Powell v. Madden, et al.
Plaintiff: Tony Edward Powell
Defendant: Heck, Charles Samuels, Jr., Dr. Franco, P.A. Oguess, Madden, Mettri, George, Juan Castillo, Harrel Watts, Soto, Hector Rios, Paul Copenhaver, - Marquez and Saragoza
Respondent: Butler
Case Number: 1:2013cv00057
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment 69 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/17/14. CASE CLOSED. Dismissal counts as a "strike" under 42 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (Verduzco, M)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Motion at Docket 70 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/3/14. (Verduzco, M)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/8/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Motion at Docket 60 signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/11/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 44 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/2/2014. Rodrigo Ogues, Dr. Franco (Medical Facility) and Lourdes Mettry terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING Motion at Docket 53 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/13/14: Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/11/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 50 Motion for initial disclosure signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Regarding Motion at Docket 46 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/5/14: Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Regarding Motion at Docket 36 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/18/14: The Addendum at Docket 36, treated as motion to amend the complaint, is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/12/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER regarding Motion 13 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 1/29/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING and PLANNING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 1/27/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 1/22/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 29 Petition for Leave, Permitting Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Answer to Complaint signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/24/2013. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Motion at Docket 15 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/9/13: Petition for Reconsideration at Docket 15 is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Motion to Transfer Filing Fee From Another Action 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/26/13. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Madden, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heck
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Samuels, Jr.
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Franco
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Oguess
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madden
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mettri
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Castillo
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrel Watts
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soto
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Rios
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Copenhaver
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Marquez
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saragoza
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Butler
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Edward Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?