urribarri, Milton Smith, II, Jose Luis Rodriguez, Michelle Hurtado, Frank Pacheco, Mary Clowney, Felipa Espinosa, Alejandro Luzardo, Calvin Matthews, Rolando Collazo, Tom Beinar, Francis Celo, William Mitchell, Jesse Johnson, Martin Silva, Christopher Villaruz, Mario A. Peralta, Maria Sanchez, Josa Tirado, Dan Klein, Linda H. Vo, Susan Franco, Elizabeth Clampet, David Starkey, Brent Komourous, Leslie Pollack, Laura Aupperle, Thereisi Villaruze, Christopher Fructus, Jesse Sabagquit, Charles Daniels, Phillip Genovese, Jose Espinosa, Paul Campagna, Carmen Munoz, Enrique Romero, Melissa Owen, Dexter Brown, Maria Gonzales, Tracey Hampton, Senen Ochoa, Olga Araniva, Valery Bubela, Ralph Holloway, Karen Nierhake, William Rabello, Leroy Anderson, Nicholas Dietel, Greta Gregorio, Erik Mumford, Thomas Poupard, Vickie Brock, James Peterson, Richard Wilson, Angelica Ramirez, Alex Bacaron, Ana Gonzalez, Melando Martinez, Dionico Cortez, Danielle Cockrell, Ruby Tam, Allison Hanson, Maria Navarro, Jean Hunter, Gurmeet Waraich, Lourdes Fontz, Joe Salazar, Moises Lopez, David Herron, Alvin Blake, Geoffrey Charlton, Cheryl Shaw, Anita Machado, Nestor Guillen, Romina Paredes, Diep Sommers, Dean Copper, Mark Blanco, George Castro, Houston Curtis, Nadia Villarreal, Luis Linares, Rose Chang, Christine Dao, Chris Kim, Javier Jimenez, Seyed Razavi, Mirtha Bernes, Eduardo Marquez, Jose Duarte Lemus, Patrick Hunt, Karl Amrine, Wilfredo Feliciano, Mario Herrera, Sherrie Safko, Ashmelley Thervil, John Booth, Virginia Rotramel, Louis Klein, Ken Leon, Roberto Vargas, Denise Cook, James Gilbert, Harlene Johnson, David Beaubien, Modjulita Hernandez, Steven Quick, Thereisi Villaruz, Lori Batman, Bruce Milligan, Donna Dalton, Erica Morgera, Luise Cohen, Jose Nario, Peter Wright, Jaqueline Carroll, Enriqueta Espinosa, Jacquelynn Leonardo, Hermelindo Rocha-Vargas, Daniel Chavez, Paul Wilder, Cindy Patelski, Fumiko Fisher, Randall Cook, Alan Fogelstrom, Arthur Weaver, Jr, Aida Meza, Nelson J. Gonzalez, Jodi Tuft, Huy Vo, Ricardo Davalos, Ruben Santiago, Mazlina Lai, Marcia Scianna, John Sciortino, Keith Denson, Jon Carlson, Roberto Medina, Alma Townsend, Olic Dunning, III, Eddie Rivera, Edward Bostock, Susanna Green, Albertina Figueroa, Ruben Parra, Cheryl Ford, Kazimir Patelski, Robert Smith, Donald Vitak, II, James Shipman, Burt Lund, Cary Cruz, Steven Hardie, Joe Navarro, Donald Andrews, Bruno Martinez, Nathan Brehm, George Seeley, Miroslava Litterdragt, Eliseo Ramos, Joe Garcia, Noel Olivares, Honorio Dizon, Richard Hale, Timothy Widlund, Deana Oseguera, Richard Strunk, Klaudia Wilczkowiak, Cindy Murrillo, Thein Lam Le, Stephen Clarke, Darlene Beeks, Annette Berry, Benjamin Gamez, Christian Diaz, Elias Vieyra, Stephen Robinson, Ruth Corona, Melissa Warner, Daniel Ramirez, Lourdes Ruiz De La Torre, Baldev Singh, Araceli Bowman, Enrique Guzman, Phillip Galera, Hector Sanchez, Katherine Charlson, Maria Tavares, Enrique Villanueva, Joseph K. Lyons, Lance Kennison, Jennifer Langlo, Hemalatha Souri-Parsons, Vickie Schetritt, Joseph Cina, Josefina Perez Garcia, Leonardo Flores, Margo Cruz, Christian Larsen, Christine Shipman, Mary Medina, Roger Fenstermacher, Rebecca Ignacio, Charles Smith, George Stroup, Troy Davis, Danilo Luquias, Sheila Scott, Felicia Flores, Lauren Locey, Juliet Sicsic, Mark Chasteen, John Kealy, Charlotte O. Tucker, Mitch Van Mechelen, Suren Alaverdyan, Greg Townsend, Paul Jackson, Sally Symons, Carol Powers, Josephina Casellon, Kim Bridges, Irene Cardenas, Debra Wilson, Jason Moeding, Barbara Robinson, Maria Antonia Canales, Altina Patrick, Audrene Ann Alencastre-Roberts, Steve Kong, Art Iturbe, Lily Salas, Basheer Murad, James Snyder, Virgen Mondragon, Patrick Paygar Boyd, Janet Marshall, Antonio Arcinas, Patricia Alvert, Linda Burger, Diane Kepley, Dan Schwartz, Glen Eng, Maria Pantoja, Alice Smith, Maria Elena Fuentes, William Barber, Dave Richman, John Charlson, Luis Zavala, Brian Sexson, Manuel Arechiga, Jr, Dean Kraemer, Christina Ornelas, Linda Lizardo, Clovis Fearon, Sonia Clark, Bradley Gipolan, Cristina Navarro, Anthony Golden, David Estrada, Maria Cruz, Artemio Concepcion, KC Crandall, Paul Rodriguez, Jonny Marie Torres, Harkrishnan Kochar, Norman Jay Rest, Mike Smith, Pamela Anderson, Wayne Furr, Ann Wilson, Robert Taylor, Andrew Stolz, Nicholas Jones
October 19, 2012 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc. (Haddad, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gerard Haddad on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Haddad, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Fried on behalf of Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Fried, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David Dunn on behalf of Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Dunn, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Hearing on #26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer: A hearing in the above case and on any motions to remand, sever or transfer or other preliminary matters is ordered for October 31, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. Parties may appear by telephone and can make arrangements before the hearing date with Case Coordinator June Lowe at (718) 613-2525. (Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10B South before Judge Jack B. Weinstein.) Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein, on 10/11/2012. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal, #2 Order to Show Cause, #3 Partial Docket Sheet) (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 15, 2012 Filing 30 Letter requesting scheduling conference by Deborah Abeel (Moccia, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Singer on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (aty to be noticed) (Singer, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer filed by OneWest Bank, F.S.B., PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer filed by OneWest Bank, F.S.B., PNC Bank, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to Sever or, Alternatively, to Transfer by OneWest Bank, F.S.B., PNC Bank, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/9/12 to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/4/2012. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/9/12 to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/4/2012. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/9/12 to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/4/2012. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/9/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/4/2012. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by William Graig Sandelands on behalf of Aurora Bank, F.S.B. (notification declined or already on case) (Sandelands, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Aurora Bank, F.S.B.. (Sandelands, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 23 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Singh, Mitra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kalinowski, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The captioned case has been reassigned to this court after recusal by several judges of the court. I have bank accounts, credit and debit cards with Chase Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. also manages my investments. The Court will hear any motion for recusal. Any motion for extension of time to answer the complaint is respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein, on 10/4/2012. (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Bank of America Corporation. (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond J. Dearie no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/4/2012. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie for all further proceedings. Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/3/2012. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 3, 2012 Filing 19 Letter to Judge Sterling Johnson by U.S. Bank National Association (Singer, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 3, 2012 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, N.A. (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 3, 2012 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneWest Bank, F.S.B. (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 3, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Eric Gottlieb on behalf of OneWest Bank, F.S.B., PNC Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Gottlieb, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 15 Letter opposing defendants' request for an additional extension of time to answer by Deborah Abeel (Moccia, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 1, 2012 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Singh, Mitra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 1, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitra Singh on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Singh, Mitra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 1, 2012 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kalinowski, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
October 1, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Richard Kalinowski on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (aty to be noticed) (Kalinowski, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to the Complaint by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 9 Letter Letter to Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of the Court, pursuant to Local Rule 50.3.1(d) by Deborah Abeel (Moccia, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nafiz Cekirge on behalf of Bank of America Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Cekirge, Nafiz) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
September 18, 2012 Filing 7 Letter to Douglas Palmer, Clerk of the Court (re-filed with Exhibits) by Bank of America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
September 18, 2012 Filing 6 Letter to Douglas Palmer, Clerk of Court by Bank of America Corporation (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RE #2 : Letter confirming defendants' extension of time to answer by Aurora Bank FSB. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/31/2012. (Culley, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 30, 2012 Filing 2 Letter confirming defendants' extension of time to answer by Aurora Bank FSB (Sandelands, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/5/12 to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/29/2012. (Levy, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 28, 2012 Filing 1 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A.. (Kaiser, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 24, 2012 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653048186 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County by Bank of America Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350) Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/13/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deborah Abeel et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga L. Collazo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Wenning
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Keehl
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Olivos
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bridges
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KC Crandall
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Cruz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Combs
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Rey
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Cardenas
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Klein
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Grubic
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Komourous
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Appel
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gurnee
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Brock
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Owen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Wallace
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basheer Murad
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charley Smith
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Peden
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Jimenez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Macias
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Santiago
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hosking
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Tam
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Linares
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Hinojosa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson J. Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Smith
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Parsons
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Editha Restauro
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rockwood
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Tran
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Skrdla
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Silva
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Oseguera
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Garcia
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Carmichael
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Smith
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Marquez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Matsik
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Joseph
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinorah Llanes
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carrillo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fraser
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sanchez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Decker
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Morgera
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lockhart
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Rivera
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Chavez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrine Fraysinette
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Paygar Boyd
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazlina Lai
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Arroraci
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Hernandez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Phillingane
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Brown
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Bracco
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Fogelstrom
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Sanko
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erenstine Brinkley
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Yocum
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Talbot
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Ucheka
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Phan
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Zavala
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Oxidine
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Chang
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Blanco
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Kreuzer
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Snyder, -
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farahnaz Mirshafiee
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyam Sunder
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaspal Kochar
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talia Olivera
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Freeman
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Navarro
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Celo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Withrow
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Abeel
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senen Ochoa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Sanchez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Feliciano
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Markley
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Kennison
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eblen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ehlers
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rabello
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Nepomuceno
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thereisi Villaruze
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Charlson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonny Marie Torres
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bulmer
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Widener
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Townsend
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Charlson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Chasteen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Holcombe
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaivalya Rawal
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemio Concepcion
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Brown
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Van Mechelen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Bacaron
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marciano Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romina Paredes
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Garcia
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noorollah Rahdar
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lizardo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Snyder-Davidson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Seeley
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Clark
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Canady Meixner
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Kauer
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda H. Vo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Sanchez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wray
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Armstrong
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sorensen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K. Lyons
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Shea
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Turner
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Matthews
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Herbst
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Herron
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guzman
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Flores
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirtha Bernes
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Abad
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Butterworth
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Sanders
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbin Stites
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lawson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Franco
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Aldana
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Milligan
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Chavez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wiederhold
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Iturbe
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Bozarth
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kikugawa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De La Paz Jimenez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kauer
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shipman
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Smith, II
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altina Patrick
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ornelas
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Lockhart
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Peterson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Irving
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Townsend
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carlson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Pernett
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Green
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Islam
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caamie Murad
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Perez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Langlo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ignacio
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Anderson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Berry
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Corona
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kealy
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Baylis
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enriqueta Espinosa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Nutt
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harjinder Waraich
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Newson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Villarreal
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Thompson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Seim-Montoya
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Starkey
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Romero
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Concha
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzales
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Kepley
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Anderson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Campanelli
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Gregorio
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Pereda
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Fuentes
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Villaruz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tucker
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayaani Simpliciano
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Tavares
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Copper
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Furr
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Coburn
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte McArdle
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Lilly
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonides Morales
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint West
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Schwartz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Herrera
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara Lavender
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Vuong
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Schmidt
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Safko
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crayton Smith
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Cruz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Brigman
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Hurdle
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashmelley Thervil
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mir
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Anderson
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honorio Dizon
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Vargas
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiroshi Nakayama
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Vitak, II
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gonzales
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Collins
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Akashi
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Simonsen
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Fogelstrom
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Strohecker
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvin Serrano
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Maria Prezio
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Favazzo
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Pacheco
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cuesta
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Alauria
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simona Garcia
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge L. Hernandez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertina Figueroa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Rotramel
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Singh
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alfredo Segovia
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Higgens
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Martinez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modjulita Hernandez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene N. Holloway
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Lefler
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Patelski
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Shaw
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valery Bubela
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tedesco
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cabasal
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Barmakian
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Duarte
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cina
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Grubic
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maga Guzman
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Gamez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Fontz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Beeks
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy P. Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bennett
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ness
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonarda Macasa
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Stolz
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Wetzel
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Hernandez
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Stroup
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Parra
Represented By: Nicholas M Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWALT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwest Venture Partners VII-A FVCI Mauritius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwest Venture Partners VII-A FII Mauritius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Handlowy W Warszawie S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank - Distribuidora De Titulos E Valores Mobiliarios S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Huvelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Cypress Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Greater China Property Fund Cayman SLP LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide International Technology Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indopark Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: William Graig Sandelands
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Capital III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America (Asia)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Citibank S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Century Bankshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Construction Bank (Asia) Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Richard G Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Promotora De Negocios & Cobranca Ltda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABA Seguros, S.A. DE C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Ben-Ami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Crudo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Participacoes Societarias E Investmentos Ltda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Netherlands Holdings B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Funding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Daniel James Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp Capital Philippines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeus Recovery Fund, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Distressed Debt Master Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin American Investment Bank Bahamas Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Bank Luxembourg S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web